Le et al v. Zuffa, LLC
Plaintiff: Cung Le, Nathan Quarry and Jon Fitch
Defendant: Zuffa, LLC, Top Rank, Inc. and Robert Arum
Petitioner: Geoffrey M Klineberg and Joshua D Branson
Consolidated Plaintiff: Kyle Kingsbury, Mac Danzig, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Gabe Ruediger, Pablo Garza, Brandon Vera, Darren Uyenoyama and Luis Javier Vazquez
Interested Party: Bellator Sport Worldwide LLC, WME/IMG, LLC and Sparacino, PLLC
Case Number: 2:2015cv01045
Filed: June 3, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 851 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Mark R. Suter for Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. Responses due by 10/4/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cramer, Eric)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 850 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/14/2023.IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a ruling on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and Designation of Local Counsel #848 is DEFERRED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner Eli J. Kay-Oliphant shall complete and submit the Verified Petition For Permission To Practice In This Case Only By Attorney Not Admitted To The Bar Of This Court And Designation Of Local Counsel. See LR IA 11-2 ("Applications must be by verified petition on the form furnished by the clerk.").IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that in appointing resident counsel, each defendant's Authorized Representative is directed to print his/her name AND TITLE and sign. Petitioner shall have 14 days from the entry of this order to correct the deficiency by filing the Corrected Verified Petition using the "Notice of Corrected Image/Document" event. Failure to timely remedy this deficiency will result in the denial of the Verified Petition, and Petitioner will be required to refile and to repay the filing fee.
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 849 MOTION SPARACINO PLLCS MOTION FOR RELIEF PURSUANT TO THE COURTS INHERENT AUTHORITY by Interested Party Sparacino, PLLC. Responses due by 9/27/2023. (Shapiro, Brian) (misc) (presiding)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 848 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by ELI J. KAY-OLIPHANT and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel BRIAN D. SHAPIRO (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7424726) by Interested Party Sparacino, PLLC. (Shapiro, Brian)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 846 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, held on 8/21/2023, Status Conference, before Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Court Reporter: Patricia Ganci, PG@nvd.uscourts.gov. Any Redaction Request is due by 9/12/2023. Release of the Transcript Restriction is set for 11/20/2023. Before release date, the transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter. After release date, it may be obtained through the court reporter or PACER. THIS TRANSCRIPT MUST NOT BE ATTACHED AS AN EXHIBIT OR MADE PART OF AN APPENDIX. See Local Rule IA 10-3.(b). (PG)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 847 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Status Conference held on 8/21/2023 before Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Crtrm Administrator: D Smith; Pla Counsel: Eric Cramer, Joshua Davis, Joseph Saveri, Patrick Madden, Richard Koffman and Donald Springmeyer; Def Counsel: William Isaacson, Richard McKnight- General Counsel for UFC; J. Colby Williams and Ariane Reed; Court Reporter: Patricia Ganci; Time of Hearing: 3:35 p.m. 4.26 p.m.; Courtroom: 7C Counsel for all parties appearing before the Court. The Court makes preliminary statements and hears representations from the parties regarding scheduling matters in the Le et al v. Zuffa, LLC, 2:15-cv-01045-RFB-BNW, and the Johnson et al v. Zuffa, LLC dba Ultimate Fighting Championship et al, 2:21-cv-01189-RFB-BNW, matters, following the Courts order granting in part and denying in part the #518 Motion to Certify Class in Le et al v. Zuffa, LLC. For the reasons stated on the record, IT IS ORDERED that a trial will be scheduled for either March 2024 or April 2024 in the Le et al v. Zuffa, LLC, 2:15-cv-01045-RFB-BNW, matter. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Defendant in Le et al v. Zuffa, LLC, 2:15-cv-01045-RFB-BNW, may file a motion to reopen discovery and/or a motion for summary judgment for the Bout Class regarding damages and liability by October 24, 2023. Plaintiff will have until November 21, 2023 to respond, and Defendant will have until December 19, 2023 to file a reply. Based on the Court's certification order, the publics interest, and the age of the records, the Court no longer finds it proper for records in Le et al v. Zuffa, LLC, 2:15-cv-01045-RFB-BNW, to remain sealed. The Court intends to unseal the records in this matter, with exception to records containing personal identifying information, including medical records and phone numbers. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the parties in Le et al v. Zuffa, LLC, 2:15-cv-01045-RFB-BNW, shall have until October 31, 2023 to jointly file the record with the proposed redactions and to file any motion requesting additional redactions apart from those concerning the personal identifying information described above. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs in Le et al v. Zuffa, LLC, 2:15-cv-01045-RFB-BNW, shall have until October 24, 2023, to file a motion regarding improper Class contact. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the stay in Johnson et al v. Zuffa, LLC dba Ultimate Fighting Championship et al , 2:21-cv-01189-RFB-BNW, is LIFTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Endeavor Group Holdings, Inc., and Zuffa, LLCs #66 Motion for Leave to File Document in Johnson et al v. Zuffa, LLC dba Ultimate Fighting Championship et al, 2:21-cv-01189-RFB-BNW, is DENIED as moot. The hearing that this motion concerns has already occurred. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint scheduling order discovery plan, including any separate briefing schedule for motions to compel arbitration or for injunctive relief regarding the Bout Class in Le et al v. Zuffa, LLC, in Le et al v. Zuffa, LLC , 2:15-cv-01045-RFB-BNW, and Johnson et al v. Zuffa, LLC dba Ultimate Fighting Championship et al , 2:21-cv-01189-RFB-BNW, by September 20, 2023. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 845 DECLARATION of ELI J. KAY-OLIPHANT re #844 Response by Interested Party Sparacino, PLLC.. (Shapiro, Brian)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 844 RESPONSE to #842 Status Report by Interested Party Sparacino, PLLC. (Shapiro, Brian)
August 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 843 RESPONSE to #842 Status Report by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Isaacson, William)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 842 STATUS REPORT Plaintiffs' Pre-Conference Statement by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera.. (Saveri, Joseph)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 841 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/11/2023. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs' #833 MOTION TO CONDUCT STATUS CONFERENCE and #838 MOTION TO SET AND/OR RESET SUMMARY JUDGMENT BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND FOR STATUS CONFERENCE are GRANTED nunc pro tunc. The Court has set a joint status conference for August 21, 2023 at 3:30pm and will discuss matters related to the class certification order and scheduling. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that #835 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Document is DENIED. The filing concerns Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class, but the Court finds consideration of it moot in light of its August 9, 2023 Order addressing the motion. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAG)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 840 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/11/2023. By Deputy Clerk: Summer Rivera.On August 9, 2023, the Court issued its order addressing Plaintiffs Motion to Certify Class in Le et al v. Zuffa, LLC, 2:15-cv-01045-RFB-BNW, ECF No. #839 . The Order also set a status conference for 8/21/2023 at 03:30 PM in LV Courtroom 7C before Judge Richard F. Boulware II.IT IS ORDERED that the Status Conference will be a Joint Status Conference regarding Le et al v. Zuffa, LLC, 2:15-cv-01045-RFB-BNW, and Johnson et al v. Zuffa, LLC dba Ultimate Fighting Championship et al, 2:21-cv-01189-RFB-BNW. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 839 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part #518 Motion to Certify Class. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court will set a status conference for the parties to address Plaintiffs claims for injunctive relief pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23(b)(3) and invite additional briefing if required.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court appoints named Plaintiffs as Class Representatives and appoints Interim Class Counsel as Class Counsel.Status Conference set for 8/21/2023 at 03:30 PM in LV Courtroom 7C before Judge Richard F. Boulware II. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/9/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 838 MOTION PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO SET AND/OR RESET SUMMARY JUDGMENT BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND FOR STATUS CONFERENCE by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. Responses due by 7/24/2023. (Springmeyer, Don) (misc) (sumjgm)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 837 NOTICE of Change of Address for Joshua Davis by Jon Fitch, Kyle Kingsbury, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera.. (Cramer, Eric)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 836 RESPONSE to #835 Motion for Leave to File Document/Excess Pages by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. Replies due by 4/18/2023. (Springmeyer, Don)
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 835 MOTION for Leave to File Document by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. Responses due by 4/24/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Isaacson, William) (nondispositive)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 834 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/31/2023. IT IS ORDERED that #826 Motion to Conduct Status Conference is DENIED without prejudice. Good cause being found, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that #821 , #832 #832 Motions to File Supplemental Authority are GRANTED. The supplemental authorities in question are (1) an en banc rehearing order of the Ninth Circuit in No. 19-56514, Olean Wholesale Grocery Coop., Inc. v. Bumble Bee Foods LLC, and (2) a subsequent Order of the Supreme Court denying certiorari in 22-131, Starkist Co., et al v. Olean Wholesale Grocery et al. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL) Modified text on 3/31/2023 (BEL).
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 833 MOTION MOTION TO CONDUCT STATUS CONFERENCE by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry. Responses due by 2/3/2023. (Springmeyer, Don) (misc) (presiding)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 832 MOTION for Leave to File Document by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. Responses due by 11/28/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Springmeyer, Don) (nondispositive)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 831 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/30/2022. IT IS ORDERED that #796 Emergency MOTION Plaintiffs Emergency Motion to Compel is Denied as moot. It is the Courts understanding that Sparacino PLLC is no longer engaging in the alleged communications that formed the basis for this Emergency Motion. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CVL)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 830 ORDER Granting #827 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Najah Jacobs for Nathan Quarry and approving Designation of Local Counsel as to Don Springmeyer. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/19/2022. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website #www.pacer.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 828 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #827 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, for attorney NAJA H JACOBS, by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry. (Service of corrected image is attached.). (Springmeyer, Don)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 827 View Corrected Image #828 as to MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by NAJAH JACOBS and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel DON SPRINGMEYER (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-6971096) by Petitioner Joshua D Branson, Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry. by Petitioner Joshua D Branson, Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry. (Springmeyer, Don)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 826 MOTION MOTION TO CONDUCT STATUS CONFERENCE by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry. by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry. Responses due by 7/21/2022. (Springmeyer, Don) (misc) (nondispositive)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 825 ORDER Granting #824 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Stacey K. Grigsby withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 6/8/2022.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 824 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Stacey K. Grigsby for Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Grigsby, Stacey)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 823 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 6/2/2022. IT IS ORDERED that ECF No. #822 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney is DENIED without prejudice under Local Rule IA 11-6(b). Ms. Grigsby may refile her motion but must certify that she served it on her client.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RA)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 822 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Stacey K. Grigsby for Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Grigsby, Stacey)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 821 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. Responses due by 4/22/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Springmeyer, Don)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 820 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jon Fitch, Kyle Kingsbury, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Cramer, Eric)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 819 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/4/2021. Good cause being found, [ECF No. 818] Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority is GRANTED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CVL)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 818 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY, by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Springmeyer, Don)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 817 TRANSFER ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that case no. 2:21-cv-01189-APG-VCF is transferred to District Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Brenda N. Weksler. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all documents shall be filed under case 2:21-cv- 01189-RFB-BNW and shall bear that case number. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/8/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 816 NOTICE OF RELATED CASES 2:21-cv-01189-APG-VCF by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Brandon Vera. PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF RELATED CASES (Springmeyer, Don)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 815 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 814 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document, Status Conference, held on 4/9/2021, before Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Court Reporter: Patricia Ganci, PG@nvd.uscourts.gov. Any Redaction Request is due by 6/2/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline is set for 6/12/2021. Release of the Transcript Restriction is set for 8/10/2021. Before release date, the transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the reporter. Transcript Order form is available on court website. After that date it may be obtained through the court reporter or PACER. (PG) (Main Document 815 replaced on 5/12/2021) (PG).
