Tucker et al v. South Shore Villas Homeowners Association et al
Plaintiff: |
Ida Hanson and Freddie Tucker |
Defendant: |
Angius and Terry Collection, LLC, Iyad Haddad, Lido Isle Court Trust, Resources Group, LLC, South Shore Villas Homeowners Association and Jacqueline Taylor |
Case Number: |
2:2015cv00961 |
Filed: |
May 21, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Jennifer A. Dorsey |
Presiding Judge: |
Nancy J. Koppe |
Nature of Suit: |
Real Property: Foreclosure |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1345 Foreclosure |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 5, 2017 |
Filing
61
ORDER Certifying That In Forma Pauperis Status Should not Continue to Appeal re 60 Notice of Appeal. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/5/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF: cc 9th Circuit - MMM)
|
March 1, 2017 |
Filing
57
ORDER that 54 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order is DENIED. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/1/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
January 10, 2017 |
Filing
53
ORDER that 26 Motion to Dismiss and to Expunge Lis Pendens and 41 Motion to Declare Plaintiffs Vexatious Litigants are GRANTED. This case is DISMISSED with prejudice.FURTHER ORDERED that the Notice of Pendency of Action or Lis Pendens recor ded by plaintiffs in relation to this matter [ECF No. 5 ] as to certain parcel of real property 163-08-715- 014 located at 3127 Lido Isle Court, Las Vegas, 89117, is expunged. A copy of this order may be recorded at the Clark County Recorder's Office in the applicable chain of title.FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs and those in privity with plaintiffs will not be permitted to file an action against these defendants and those in privity with them challenging the 2012 foreclosure sale of the property located at 3127 Lido Isle Court, Las Vegas, 89117, without prior court approval of this court. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/10/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
February 22, 2016 |
Filing
18
ORDER that the Amended Complaint 17 is DISMISSED for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction, with leave to amend. Plaintiffs will have until March 23, 2016, to file a Second Amended Complaint, if they believe they can correct the noted deficiencies. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/22/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
September 29, 2015 |
Filing
15
ORDER that 13 Motion for Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/29/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
August 28, 2015 |
Filing
10
ORDER that 8 and 9 Applications for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis are GRANTED. The clerk shall file the Complaint. The Complaint is DISMISSED for failure to establish federal jurisdiction, with leave to amend. Plaintiffs will have until October 1, 2015, to file an Amended Complaint, if they believe they can correct the noted deficiencies. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/28/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
July 20, 2015 |
Filing
7
ORDER that 2 Ida Hanson's Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiff shall have until August 20, 2015, in which to submit the completed application or pay the $400.00 filing fee. The clerk shall retain the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/20/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF: blank ifp form to plaintiff - MMM)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?