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 813 REPLY to Response to #796 Motion, by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Brandon Vera. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (Springmeyer, Don)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 812 ORDER Granting #806 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joshua D Branson for Sparacino, PLLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel Brian D Shapiro. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/14/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 811 ORDER Granting #805 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Geoffrey M Klineberg for Sparacino, PLLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel Brian D Shapiro. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/14/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 810 APPENDIX to #809 Declaration by Interested Party SPARACINO, PLLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Shapiro, Brian)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 809 DECLARATION of RYAN R. SPARACINO re #808 Response by Interested Party SPARACINO, PLLC. (Shapiro, Brian)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 808 RESPONSE to #796 Motion, by Interested Party SPARACINO, PLLC. Replies due by 4/20/2021. (Shapiro, Brian)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 807 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Brian D Shapiro on behalf of Interested Party SPARACINO, PLLC. and Request for Special Notice (Shapiro, Brian)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 806 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Joshua D. Branson and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Brian D. Shapiro (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6444854) by Petitioner Joshua D Branson. (Shapiro, Brian)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 805 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Geoffrey M. Klineberg and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Brian D. Shapiro (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6444819) by Petitioner Geoffrey M Klineberg. (Shapiro, Brian)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 814 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Status Conference held on 4/9/2021 before the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II. Crtrm Administrator: Blanca Lenzi; Pla Counsel: Donald Springmeyer, Esq., Eric Cramer, Esq., Michael DellAngelo, Esq., Patrick Madden, Esq., Mark Suter, Esq., Joshua Davis, Esq., Richard Koffman, Esq., Daniel Silverman, Esq.; Def Counsel: William Isaacson, Esq., Stacey Grisby, Esq., Samuel Mirkovich, Esq., Rich McKnight- General Counsel; Top Rank: Brooke Jenkins, Esq., Non Party- Bellator: Phillip Kelly, Esq.; Court Reporter: Patty Ganci; Time of Hearing: 11:05 AM - 11:25 AM; Courtroom: 7C; Parties are present appearing by videoconference for proceedings. The Court makes preliminary statements and hears representations from the parties regarding documents to be unsealed in connection with the Class Certification Order. In the next few weeks, the Court shall schedule another hearing regarding the unsealed documents, as well as to address (ECF No. #796 ) Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Compel. Instruction regarding videoconference and teleconference appearance to be issued. Good cause being found, IT IS ORDERED that (ECF No. #803 ) Defendant's Motion for Leave to File a Notice of Supplemental Authority is GRANTED. The transcript of the hearing shall serve as the written Opinion and Order of the Court. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 804 RESPONSE to #803 Motion for Leave to File Document by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. Replies due by 4/16/2021. (Springmeyer, Don)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 803 MOTION for Leave to File a Notice of Supplemental Authority by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Isaacson, William)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 802 RESPONSE to #796 Motion, by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. Replies due by 4/15/2021. (Isaacson, William)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 801 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/5/2021. WHEREAS, this Court has found, due to the danger of the global pandemic to the community, including the parties, court staff and the attorneys of parties, that in-person appearances must be restricted whenever necessary and that this case is appropriate to be heard by videoconference; Due to a conflict with the Court's calendar, IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Status Conference Hearing set for April 6, 2021 is vacated and RESET for April 9, 2021 at 11:00 AM by videoconference to review documents to be unsealed in connection with the Class Certification Order, to be issued prior to the status conference hearing.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that members of the public may join the hearing by dialing by your location: 1 669 254 5252 US; OR 1 669 216 1590 US, enter meeting id: 160 715 9754. For mobile phone access, dial either telephone numbers listed above and enter meeting id: 160 715 9754#. Members of the public granted such access must join the remote proceedings prior to their official commencement. Once a remote proceeding has begun, no access will be granted to the proceeding.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that no one or entity or organization, including but not limited to counsel, counsel's agents or staff, the Defendant, law enforcement agents/officers, members of the public, who participate in or listen to this proceeding may record it in any manner. Any individual, entity or organization that records this proceeding without written authorization of the Court shall be subject to civil and/or criminal contempt penalties by this Court. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 800 NOTICE NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE by Jon Fitch, Kyle Kingsbury, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera re #796 Motion,. (Springmeyer, Don)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 799 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #796 Motion, by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Springmeyer, Don)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 798 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER re #796 Emergency MOTION by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Springmeyer, Don) Modified on 3/30/2021 to add document link (MMM).
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 797 DECLARATION re #796 Motion, by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Exhibits in Support of Eric L. Cramer, Esq.'s Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8) (Springmeyer, Don)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 796 Emergency MOTION Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion to Compel Sparacino PLLC to Stop Communicating with Absent Members of the Proposed Class and for Related Relief by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. Responses due by 4/13/2021. (Springmeyer, Don)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 795 NOTICE of Change of Address by J Colby Williams. (Williams, J)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 794 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/19/2021. WHEREAS, this Court has found, due to the danger of the global pandemic to the community, including the parties, court staff and the attorneys of parties, that in-person appearances must be restricted whenever necessary and that this case is appropriate to be heard by videoconference; IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Status Conference Hearing is set for April 6, 2021 at 9:00 AM by videoconference to review documents to be unsealed in connection with the Class Certification Order, to be issued prior to the status conference hearing.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that members of the public may join the hearing by dialing by your location: 1 669 254 5252 US; OR 1 669 216 1590 US,enter meeting id: 160 715 9754. For mobile phone access, dial either telephone numbers listed above and enter meeting id: 160 715 9754#. Members of the public granted such access must join the remote proceedings prior to their official commencement. Once a remote proceeding has begun, no access will be granted to the proceeding.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that no one or entity or organization, including but not limited to counsel, counsels agents or staff, the Defendant, law enforcement agents/officers, members of the public, who participate in or listen to this proceeding may record it in any manner. Any individual, entity or organization that records this proceeding without written authorization of the Court shall be subject to civil and/or criminal contempt penalties by this Court.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 793 RESPONSE to #791 Supplement, by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Grigsby, Stacey)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 792 ORDER Granting #790 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 1/25/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 791 SUPPLEMENT to #785 Response, 782 Minute Order,,, Terminate Deadlines/Hearings,,, Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings,, PLAINTIFFS' SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE REGARDING DISCLOSURE OF CASE MATERIALS IN CONNECTION WITH CLASS CERTIFICATION OPINION AND ORDER by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera (Springmeyer, Don)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 790 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Bradley Schrager for Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Schrager, Bradley)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 789 ORDER granting #788 Motion to Withdraw Attorneys: Suzanne Jaffe Nero; Marcy N. Lynch; Brent K. Nakamura; Richard J. Pocker; Jonathan Mark Shaw; Nicholas A. Widnell; Abby L. Dennis and Steven C. Holtzman withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 1/15/2021.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 788 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Nicholas A. Widnell, Marcy Norwood Lynch, Richard J. Pocker, Jonathan Shaw, Brent Nakamura, Steven Holtzman, Suzanne Jaffe Nero, and Abby L. Dennis for Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Williams, J)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 787 SUPPLEMENT to #786 Response, Supplemental Declaration of W. Hunter Campbell by Defendant Zuffa, LLC (Grigsby, Stacey)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 786 OBJECTION and Request for Clarification to 782 Minute Order by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stacey Grigsby, #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit 1) (Grigsby, Stacey) Modified text on 1/12/2021 (EDS).
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 785 OBJECTION to 782 Minute Order, by Non-Party Bellator Sport Worldwide LLC. (MR)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 784 LETTERS in Support of Unsealing Records. (MR) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/11/2021: #1 Additional Letter) (MR). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/11/2021: #2 Additional Letters) (MR). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/11/2021: #3 Addtional Letter (Attachment)) (BEL). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/11/2021: #4 Additional Letter (See Attached)) (BEL).
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 783 NOTICE PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE REGARDING DISCLOSURE OF CASE MATERIALS by Jon Fitch, Kyle Kingsbury, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera re 782 Minute Order,,, Terminate Deadlines/Hearings,,, Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings,,. (Springmeyer, Don)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 782 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/6/2021. Upon review of #778 Joint Notice Regarding Sealed and Redacted Documents, it is the Court's intent to unseal and make public all the documents in this case with the publication of the Court's Certification Order. All parties and any interested third party have until Monday, January 11, 2021 to indicate their position with respect with disclosure of all the material. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 780 NOTICE of Change of Address by Don Springmeyer. (Springmeyer, Don)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 779 CLERK'S NOTICE of violation of Local Rules. ECF No. #778 was not filed pursuant to LR IA 10-2. Incorrect case number on document. See Clerk's Notice at ECF No. 657. The correct case number is 2:15-cv-01045-RFB-BNW.Attorney Stacey Grigsby is advised in the future to file documents pursuant to the Local Rules. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. Do NOT refile. (no image attached) (MMM)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 778 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #776 Notice (Other), by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Attachments: #1 Index Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Table of Redacted and Under Seal Documents) (Grigsby, Stacey)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 777 CLERK'S NOTICE of violation of Local Rules. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #776 . Document not properly formatted pursuant to LR IA 10-1 and LR IA 10-2.Attorney Stacey Grigsby is advised to correct the deficiency and refile using the event Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #776 . Do NOT link to this Notice. (no image attached) (MMM)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 776 VIEW #778 corrected image to Joint NOTICE Regarding Sealed and Redacted Documents Pursuant to 772 Order of December 11, 2020 by Zuffa, LLC. (Grigsby, Stacey) Document not filed per LR IA 10-1 and 10-2; attorney advised to file corrected image on 12/15/2020 (MMM). Modified text on 12/16/2020 (MMM).
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 775 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/11/2020. The Court declares that the forthcoming written order of the Court certifying the class shall be the order certifying the class for the purposes of Rule 23 and not the Court's indication at the status conference on December 10, 2020 of its intention to grant in part Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify (ECF No. #518 ). (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL) Modified on 1/4/2021 (BEL).
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 774 CLERK'S NOTICE of violation of Local Rules. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #773 . Attorney William Isaacson is advised to refer to LR IA 7-1(b): an attorney or pro se party must not send case-related correspondence, such as letters, emails, or facsimiles, to the court. All communications with the court must be styled as a motion, stipulation, or notice, and must be filed in the courts docket and served on all other attorneys and pro se parties. The court may strike any case-related correspondence filed in the court's docket that is not styled as a motion, stipulation, or notice. Document not properly formatted pursuant to LR IA 10-1; LR IA 10-2.Counsel is advised to correct the deficiencies and refile using the appropriate docket entry event. Document #773 terminated as filed in error. (no image attached) (MMM)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 773 ERROR: Document not properly formatted in violation of Local Rules. NOTICE of Letter Request for Clarification by Zuffa, LLC. (Isaacson, William) Document #773 terminated as filed in error. Modified on 12/11/2020 (MMM).
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 772 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/11/2020. The Parties are ORDERED to file a joint list by December 15, 2020, of all exhibits or portions of exhibits or briefs that they believe are still sealed or redacted so the Court may determine whether such material should be unsealed or unredacted in conjunction with its Class Certification order. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 781 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Status Conference held on 12/10/2020 before the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II. Crtrm Administrator: Blanca Lenzi; Pla Counsel: Eric Cramer, Esq., Don Springmeyer, Esq., Joseph Saveri, Esq., Richard Koffman, Esq, Joshua Davis, Esq., Michael Dell'Angelo, Esq., Daniel Silverman, Esq.,; Def Counsel: : William Isaacson, Esq., Paul Wise, Esq., Stacey Grisby, Esq., Colby Williams, Esq., Rich McKnight, General Counsel; Court Reporter: Patty Ganci; Time of Hearing: 2:06 PM - 2:09 PM; Courtroom: 7C; The Court makes preliminary statements and hears representations from the parties regarding (ECF No. #518 ) Plaintiff's Motion to Certify and the Court's forthcoming order. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 771 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/19/2020. Due to the negative impact on court operations from the rise of COVID-19 cases in the District, see General Orders 2020-02 through 2020-05, and the need for the Court to address the accompanying emergency filings associated with this surge, the hearing in this case set November 23, 2020 is vacated and continued to December 10, 2020 at 2:00 PM (PST) in LV Courtroom 7C by videoconference before Judge Richard F. Boulware, II.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that members of the public may join the hearing by dialing: 1 669 254 5252 US; OR 1 646 828 7666 US, enter meeting id: 160 4364 6590. For mobile phone access, dial either telephone numbers listed above and enter meeting id with #: 16043646590#. Members of the public granted such access must join the remote proceedings prior to their official commencement. Once a remote proceeding has begun, no access will be granted to the proceeding.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that no one or entity or organization, including but not limited to counsel, counsels agents or staff, the Defendant, law enforcement agents/officers, members of the public, who participate in or listen to this proceeding may record it in any manner. Any individual, entity or organization that records this proceeding without written authorization of the Court shall be subject to civil and/or criminal contempt penalties by this Court.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 770 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/6/2020. Due to a conflict with the Court's hearing calendar, IT IS ORDERED that the Status Conference Hearing to review the Court's Order for Certification by videoconference appearance set for November 19, 2020 is vacated and RESET for November 23, 2020 at 1:00 PM in LV Courtroom 7C before Judge Richard F. Boulware, II.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that members of the public may join the hearing by dialing: 1 669 254 5252 US ; OR 1 646 828 7666 US,enter meeting id: 160 4364 6590. For mobile phone access, dial either telephone numbers listed above and enter meeting id: 16043646590#. Members of the public granted such access must join the remote proceedings prior to their official commencement. Once a remote proceeding has begun, no access will be granted to the proceeding.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that no one or entity or organization, including but not limited to counsel, counsels agents or staff, the Defendant, law enforcement agents/officers, members of the public, who participate in or listen to this proceeding may record it in any manner. Any individual, entity or organization that records this proceeding without written authorization of the Court shall be subject to civil and/or criminal contempt penalties by this Court.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
October 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 769 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/31/2020. WHEREAS, this Court has found, due to the danger of the global pandemic to the community, including the parties, court staff and the attorneys of parties, that in-person appearances must be restricted whenever necessary and that this case is appropriate to be heard by videoconference; IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Status Conference Hearing to review the Court's Order for Certification by videoconference appearance is set for November 19, 2020 at 2:00 PM in LV Courtroom 7C before Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that members of the public may join the hearing by dialing by your location: 1 669 254 5252 US (San Jose); OR 1 646 828 7666 US (New York),enter meeting id: 160 4364 6590. For mobile phone access, dial either telephone numbers listed above and enter meeting id: 16043646590#. Members of the public granted such access must join the remote proceedings prior to their official commencement. Once a remote proceeding has begun, no access will be granted to the proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that no one or entity or organization, including but not limited to counsel, counsels agents or staff, the Defendant, law enforcement agents/officers, members of the public, who participate in or listen to this proceeding may record it in any manner. Any individual, entity or organization that records this proceeding without written authorization of the Court shall be subject to civil and/or criminal contempt penalties by this Court.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 767 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, Status Conference, held on 9/17/2020, before Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Court Reporter: Patricia Ganci, PG@nvd.uscourts.gov. Any Redaction Request is due by 10/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline is set for 10/19/2020. Release of the Transcript Restriction is set for 12/17/2020. Before release date, the transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the reporter. Transcript Order form is available on court website. After that date it may be obtained through the court reporter or PACER. (PG)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 768 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Status Conference held on 9/17/2020 before the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II. Crtrm Administrator: Blanca Lenzi; Pla Counsel: Eric Cramer, Esq., Patrick, Madden, Esq., Joshua Davis, Esq., Joseph Saveri, Esq., Mark Suter, Esq., Daniel Silverman, Esq. Don Springmeyer, Esq.; Def Counsel: William Isaacson, Esq., Brent Nakumbera, Esq., Stacey Grisby, Esq., Nicholas Widnell, Esq., Riche McKnight, Esq., Colby Williams, Esq., Suzanne Nero, Esq.; Court Reporter: Patty Ganci; Time of Hearing: 10:28 AM - 10:36 AM; Courtroom: 7C; The Court makes preliminary statements and hears representations from the parties regarding the forthcoming Order as to the #518 MOTION to Certify Class. For the reasons stated on the record at the hearing, the Court to finalize and issue the Order. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 766 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/19/2020. WHEREAS, this Court has found, due to the danger of the global pandemic to the community, including the parties, court staff and the attorneys of parties, that in-person appearances must be restricted whenever necessary and that this case is appropriate to be heard by videoconference; IT IS ORDERED that Status Conference regarding the forthcoming Order as to the #518 MOTION to Certify Class is set for September 17, 2020 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 7C by videoconference appearance before Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that members of the public seeking to have access to this hearing must, prior to the day of the hearing, contact the Court by email to request access to and receive permission to listen this hearing by telephone. Members of the public granted such access must join the remote proceedings prior to their official commencement. Once a remote proceeding has begun, no access will be granted to the proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the members of the public may contact the Courtroom Administrator at "blanca_lenzi@nvd.uscourts.gov", or (702) 464-5470 with information on how to participate in the video conference if necessary. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that no one or entity or organization, including but not limited to counsel, counsels agents or staff, the Defendant, law enforcement agents/officers, members of the public, who participate in or listen to this proceeding may record it in any manner. Any individual, entity or organization that records this proceeding without written authorization of the Court shall be subject to civil and/or criminal contempt penalties by this Court.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 765 NOTICE of Change of Address by William A. Isaacson. (Isaacson, William)
May 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 764 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/31/2020. The Court grants #673 Joint Motion to Seal, #678 Motion to Seal, #685 Joint Motion to Seal, #687 Joint Motion to Seal, #699 Joint Motion to Seal, #703 Motion to Seal, #712 Motion to Seal and #754 Motion to Seal (752) Notice Other. The Court also grants #716 Motion for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority nunc pro tunc. Having considered the arguments, the Court denies #748 Motion for Reconsideration re Minutes of Proceedings-Evidentiary Hearing and declines to reinstate the stricken testimony. The Court grants the motions to seal but alerts the parties that some portions of the record shall be unsealed consistent with the Court's findings in its forthcoming order on #518 Motion for Class Certification. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 763 ORDER Granting #762 Motion to Withdraw Evan E. North as Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 5/13/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 762 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Evan E. North for Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brent K. Nakamura, #2 Proposed Order) (Nakamura, Brent)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 761 NOTICE of Change of Address by Brent K. Nakamura. (Nakamura, Brent)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 760 ORDER Granting #759 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Ross P. McSweeney and Rory L. Skaggs withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 1/7/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 759 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Rory L. Skaggs and Ross P. McSweeney for Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brent K. Nakamura, #2 Proposed Order) (Nakamura, Brent)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 758 REPLY to #748 Motion for Reconsideration, by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Grigsby, Stacey)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 757 ORDER Granting #755 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Jiamin Chen withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 10/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 756 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #752 Notice (Other),, by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Grigsby, Stacey)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 755 SECOND MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney; filed by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kevin E. Rayhill, #2 Proposed Order) (Rayhill, Kevin)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 754 MOTION to Seal #752 Notice (Other),, by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order Granting Zuffa's Motion to Seal) (Grigsby, Stacey)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 752 VIEW Corrected Image #756 as to Exhibit 17 EXHIBITS; filed by Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 17, #2 Exhibit 18, #3 Exhibit 19, #4 Exhibit 20, #5 Exhibit 21, #6 Exhibit 22, #7 Exhibit 23, #8 Exhibit 24, #9 Exhibit Zuffa 9, #10 Exhibit Zuffa 10, #11 Exhibit Zuffa 11, #12 Exhibit Zuffa 12, #13 Exhibit Zuffa 13, #14 Exhibit Zuffa 14, #15 Exhibit Joint 1 Part 1, #16 Exhibit Joint 1 Part 2, #17 Exhibit Joint 1 Part 3) (Grigsby, Stacey) Modified on 10/8/2019 to restrict access to attachment 1 per #215 protective order (DKJ). Modified on 10/8/2019 (RFJ).
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 751 RESPONSE to #748 Motion for Reconsideration, by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. Replies due by 10/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric L. Cramer, Esq., #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H) (Cramer, Eric)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 750 ORDER Denying without prejudice #749 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 9/27/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 749 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Saveri, Joseph)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 748 MOTION for Reconsideration re: #747 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Evidentiary Hearing; filed by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. Responses due by 10/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stacey K. Grigsby, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order) (Grigsby, Stacey) Document not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d) by attorney Stacey K. Grigsby. Court corrected entry. (RFJ).
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 829 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, #747 Order on Motion to Seal, Order on Stipulation, Evidentiary Hearing, held on 9/23/2019, before Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kimberly Ribaric. Any Redaction Request is due by 10/15/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline is set for 10/25/2019. Release of the Transcript Restriction is set for 12/23/2019. Before release date, the transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the reporter/transcriber. Transcript Order form is available on court website. After that date it may be obtained through the court reporter or PACER. (PG)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 747 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Evidentiary Hearing - Day 7 held Richmond, VA on 9/23/2019 before the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II. Crtrm Administrator: Blanca Lenzi; Pla Counsel: Eric Cramer, Esq., Mark Suter, Esq., Patrick Madden, Esq., Joshua Davis, Esq.; Def Counsel: Stacy Grisby Esq., William Isaacson, Esq., Marcy Lunch, Esq., Brent Nakumbera, Esq., Rich McKnight, Esq.; Court Reporter: Kimberly Ribaric; Time of Hearing: 9:33 AM - 12:13 PM.The Court makes preliminary statements and rules for the record the following;The Court DENIES #641 and #648 MOTIONS to Seal are DENIED and #626 MOTION to Seal is DENIED without prejudice as moot. The Court GRANTS #602 #608 , #614 , #622 , #630 , #635 , #637 , #656 , #659 , and #665 MOTIONS to Seal. Joe Silva Testified. See minutes attached. Counsel is directed to file a joint stipulation for exhibits as identified on the record at the hearing. A written order on the #518 Motion to Certify Class will issue. The transcript of the hearing will serve as the written Opinion and Order of the Court as to the Motions to Seal. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 746 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Evidentiary Hearing - Day 6 held on 9/13/2019 before Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Crtrm Administrator: Blanca Lenzi; Pla Counsel: Eric Cramer, Esq., Joshua Davis, Esq., Joseph Saveri, Esq., Mark Suter, Esq., Patrick, Madden, Esq., Daniel Silverman, Esq. Don Springmeyer, Esq.; Def Counsel: William Isaacson, Esq., Brent Nakumbera, Esq., Stacey Grisby, Esq., Nicholas Widnell, Esq., Riche McKnight, Esq., Colby Williams, Esq., Suzanne Nero, Esq.; Court Reporter: Patty Ganci; Time of Hearing: 8:22 AM - 11:23 AM; Courtroom: 7C. Professor Alan Manning, resumes testimony on re-direct examination. Exhibits admitted, see minutes attached. Final Arguments by Mr. Davis and Mr. Isaacson with Rebuttal Arguments by Mr. Davis. Witness testimony to resume on September 23, 2019 at 9:30 AM. Counsel for the parties are directed to be at the courthouse by 8:30 AM to address any technical issues prior to the start of the hearing. Evidentiary Hearing - Day 7 will resume before Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on Monday, September 23, 2019 at 9:30 AM, Courtroom 6300 located at Spottswood W. Robinson III and Robert R. Merhige, Jr. Federal Courthouse located at 701 East Broad Street, Richmond, Virginia 23219. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 745 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, held on 9/13/2019, Evidentiary Hearing, Day 6, before Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Court Reporter: Patricia Ganci, PG@nvd.uscourts.gov. Any Redaction Request is due by 10/4/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline is set for 10/14/2019. Release of the Transcript Restriction is set for 12/12/2019. Before release date, the transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the reporter. Transcript Order form is available on court website. After that date it may be obtained through the court reporter or PACER. (PG)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 744 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF in Support of #518 Motion to Certify Class, by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Cramer, Eric)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 743 DECLARATION re #742 Zuffa LLC's Supplemental Brief In Opposition to #518 Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 PCCX652, #3 Exhibit 2 2017-9-27 Singer Excerpts, #4 Exhibit 3 PCCX604, #5 Exhibit 4 ZCCX201, #6 Exhibit 5 JCCX39, #7 Exhibit 6 PCCX644, #8 Exhibit 7 JCCX56, #9 Exhibit 8 PCCX549, #10 Exhibit 9 2018-02-08 Manning Excerpts, #11 Exhibit 10 JCCX72, #12 Exhibit 11 Phishing Scam article, #13 Exhibit 12 Academic Star Article, #14 Exhibit 13 World Cat Article, #15 Exhibit 14 PCCX475, #16 Exhibit 15 JCCX12, #17 Exhibit 16 2018-01-26 Zimbalist Excerpts, #18 Exhibit 17 ZCCX279, #19 Exhibit 18 ZCCX292, #20 Exhibit 19 PCCX685, #21 Exhibit 20 PCCX531, #22 Exhibit 21 2018-01-23 Singer Excerpts, #23 Exhibit 22 2017-09-25 Zimbalist Excerpts, #24 Exhibit 23 ZCCX249 part 1, #25 Exhibit 23 ZCCX249 part 2, #26 Exhibit 23 ZCCX249 part 3, #27 Exhibit 24 JCCX55, #28 Exhibit 25 ZCCX179) (Jaffe Nero, Suzanne) Modified on 9/13/2019 to add docket entry relationship (MMM).
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 742 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF in Opposition to #518 Motion to Certify Class, by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Isaacson, William)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 741 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, #740 Evidentiary Hearing, Day Five, held on 9/12/2019, before Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Court Reporter: Patricia Ganci, PG@nvd.uscourts.gov. Any Redaction Request is due by 10/3/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline is set for 10/13/2019. Release of the Transcript Restriction is set for 12/11/2019. Before release date, the transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the reporter. Transcript Order form is available on court website. After that date it may be obtained through the court reporter or PACER. (PG)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 740 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Evidentiary Hearing - Day 5 held on 9/12/2019 before the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II. Crtrm Administrator: Blanca Lenzi; Pla Counsel: Eric Cramer, Esq., Joshua Davis, Esq., Joseph Saveri, Esq., Mark Suter, Esq., Patrick, Madden, Esq., Daniel Silverman, Esq. Don Springmeyer, Esq.; Def Counsel: William Isaacson, Esq., Brent Nakumbera, Esq., Stacey Grisby, Esq., Nicholas Widnell, Esq., Riche McKnight, Esq., Colby Williams, Esq., Suzanne Nero, Esq.; Court Reporter: Patty Ganci; Time of Hearing: 9:06 AM - 10:20 AM ; 1:28 PM - 3:13 PM; 4:05 PM - 4:50 PM; Courtroom: 7C. Professor Alan Manning and Professor Paul Oyer testified. The Court next makes preliminary statements and hears representations from the parties regarding the order of the remaining testimony with rebuttal and closing arguments set for September 13, 2019.Evidentiary Hearing - Day 6 is set for September 13, 2019 at 8:15 AM in LV Courtroom 7C before Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 739 NOTICE of Exhibits from Phase 1 of the Evidentiary Hearing by Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs Ex. 1, #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs Ex. 2, #3 Exhibit Plaintiffs Ex. 3, #4 Exhibit Plaintiffs Ex. 4, #5 Exhibit Plaintiffs Ex. 5, #6 Exhibit Plaintiffs Ex. 6, #7 Exhibit Plaintiffs Ex. 7, #8 Exhibit Plaintiffs Ex. 8 - Part 1, #9 Exhibit Plaintiffs Ex. 8 - Part 2, #10 Exhibit Plaintiffs Ex. 9 - Part 1, #11 Exhibit Plaintiffs Ex. 9 - Part 2, #12 Exhibit Plaintiffs Ex. 10, #13 Exhibit Plaintiffs Ex. 11, #14 Exhibit Plaintiffs Ex. 12, #15 Exhibit Plaintiffs Ex. 13, #16 Exhibit Plaintiffs Ex. 14, #17 Exhibit Plaintiffs Ex. 15, #18 Exhibit Plaintiffs Ex. 16, #19 Exhibit Zuffa Ex. 1, #20 Exhibit Zuffa Ex. 2, #21 Exhibit Zuffa Ex. 3, #22 Exhibit Zuffa Ex. 4, #23 Exhibit Zuffa Ex. 5, #24 Exhibit Zuffa Ex. 6 - Part 1, #25 Exhibit Zuffa Ex. 6 - Part 2, #26 Exhibit Zuffa Ex. 7, #27 Exhibit Zuffa Ex. 8) (Isaacson, William)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 738 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/12/2019. IT IS ORDERED that Evidentiary Hearing - Day 5 set for September 12, 2019 is ADVANCED in time only to 9:00 AM in LV Courtroom 7C before Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 737 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/10/2019. IT IS ORDERED that the parties may each file one supplemental brief, limited to fifteen pages, for the Motion to Certify Class and the parties' submission should include all citations to the record or expert reports expressly requested by the Court. The briefs are due by 10PM on Thursday, September 12. Plaintiffs' must explicitly identify in their brief all theories of liability upon which they seek to proceed regarding class certification, including monopoly and monopsony theories. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 736 NOTICE Joint Letter re Outstanding Motions and Issues by Zuffa, LLC.. (Isaacson, William)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 735 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Evidentiary Hearing - Day 4 held on 8/30/2019 before the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II. Crtrm Administrator: Blanca Lenzi; Pla Counsel: Eric Cramer, Esq., Joshua Davis, Esq., Joseph Saveri, Esq., Mark Suter, Esq., Patrick, Madden, Esq., Daniel Silverman, Esq. Don Springmeyer, Esq.; Def Counsel: William Isaacson, Esq., Stacey Grisby, Esq., Nicholas Widnell, Esq., Riche McKnight, Esq., Samuel Mirkovich, Esq., Brent Nakamura, Esq.; Court Reporter: Patty Ganci; Time of Hearing: 8:36 AM - 2:21 PM; Courtroom: 7C. Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury and John Fitch are present in the courtroom. Notice of Compliance is due by 9/9/2019. Dr. Andrew Zimbalist, Ph.D. and Dr. Roger Blair, Ph.D. testified. The Court maintains the schedule for both experts to testify on September 12, 2019. The Court will hear closing arguments on September 13, 2019. IT IS ORDERED that the parties jointly file a letter by September 9, 2019 regarding all outstanding issues before the Court.Evidentiary Hearing Day 5 will resume on September 12, 2019 at 9:30 AM in LV Courtroom 7C before Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 734 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, held on 8/30/2019, Evidentiary Hearing, Day Four, before Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Court Reporter: Patricia Ganci, PG@nvd.uscourts.gov. Any Redaction Request is due by 9/20/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline is set for 9/30/2019. Release of the Transcript Restriction is set for 11/28/2019. Before release date, the transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the reporter. Transcript Order form is available on court website. After that date it may be obtained through the court reporter or PACER. (PG)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 732 NOTICE of Letter to Judge Boulware re Non-Party WME/IMG, LLC Exhibit PCCX41 by Zuffa, LLC. (Grigsby, Stacey)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 731 ERRATA to #728 Notice (Other), by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Nakamura, Brent)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 730 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, #729 Evidentiary Hearing, Day 3, held on 8/28/2019, before Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Court Reporter: Patricia Ganci, PG@nvd.uscourts.gov. Any Redaction Request is due by 9/18/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline is set for 9/28/2019. Release of the Transcript Restriction is set for 11/26/2019. Before release date, the transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the reporter. Transcript Order form is available on court website. After that date it may be obtained through the court reporter or PACER. (PG)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 729 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Evidentiary Hearing - Day 3 held on 8/28/2019 before Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Crtrm Administrator: Blanca Lenzi; Pla Counsel: Eric Cramer, Esq., Joshua Davis, Esq., Joseph Saveri, Esq., Mark Suter, Esq., Patrick, Madden, Esq., Daniel Silverman, Esq. Don Springmeyer, Esq.; Def Counsel: William Isaacson, Esq., Stacey Grisby, Esq., Nicholas Widnell, Esq., Rich McKnight, Esq., Samuel Mirkovich, Esq., Brent Nakamura, Esq.; Court Reporter: Patty Ganci; Time of Hearing: 9:07 AM - 12:50 PM; 2:16 PM - 3:14 PM; Courtroom: 7C. Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury and John Fitch are present in the courtroom. Dr. Robert Topel and Dr. Hal Singer, resumed testimony on cross examination. Exhibits marked and admitted into evidence. See minutes attached. Evidentiary hearing will resume on testimony on August 30, 2019 at 8:30 AM in LV Courtroom 7C before Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL) (Main Document 729 replaced on 9/13/2019, text re: exhibits.) (BEL)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 728 NOTICE of Regression Results Requested in August 27, 2019 Evidentiary Hearing in Le v. Zuffa et al., Case No. 15-cv-01045 and Request for Brief Supplemental Expert Report by Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Isaacson, William)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 727 NOTICE of Sealing Requested in August 26, 2019 Hearing by Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Part 1, #2 Exhibit A - Part 2, #3 Exhibit A - Part 3, #4 Exhibit A - Part 4, #5 Exhibit A - Part 5) (Grigsby, Stacey)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 726 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, #725 Evidentiary Hearing, Day 2, held on 8/27/2019, before Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Court Reporter: Patricia Ganci, PG@nvd.uscourts.gov. Any Redaction Request is due by 9/17/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline is set for 9/27/2019. Release of the Transcript Restriction is set for 11/25/2019. Before release date, the transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the reporter. Transcript Order form is available on court website. After that date it may be obtained through the court reporter or PACER. (PG)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 725 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Evidentiary Hearing - Day 2 held on 8/27/2019 before Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Crtrm Administrator: Blanca Lenzi; Pla Counsel: Eric Cramer, Esq., Joshua Davis, Esq., Joseph Saveri, Esq., Mark Suter, Esq., Patrick, Madden, Esq., Daniel Silverman, Esq. Don Springmeyer, Esq.; Def Counsel: William Isaacson, Esq., Stacey Grisby, Esq., Nicholas Widnell, Esq., Rich McKnight, Esq., Samuel Mirkovich, Esq., Brent Nakamura, Esq.; Court Reporter: Patty Ganci; Time of Hearing: 9:15 AM - 12:54 PM; 2:10 PM - 4:19 PM; Courtroom: 7C.Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury and John Fitch are present in the courtroom. Dr. Hal Singer resumed testimony. Dr. Robert Topel testified. See minutes attached.Evidentiary hearing will resume on August 28, 2019 at 9:00 AM in LV Courtroom 7C before Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL) (Main Document 725 replaced on 8/28/2019) (BEL).
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 724 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, #723 Evidentiary Hearing, Day 1, held on 8/26/2019, before Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Court Reporter: Patricia Ganci, PG@nvd.uscourts.gov. Any Redaction Request is due by 9/17/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline is set for 9/27/2019. Release of the Transcript Restriction is set for 11/25/2019. Before release date, the transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the reporter/transcriber. Transcript Order form is available on court website. After that date it may be obtained through the court reporter or PACER. (PG)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 723 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Evidentiary Hearing - Day 1 held on 8/26/2019 before Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Crtrm Administrator: Blanca Lenzi; Pla Counsel: Eric Cramer, Esq., Joshua Davis, Esq., Joseph Saveri, Esq., Mark Suter, Esq., Patrick, Madden, Esq., Daniel Silverman, Esq. Don Springmeyer, Esq.; Def Counsel: William Isaacson, Esq., Stacey Grisby, Esq., Nicholas Widnell, Esq., Rich McKnight, Esq., Samuel Mirkovich, Esq., Brent Nakumra, Esq.,; COUNSEL FOR NONPARTY- BELLATOR: Phillip Kelly, Esq., Blakely Griffith, Esq.; COUNSEL FOR NONPARTY- TOP RANK: David Marroso, Esq. Brooke Jenkins, Appearing Telephonically.; Court Reporter: Patty Ganci; Time of Hearing: 9:43 AM - 4:10 PM; Courtroom: 7C.Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury and John Fitch are present in the courtroom. The Court GRANTS #718 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Philip M. Kelly and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Kelly H. Dove. Dr. Hal Singer testified. See Minutes attached. Evidentiary hearing will resume on August 27, 2019 at 9:00 AM, in LV Courtroom 7C before Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 722 ORDER Granting #718 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Philip M Kelly for Bellator Sport Worldwide LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel Kelly H Dove. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/26/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 721 RESPONSE to #716 Motion for Leave to File Document re #518 Motion to Certify Class, by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. Replies due by 9/1/2019. (Isaacson, William) Modified on 8/27/2019 to add docket entry relationship (MMM).
August 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 720 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/24/2019. IT IS ORDERED that #719 Non-Party Top Rank, Inc.'s Motion to Permit Counsel to Appeal Telephonically is GRANTED. Top Rank's counsel may appear by telephone at the evidentiary hearing scheduled for Monday, August 26, 2019 at 9:30 AM.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel shall join the hearing telephonically by dialing telephone no.: (877) 336-1829: Access Code: 3616356 five (5) minutes prior to the hearing. Please remain on the line until such a time as the Court joins the call and convenes the proceedings. The call must be made on a land line. The use of a cell phone or speaker phone during the proceedings is prohibited. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 719 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically, Attorney David Marroso, by Defendant Top Rank, Inc.. (Marroso, David)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 718 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Philip M. Kelly and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Kelly H. Dove (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5676484) by Interested Party Bellator Sport Worldwide LLC. (Dove, Kelly)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 717 ERROR: Document not filed pursuant to Local Rules. Fee not paid. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to refile and pay the fee. VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Philip M Kelly and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Kelly H Dove by Interested Party Bellator Sport Worldwide LLC. (MR) Document #717 terminated as filed in error. Modified on 8/23/2019 (MMM).
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 716 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority re #518 Motion to Certify Class,,,, by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Cramer, Eric)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 715 NOTICE of Joint Statement Regarding Issues in Dispute for Evidentiary Hearing Regarding Class Certification by Zuffa, LLC. (Isaacson, William)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 714 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/20/2019. In light of 710 Notice, IT IS ORDERED that the Evidentiary Hearing set for August 29, 2019 is VACATED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 712 Unopposed MOTION to Seal by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nicholas A. Widnell, #2 Proposed Order) (Widnell, Nicholas)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 708 RESPONSE to #705 Notice (Other) by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Cramer, Eric)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 707 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Philip M. Kelly to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 9/22/2019. (no image attached) (MMM)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 705 NOTICE of Citations Requested in February 1, 2019 Hearing by Zuffa, LLC. (Isaacson, William)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 706 REPLY to #677 Response to #661 Notice, by Interested Party Bellator Sport Worldwide LLC. (MR)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 713 Objections to Disclosure of Confidential Materials re 701 Minute Order, by Defendant Top Rank, Inc. (MR)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 709 Objections to Public Disclosure of Confidential Information re 701 Minute Order, by Interested Party WME/IMG, LLC. (MR)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 704 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/24/2019. To the extent the parties request to present evidence at the evidentiary hearing to be held starting August 26, 2019 re: #518 MOTION to Certify Class, the parties are directed to coordinate exhibits and witnesses and file exhibit lists and witness lists no later than three days prior to the scheduled hearing. Plaintiffs are to use numerals 1-499 and Defendants are to use numerals 500 and above counsel are to utilize the Court's exhibit list form and provide copies of exhibit list and a thumb drive or CD/DVD of exhibits to be used at the hearing to the courtroom administrator on the day of the hearing. Counsel is further instructed to the contact court reporter at patty_ganci@nvd.uscourts.gov if daily transcripts will be requested. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL) Modified text on 7/26/2019 (BEL).
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 703 MOTION to Seal #696 Reply - Exhibit B, by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Shaw, Jonathan)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 702 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #696 Reply, by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Shaw, Jonathan)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 701 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/12/2019. IT IS ORDERED that any non-party briefing regarding public disclosure of proposed evidentiary hearing exhibits be submitted to this Court via email to blanca_lenzi@nvd.uscourts.gov by August 2, 2019. The Court will promptly file any submissions received by this date. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 700 NOTICE of Non-Party WME|IMG LLC's Letter Requesting Guidance Regarding the Process for Protecting Non-Parties' Confidential Documents, by Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan M. Shaw, #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B) (Shaw, Jonathan)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 699 Joint MOTION to Seal #697 Reply, #696 Reply, by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Shaw, Jonathan)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 697 REPLY to #658 Brief,,, #683 Response,, by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera.. (Cramer, Eric)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 696 VIEW #702 corrected image to Exhibit B REPLY to #675 Response to #665 Motion to Seal, by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan M. Shaw, #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I) (Shaw, Jonathan) Modified on 7/12/2019 to add docket entry relationship (MMM).
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 695 REPLY to #674 Response by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Isaacson, William)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 694 NOTICE of Change of Address by Suzanne Jaffe Nero. (Jaffe Nero, Suzanne)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 693 ORDER Granting #689 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brooke Danielle Jenkins for Top Rank, Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel Eric D. Hone. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/9/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 692 ORDER Granting #688 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jonathan M. Shaw for Zuffa, LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel Richard J. Pocker. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/9/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 691 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #689 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition by Defendant Top Rank, Inc.. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Hone, Eric)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 690 CLERK'S NOTICE of violation of Local Rule LR IA 10-2. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #689 . Incorrect case number on document. See Clerk's Notice at ECF No. 657. Counsel is advised to correct the deficiency and refile using the event Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #689 . (no image attached) (MMM)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 689 VIEW #691 corrected image to MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Brooke Danielle Jenkins and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Eric D. Hone (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5611796) by Defendant Top Rank, Inc.. (Hone, Eric)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 688 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan M. Shaw and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Richard J. Pocker (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5611679) by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Grigsby, Stacey)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 687 Joint MOTION to Seal #677 Response, #675 Response,, #676 Response,, #674 Response by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stacey K. Grigsby in Support of the Parties Joint Motion to Conditionally File under Seal Exhibits to Plaintiffs Responsive Briefing Related to Zuffas and Non-Parties Objections Regarding Exhibit List Documents, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order Regarding Joint Motion to Conditionally File under Seal Exhibits to Plaintiffs Responsive Briefing Related to Zuffas and Non-Parties Objections Regarding Exhibit List Documents) (Grigsby, Stacey)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 686 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 5-1(b). ECF No. #685 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 5-1(b) by attorneys Stacey K. Grigsby and William A. Isaacson. Please note the signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. Do NOT refile. (no image attached) (MMM)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 685 MOTION to Seal 684 Exhibit to #683 Response, by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Isaacson, William) Modified on 7/1/2019 to add docket entry relationship
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 683 RESPONSE to #658 Brief,,, by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nicholas A. Widnell, #2 Declaration of Dr. Joshua D. Lustig, #3 Declaration of Brent K. Nakamura, #4 Index of Exhibits, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit 8, #13 Exhibit 9, #14 Exhibit 10, #15 Exhibit 11, #16 Exhibit 12, #17 Exhibit 13, #18 Exhibit 14, #19 Exhibit 15, #20 Exhibit 16, #21 Exhibit 17) (Isaacson, William)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 678 MOTION to Seal #677 Response, #675 Response,, #676 Response,, #674 Response by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cramer, Eric)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 677 RESPONSE to #661 Notice (Other), by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patrick F. Madden, Esq., #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7) (Cramer, Eric)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 676 RESPONSE to #661 Notice (Other), by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Patrick F. Madden, Esq., #2 Index Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 9) (Cramer, Eric)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 675 RESPONSE to #665 Motion to Seal, by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. Replies due by 7/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Patrick F. Madden, Esq., #2 Index Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 10) (Cramer, Eric)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 674 RESPONSE to #664 Brief,, by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Cramer, Eric)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 673 Joint MOTION to Conditionally File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Objections to Defendant Zuffa, LLC's Proposal by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stacey K. Grigsby, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Proposed Order) (Grigsby, Stacey) Modified on 6/19/2019 to remove incorrect docket entry relationship (MMM).
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 672 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/19/2019. IT IS ORDERED that the unopposed #671 Motion for Relief from Technical Failure is GRANTED. The Court notes that the filing difficulty was caused not by a technical failure in the Court's ECF system but by the size of the filings, which should have been filed as separate entries. However, good cause being found, the Court will consider #664 and #665 as timely filed pursuant to LR IC 3-1(c). (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 671 MOTION for Relief from Technical Failure in Electronic Case Filing Pursuant to Local Rule IC 3-1(c) re #665 Motion to Seal, #664 Brief,, by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. Responses due by 7/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brent K. Nakamura in Support of Defendant Zuffa, LLCS Motion for Relief from Technical Failure in Electronic Case Filing Pursuant to Local Rule IC 3-1(c), #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Proposed Order) (Nakamura, Brent)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 670 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/17/2019. IT IS ORDERED that #662 Joint Motion Proposing Briefing Schedule on Exhibit Objections is GRANTED. Responses are due June 28, 2019 and Replies are due July 12, 2019.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 669 CLERK'S NOTICE of violation of Local Rules. The case number on document #665 is incorrect. The correct case number 2:15-cv-01045-RFB-BNW. See Clerk's Notice at ECF No. 657. AttorneyStacey Grigsby is advised in the future to file documents pursuant to the local rules to avoid a delay of filing of documents pursuant to LR IC 7-1.No additional action required at this time. Do NOT refile. (no image attached) (MMM)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 668 CLERK'S NOTICE of violation of Local Rules. The case number on documents 663 and #664 is incorrect. The correct case number 2:15-cv-01045-RFB-BNW. See Clerk's Notice at ECF No. 657.Attorney William Isaacson is advised in the future to file documents pursuant to the local rules to avoid a delay of filing of documents pursuant to LR IC 7-1.No additional action required at this time. Do NOT refile. (no image attached) (MMM)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 667 CLERK'S NOTICE of violation of Local Rules. The case number on documents #661 and #662 is incorrect. The correct case number 2:15-cv-01045-RFB-BNW. See Clerk's Notice at ECF No. 657.Attorney Nicholas Widnell is advised in the future to file documents pursuant to the local rules to avoid a delay of filing of documents pursuant to LR IC 7-1.No additional action required at this time. Do NOT refile. (no image attached) (MMM)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 666 CLERK'S NOTICE of violation of Local Rules. The case number on documents #658 , 660 , #658 is incorrect. The correct case number 2:15-cv-01045-RFB-BNW. See Clerk's Notice at ECF No. 657.Attorney Eric Cramer is advised in the future to file documents pursuant to the local rules to avoid a delay of filing of documents pursuant to LR IC 7-1. No additional action required at this time. Do NOT refile. (no image attached) (MMM)
June 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 665 MOTION to Seal #664 Brief - Objections to Plaintiffs' Exhibit List Documents by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Index, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Proposed Order, #7 Proposed Order) (Grigsby, Stacey)
June 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 664 BRIEF - Objections to Plaintiffs' Exhibit List Documents by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Index, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit 8, #13 Exhibit 9, #14 Exhibit 10, #15 Exhibit 11, #16 Exhibit 12, #17 Exhibit 13, #18 Exhibit 14, #19 Exhibit 15, #20 Exhibit 16, #21 Exhibit 17, #22 Exhibit 18, #23 Exhibit 19, #24 Exhibit 20, #25 Exhibit 21, #26 Exhibit 22) (Isaacson, William)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 662 Joint MOTION Proposing Briefing Schedule on Exhibit Objections by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. Responses due by 6/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order) (Widnell, Nicholas)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 661 Joint NOTICE of Third Party Objection Letters Regarding Certain Third Party Documents listed in the Parties' Exhibit Lists, by Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Index OF EXHIBITS, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F) (Widnell, Nicholas)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 659 MOTION to Seal #658 Brief, by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cramer, Eric)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 658 BRIEF - Objections to Defendant Zuffa, LLC's Proposal to Introduce Certain Purported "Summary Exhibits" at the Hearing Concerning Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patrick F. Madden, Esq., #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28) (Cramer, Eric)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 657 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:15-cv-01045-RFB-BNW. (no image attached) (RFJ)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 656 Joint MOTION to Seal by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nicholas A. Widnell, #2 Proposed Order) (Widnell, Nicholas)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 654 NOTICE Regarding Proposed Witness Ordering for Evidentiary Hearing by Zuffa, LLC. (Isaacson, William)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 653 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/14/2019. IT IS ORDERED that an Evidentiary Hearing regarding the #518 Motion to Certify Class is set for August 26, 2019 through August 30, 2019 at 9:30 AM in LV Courtroom 7C before Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Second Evidentiary Hearing regarding the #518 Motion to Certify Class is set for September 12, 2019 through September 13, 2019 at 9:30 AM in LV Courtroom 7c before Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 652 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/1/2019. The Motions to Seal [ECF Nos. #557 , #559 ] are GRANTED. The First Stipulation [ECF No. 563] is GRANTED. The Joint Motion to Seal [ECF No. #566 ] is GRANTED. The Motion for Leave To File [ECF No. 568] is GRANTED. The Joint Motion for Leave To File [ECF No. #570 ] is GRANTED. The Motion for Leave To File [ECF No. #571 ] is GRANTED. The Motion to Seal [ECF No. #577 ] is GRANTED. The Joint Motion to Seal [ECF No. #588 ] is GRANTED. The Motion for Leave to File [ECF No. #591 ] is GRANTED. The Motion for Leave to File [ECF No. #592 ] is GRANTED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 651 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 649 Motion Hearing, held on 2/1/2019, before Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Court Reporter: Patricia Ganci, PG@nvd.uscourts.gov. Any Redaction Request is due by 2/28/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline is set for 3/10/2019. Release of the Transcript Restriction is set for 5/8/2019. Before release date, the transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the reporter. Transcript Order form is available on court website. After that date it may be obtained through the court reporter or PACER. (PG)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 650 NOTICE of Change of Address by William G Caldes. for Spector Roseman & Kodroff PC (Caldes, William)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 649 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 2/1/2019 before the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II. Crtrm Administrator: Blanca Lenzi; Pla Counsel: ric Cramer, Esq., Joshua Davis, Esq., Jiamin Chen, Esq., Patrick Madden, Richard Koffman, Esq., Daniel Silverman, Esq., Don Springmeyer, Esq., Joseph Saveri, Esq.; Def Counsel: William Isaacson, Esq., Stacey Grigsby, Esq., Rich McKnight, Esq., Hunter Campbell, Esq., Colby Williams, Esq.; Court Reporter: Patty Ganci; Time of Hearing: 10:03 AM - 11:22 AM; Courtroom: 7C.The Court has reviewed #638 Notice Regarding Availability for Evidentiary Hearing and will set dates for expert testimony by subsequent minute order. The Court makes preliminary statements and hears preliminary arguments of counsel regarding the admissibility and sealing of exhibits. Documents that are currently sealed will remain sealed until the Courts final determination on this matter. The Court will hear additional argument at a later date. The Court also makes preliminary statements and hears preliminary arguments of counsel regarding Rule 23 standards.IT IS ORDERED that the parties exchange exhibits by May 24, 2019, meet and confer by June 7, 2019, and file any objections by June 14, 2019.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties each submit the names of up to three experts that have not been retained in this case for the Court's consideration of potential appointment of an independent expert.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 648 Joint MOTION to Seal #639 Response by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stacey K. Grigsby in Support of Joint Motion to Conditionally File under Seal Plaintiffs Reply Statement Regarding Rule 23 Standards (ECF No. 646) and Plaintiffs Response to Zuffa, LLCs Proposal Regarding the Treatment of Protected Material for The Evidentiary Hearing on Class Certification (ECF No. 639), #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Stacey K. Grigsby, #3 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Stacey K. Grigsby, #4 Proposed Order) (Grigsby, Stacey)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 645 RESPONSIVE BRIEF by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. Regarding Plaintiffs Statement Regarding Use of Confidential Materials at the Court-Ordered Evidentiary Hearing (ECF No. 628) (Grigsby, Stacey)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 644 RESPONSIVE BRIEF re 633 Notice (Other) by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Isaacson, William)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 641 MOTION to Seal 640 Response, #639 Response by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Cramer, Eric)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 639 RESPONSE to #632 Brief by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Cramer, Eric)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 638 NOTICE Regarding the Parties' and Witnesses' Availability for Evidentiary Hearing Regarding Class Certification by Jon Fitch, Kyle Kingsbury, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Cramer, Eric)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 637 Joint MOTION to Seal 633 Notice (Other) by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stacey K. Grigsby in Support of Joint Motion to Conditionally File Plaintiffs Statement Regarding Rule 23 Standards Under Seal, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order Regarding Joint Motion to Conditionally File Plaintiffs Statement Regarding Rule 23 Standards Under Seal) (Grigsby, Stacey)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 635 MOTION to Seal 633 Notice (Other) by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Cramer, Eric)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 634 OPENING BRIEF Regarding the Standards to Be Applied for the Evidentiary Hearing on Class Certification by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Isaacson, William)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 632 OPENING BRIEF Regarding the Treatment of Protected Material for the Evidentiary Hearing on Class Certification by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stacey K. Grigsby) (Grigsby, Stacey)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 631 NOTICE: Plaintiffs' Statement Regarding Use of Confidential Materials at the Court-Ordered Evidentiary Hearing by Jon Fitch, Kyle Kingsbury, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Cramer, Eric)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 630 Unopposed STIPULATION Re: Briefing in Advance of Hearing re #518 Motion, by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Cramer, Eric) Modified on 12/21/2018 (TR).
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 629 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/19/2018. IT IS ORDERED that a pre-hearing conference is set for February 1, 2019 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 7C before Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 627 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, Motions Hearing held on 12/14/2018, before Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Court Reporter: Patricia Ganci, PG@nvd.uscourts.gov. Any Redaction Request is due by 1/8/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline is set for 1/18/2019. Release of the Transcript Restriction is set for 3/18/2019. Before release date, the transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the reporter. Transcript Order form is available on court website. After that date it may be obtained through the court reporter or PACER. (PG)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 628 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 12/14/2018 before the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II. Crtrm Administrator: Blanca Lenzi; Pla Counsel: Eric Cramer, Esq., Joshua Davis, Esq., Jiamin Chen, Esq., Michael DellAngelo, Esq., Richard Koffman, Esq., Daniel Silverman, Esq., Patrick Madden Esq., Don Springmeyer, Esq.,; Def Counsel: William Isaacson, Esq., Stacey Grigsby, Esq., Rich McKnight, Esq., Nicholas Windnell, Esq, Hunter Campbell, Esq., Colby Williams, Esq.; Court Reporter: Patty Ganci; Time of Hearing: 2:13 PM - 3:33 PM; Courtroom: 7C.The Court makes preliminary statements and hears representations of counsel regarding the #518 MOTION to Certify Class and 572 and #573 MOTIONS for Summary Judgment. For the reasons stated on the record at the hearing, IT IS ORDERED that a simultaneous briefing identifying the appropriate standard for the Court to decide whether or not, in the context of the motion to certify the class, the model can serve as a sufficient basis to certify the class and what specific findings the Court would have to make for the class to be certified based upon this modeling. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that #545 Joint Motion to Supplement Expert Reports is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 572 and #573 MOTIONS for Summary Judgment is DENIED without prejudice to allow supplement to the record. The parties are directed to confirm a date for the Court as to the hearing setting either February 1, 2019 or March 8, 2019. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 626 Joint MOTION Regarding Protective Measures for the Class Certification and Summary Judgment Hearing by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. Responses due by 12/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stacey K. Grigsby in Support of Zuffas Position in the Joint Motion Regarding Protective Measures for the Class Certification and Summary Judgment Hearing) (Grigsby, Stacey)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 625 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/10/2018. IT IS ORDERED that #536 , #541 , #542 , #552 , #555 , #582 , 597 , #598 , #605 , #620 Unopposed Motions to Seal are GRANTED.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 624 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/30/2018. The Court has considered the Request [ECF No. #617 ] for an evidentiary hearing. The Court DENIES this request at this time. The Court will the hear arguments of counsel and make a determination at the hearing on December 14, 2018 whether an evidentiary hearing is necessary to decide the Motion To Certify [ECF No. #518 ]. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
November 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 623 REPLY to Response to #614 Motion to Seal by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stacey K. Grigsby in Support of Zuffas Reply in Support of its Motion to Seal Zuffas Reply in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 614), #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H) (Grigsby, Stacey)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 622 Joint MOTION to Seal #619 Response, by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Grigsby, Stacey)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 620 MOTION to Seal #619 Response, by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Saveri, Joseph)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 619 RESPONSE to #614 Motion to Seal by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. Replies due by 11/23/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kevin E. Rayhill, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5) (Saveri, Joseph)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 618 RESPONSE to #617 Notice (Other) by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Cramer, Eric)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 617 Letter re: Request for Clarification Regarding December 20, 2018 Hearing in Le v. Zuffa et al., Case No. 15-cv-01045 by Zuffa, LLC re 616 Minute Order. (Isaacson, William) Modified on 11/14/2018 (TR).
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 616 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/8/2018. At the request and agreement of counsel for the parties, IT IS ORDERED that the hearing set for November 20, 2018 is vacated and RESET to December 14, 2018 2:00 PM in LV Courtroom 7C before Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. The hearing will address #518 MOTION to Certify Class and #573 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 615 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/5/2018. IT IS ORDERED that a hearing is set for November 20, 2018 at 3:00 PM in LV Courtroom 7C before Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. The hearing will address #518 MOTION to Certify Class and #573 MOTION for Summary Judgment. A hearing is set November 20, 2018. Counsel for the parties are ordered to appear at this hearing. Failure to appear at the scheduled hearing time may result in the imposition of sanctions, including but not limited to monetary sanctions, granting of the opposing party's motion or case-dispositive sanctions. Each party shall have three days to notify the Courtroom Administrator by email at blanca_lenzi@nvd.uscourts.gov if unable to attend and propose an alternative hearing time after consulting with opposing counsel. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 614 MOTION to Seal #611 Reply, #613 Declaration,, by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stacey K. Grigsby, #2 Proposed Order) (Grigsby, Stacey)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 613 DECLARATION of Stacey K. Grigsby re #611 Reply by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 113, #3 Exhibit 114, #4 Exhibit 115, #5 Exhibit 116, #6 Exhibit 117, #7 Exhibit 118, #8 Exhibit 119, #9 Exhibit 120, #10 Exhibit 121, #11 Exhibit 122, #12 Exhibit 123, #13 Exhibit 124, #14 Exhibit 125, #15 Exhibit 126, #16 Exhibit 127, #17 Exhibit 128, #18 Exhibit 129, #19 Exhibit 130, #20 Exhibit 131, #21 Exhibit 132, #22 Exhibit 133, #23 Exhibit 134) (Grigsby, Stacey)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 611 REPLY to Response to #573 Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Isaacson, William)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 609 REPLY to Response to #602 Motion to Seal,,, by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stacey K. Grigsby, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit 37, #17 Exhibit 62, #18 Exhibit 67, #19 Exhibit 94) (Grigsby, Stacey)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 608 Joint MOTION to Seal #604 Response, by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting the Joint Motion to Provisionally Seal) (Grigsby, Stacey)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 607 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 5-1(b). ECF No. #604 , #605 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 5-1(b). Please note the signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. (no image attached) (TR)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 605 MOTION to Seal #604 Response, by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Saveri, Joseph)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 604 RESPONSE to #602 Motion to Seal,,, by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kevin Rayhill, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11) (Saveri, Joseph)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 603 ORDER Granting #599 Joint Motion to Extend Time re #596 Brief (First Request). Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 602 MOTION to Seal #596 Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stacey K. Grigsby, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit 44, #5 Exhibit 46, #6 Exhibit 48, #7 Exhibit 49, #8 Exhibit 54, #9 Exhibit 55, #10 Exhibit 59, #11 Exhibit 64, #12 Exhibit 66, #13 Exhibit 68, #14 Exhibit 69, #15 Exhibit 73, #16 Exhibit 74, #17 Exhibit 75, #18 Exhibit 82, #19 Exhibit 84, #20 Exhibit 86, #21 Exhibit 87, #22 Exhibit 88, #23 Exhibit 89, #24 Exhibit 92, #25 Exhibit 126, #26 Exhibit 128, #27 Exhibit 134, #28 Exhibit 138) (Grigsby, Stacey) Docket entry modified on 10/9/2018 pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c) to fully state title and reflect purpose of document (LN).
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 600 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/27/2018. Upon review of the record, the Court denies without prejudice the #517 Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Guy Davis, the #522 Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Andrew Zimbalist and the #524 Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Hal Singer, as premature. The Court will consider the arguments in the Motions and Responses in its review of the #518 Motion to Certify Class, however, the Court is not required to determine the admissibility of evidence in ruling on the #518 Motion to Certify Class nor does such evidence have to be admissible for consideration by the Court. See Sali v. Corona Reg'l Med. Ctr., 889 F.3d 623, 631-32 (9th Cir. 2018).(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 599 Joint MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re #596 Brief,,,,,,,,,,,, by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stacey K. Grigsby, #2 Proposed Order) (Grigsby, Stacey)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 598 MOTION to Seal #596 Brief,,,,,,,,,,,, by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cramer, Eric)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 596 RESPONSE RESPONSIVE BRIEF re #573 Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Declaration of Eric Cramer, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 Exhibit 30, #33 Exhibit 31, #34 Exhibit 32, #35 Exhibit 33, #36 Exhibit 34, #37 Exhibit 35, #38 Exhibit 36, #39 Exhibit 37, #40 Exhibit 38, #41 Exhibit 39, #42 Exhibit 40, #43 Exhibit 41, #44 Exhibit 42, #45 Exhibit 43, #46 Exhibit 44, #47 Exhibit 45, #48 Exhibit 46, #49 Exhibit 47, #50 Exhibit 48, #51 Exhibit 49, #52 Exhibit 50, #53 Exhibit 51, #54 Exhibit 52, #55 Exhibit 53, #56 Exhibit 54, #57 Exhibit 55, #58 Exhibit 56, #59 Exhibit 57, #60 Exhibit 58, #61 Exhibit 59, #62 Exhibit 60, #63 Exhibit 61, #64 Exhibit 62, #65 Exhibit 63, #66 Exhibit 64, #67 Exhibit 65, #68 Exhibit 66, #69 Exhibit 67, #70 Exhibit 68, #71 Exhibit 69, #72 Exhibit 70, #73 Exhibit 71, #74 Exhibit 72, #75 Exhibit 73, #76 Exhibit 74, #77 Exhibit 75, #78 Exhibit 76, #79 Exhibit 77, #80 Exhibit 78, #81 Exhibit 79, #82 Exhibit 80, #83 Exhibit 81, #84 Exhibit 82, #85 Exhibit 83, #86 Exhibit 84, #87 Exhibit 85, #88 Exhibit 86, #89 Exhibit 87, #90 Exhibit 88, #91 Exhibit 89, #92 Exhibit 90, #93 Exhibit 91, #94 Exhibit 92, #95 Exhibit 93, #96 Exhibit 94, #97 Exhibit 95, #98 Exhibit 96, #99 Exhibit 97, #100 Exhibit 98, #101 Exhibit 99, #102 Exhibit 100, #103 Exhibit 101, #104 Exhibit 102, #105 Exhibit 103, #106 Exhibit 104, #107 Exhibit 105, #108 Exhibit 106, #109 Exhibit 107, #110 Exhibit 108, #111 Exhibit 109, #112 Exhibit 110, #113 Exhibit 111, #114 Exhibit 112, #115 Exhibit 113, #116 Exhibit 114, #117 Exhibit 115, #118 Exhibit 116, #119 Exhibit 117, #120 Exhibit 118, #121 Exhibit 119, #122 Exhibit 120, #123 Exhibit 121, #124 Exhibit 122, #125 Exhibit 123, #126 Exhibit 124, #127 Exhibit 125, #128 Exhibit 126, #129 Exhibit 127, #130 Exhibit 128, #131 Exhibit 129, #132 Exhibit 130, #133 Exhibit 131, #134 Exhibit 132, #135 Exhibit 133, #136 Exhibit 134, #137 Exhibit 135, #138 Exhibit 136, #139 Exhibit 137, #140 Exhibit 138, #141 Exhibit 139, #142 Exhibit 140, #143 Exhibit 141) (Cramer, Eric) Modified on 9/24/2018 (TR).
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 595 NON-OPPOSITION to #591 Motion for Leave to File Document by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Grigsby, Stacey)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 594 ORDER Granting #590 Joint Motion to Extend Time re #573 Motion for Summary Judgment (First Request). See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 593 RESPONSE to #592 Motion for Leave to File Document by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. Replies due by 9/7/2018. (Rayhill, Kevin)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 592 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority re #577 Motion to Seal by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Grigsby, Stacey)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 591 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply re #589 Reply by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rayhill, Kevin)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 590 Joint MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) for Summary Judgment Opposition and Reply Brief Deadlines and For Leave to File Summary Judgment Briefing Materials in Excess of Page Limits Imposed by Local Rule 7-3 re #573 Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric L. Cramer, Esq., #2 Proposed Order) (Cramer, Eric)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 589 REPLY to Response to #577 Motion to Seal by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ali Abdelaziz) (Grigsby, Stacey)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 588 Joint MOTION to Seal #581 Response,, by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Grigsby, Stacey)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 587 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Filer's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. #586 , #585 . Attorneys Michael Dell'Angelo, Eric Cramer, Patrick F. Madden and Mark R. Suter are advised to review and update his/her user account information. (no image attached) (TR)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 586 Corrected NOTICE of Change of Address by Michael C. Dell'Angelo. (Dell'Angelo, Michael)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 585 NOTICE of Change of Address by Michael C. Dell'Angelo. (Dell'Angelo, Michael)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 584 ORDER Granting #580 Motion to Remove Attorney Justin C. Jones from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 582 MOTION to Seal #581 Response,, by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rayhill, Kevin)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 581 RESPONSE to #577 Motion to Seal by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. Replies due by 8/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Kevin E. Rayhill ISO Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Seal, #2 Appendix Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10) (Rayhill, Kevin)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 580 MOTION to remove attorney Justin C. Jones from the Electronic Service List in this case by Plaintiff Cung Le. (Jones, Justin)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 579 RESPONSE to #571 Motion for Leave to File Document, by Defendant Zuffa, LLC.. Replies due by 8/9/2018. (Grigsby, Stacey)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 578 FIRST NOTICE: of Non-Compliance with Local Rule IC 2-1: that John D. Radice is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1 (a)(d). Attorneys advised to visit the Courts website at www.nvd.uscourts.gov, then select Register for CM/ECF located under the Attorneys section of the Courts web page to register for CM/ECF (no image attached) (RFJ)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 577 MOTION to Seal #575 Exhibit, #574 Declaration re: #573 Motion for Summary Judgment; filed by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stacey K. Grigsby, #2 Proposed Order) (Grigsby, Stacey)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 575 EXHIBIT 51 to #573 Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 52, #2 Exhibit 53, #3 Exhibit 54, #4 Exhibit 55, #5 Exhibit 56, #6 Exhibit 57, #7 Exhibit 58, #8 Exhibit 59, #9 Exhibit 60, #10 Exhibit 61, #11 Exhibit 62, #12 Exhibit 63, #13 Exhibit 64, #14 Exhibit 65, #15 Exhibit 66, #16 Exhibit 67, #17 Exhibit 68, #18 Exhibit 69, #19 Exhibit 70, #20 Exhibit 71, #21 Exhibit 72, #22 Exhibit 73, #23 Exhibit 74, #24 Exhibit 75, #25 Exhibit 76, #26 Exhibit 77, #27 Exhibit 78, #28 Exhibit 79, #29 Exhibit 80, #30 Exhibit 81, #31 Exhibit 82, #32 Exhibit 83, #33 Exhibit 84, #34 Exhibit 85, #35 Exhibit 86, #36 Exhibit 87, #37 Exhibit 88, #38 Exhibit 89, #39 Exhibit 90, #40 Exhibit 91, #41 Exhibit 92, #42 Exhibit 93, #43 Exhibit 94, #44 Exhibit 95, #45 Exhibit 96, #46 Exhibit 97, #47 Exhibit 98, #48 Exhibit 99, #49 Exhibit 100, #50 Exhibit 101, #51 Exhibit 102, #52 Exhibit 103, #53 Exhibit 104, #54 Exhibit 105, #55 Exhibit 106, #56 Exhibit 107, #57 Exhibit 108, #58 Exhibit 109, #59 Exhibit 110, #60 Exhibit 111, #61 Exhibit 112) (Jaffe Nero, Suzanne)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 574 DECLARATION of Suzanne Nero re #573 Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit 41, #43 Exhibit 42, #44 Exhibit 43, #45 Exhibit 44, #46 Exhibit 45, #47 Exhibit 46, #48 Exhibit 47, #49 Exhibit 48, #50 Exhibit 49, #51 Exhibit 50) (Jaffe Nero, Suzanne)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 573 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. Responses due by 8/20/2018. (Isaacson, William)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 571 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental re: #558 RESPONSE to #557 Motion to Seal; filed by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Rayhill, Kevin)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 570 JOINT MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re: MOTION for Summary Judgment; filed by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nicholas A. Widnell, #2 Proposed Order) (Widnell, Nicholas)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 569 RESPONSE to #568 Motion for Leave to File Document by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Cramer, Eric) ERROR: Document not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c) by Attorney Eric L. Cramer. CORRECTION: Court corrected the event pursuant to the local rule regarding electronic filing on 7/27/2018 (RFJ).
July 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 568 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental re #524 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony, filed by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Widnell, Nicholas)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 566 Joint MOTION to Seal #565 Reply, by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Rayhill Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1 - UFC 145 Wikipedia, #3 Exhibit 2 - UFC 164 Wikipedia, #4 Exhibit 3 - UFC 209 Wikipedia, #5 Exhibit 4 - UFC 213 Wikipedia, #6 Proposed Order) (Grigsby, Stacey)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 565 REPLY to Response to #557 Motion to Seal, by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stacey K. Grigsby, #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12) (Grigsby, Stacey)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 563 FIRST STIPULATION to Forego re: #557 Motion to Seal, #558 Reply and #559 Motion to Seal; filed by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Rayhill, Kevin)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 561 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #558 Reply,,, by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Rayhill, Kevin)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 559 MOTION to Seal #558 Reply,,, by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rayhill, Kevin)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 558 RESPONSE to #557 Motion to Seal, filed by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29) (Rayhill, Kevin) Modified on 6/19/2018 (JM). Corrected image #561 attached on 6/20/2018 (RFJ).
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 557 MOTION to Seal #554 Reply, by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stacey K. Grigsby in Support of Motion to Seal Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification) (Grigsby, Stacey)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 555 MOTION to Seal #554 Reply, by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cramer, Eric)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 554 REPLY to Response to #518 Motion to Certify Class,,,, by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric L. Cramer, Esq. ("CD3"), #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit 86, #4 Exhibit 87, #5 Exhibit 88, #6 Exhibit 89) (Cramer, Eric)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 553 NON-OPPOSITION to #552 Motion to Seal by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Rayhill, Kevin)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 552 MOTION to Seal #549 Reply, #551 Reply, #547 Reply by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Widnell, Nicholas)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 551 REPLY to Response to #524 Motion,,,, by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nicholas A. Widnell, #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit 37, #4 Exhibit 38, #5 Exhibit 39, #6 Exhibit 40, #7 Exhibit 41, #8 Exhibit 42, #9 Exhibit 43, #10 Exhibit 44, #11 Exhibit 45, #12 Exhibit 46, #13 Exhibit 47, #14 Exhibit 48, #15 Exhibit 49, #16 Exhibit 50, #17 Exhibit 51) (Widnell, Nicholas)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 549 REPLY to Response to #522 Motion, by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nicholas A. Widnell, #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit 15) (Widnell, Nicholas)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 547 REPLY to Response to #517 Motion, by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stacey K. Grigsby, #2 Exhibit 1) (Grigsby, Stacey)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 545 Joint MOTION To Supplement Expert Reports by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. Responses due by 5/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Widnell, Nicholas)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 544 NON-OPPOSITION to #542 Motion to Seal by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Rayhill, Kevin)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 543 NON-OPPOSITION to #541 Motion to Seal by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Rayhill, Kevin)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 542 MOTION to Seal #535 Response, #534 Response,,,, by Defendant Zuffa, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grigsby, Stacey)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 541 MOTION to Seal #540 Response,,,,,,,,,,, by Defendant Zuffa, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal)(Grigsby, Stacey)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 540 RESPONSE to #518 Motion to Certify Class,,,, by Defendant Zuffa, LLC.. Replies due by 4/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William Isaacson, #2 Declaration of Stacey Grigsby, #3 Declaration of Brent K. Nakamura, #4 Appendix of Exhibits, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit 8, #13 Exhibit 9, #14 Exhibit 10, #15 Exhibit 11, #16 Exhibit 12, #17 Exhibit 13, #18 Exhibit 14, #19 Exhibit 15, #20 Exhibit 16, #21 Exhibit 17, #22 Exhibit 18, #23 Exhibit 19, #24 Exhibit 20, #25 Exhibit 21, #26 Exhibit 22, #27 Exhibit 23, #28 Exhibit 24, #29 Exhibit 25, #30 Exhibit 26, #31 Exhibit 27, #32 Exhibit 28, #33 Exhibit 29, #34 Exhibit 30, #35 Exhibit 31, #36 Exhibit 32, #37 Exhibit 33, #38 Exhibit 34, #39 Exhibit 35, #40 Exhibit 36, #41 Exhibit 37, #42 Exhibit 38, #43 Exhibit 39, #44 Exhibit 40, #45 Exhibit 41, #46 Exhibit 42, #47 Exhibit 43, #48 Exhibit 44, #49 Exhibit 45, #50 Exhibit 46, #51 Exhibit 47, #52 Exhibit 48, #53 Exhibit 49, #54 Exhibit 50, #55 Exhibit 51, #56 Exhibit 52, #57 Exhibit 53, #58 Exhibit 54, #59 Exhibit 55, #60 Exhibit 56, #61 Exhibit 57, #62 Exhibit 58, #63 Exhibit 59, #64 Exhibit 60, #65 Exhibit 61, #66 Exhibit 62, #67 Exhibit 63, #68 Exhibit 64, #69 Exhibit 65, #70 Exhibit 66, #71 Exhibit 67, #72 Exhibit 68, #73 Exhibit 69, #74 Exhibit 70, #75 Exhibit 71, #76 Exhibit 72, #77 Exhibit 73, #78 Exhibit 74, #79 Exhibit 75, #80 Exhibit 76, #81 Exhibit 77, #82 Exhibit 78, #83 Exhibit 79, #84 Exhibit 80, #85 Exhibit 81, #86 Exhibit 82, #87 Exhibit 83, #88 Exhibit 84, #89 Exhibit 85, #90 Exhibit 86, #91 Exhibit 87, #92 Exhibit 88, #93 Exhibit 89, #94 Exhibit 90, #95 Exhibit 91, #96 Exhibit 92, #97 Exhibit 93, #98 Exhibit 94, #99 Exhibit 95, #100 Exhibit 96, #101 Exhibit 97, #102 Exhibit 98, #103 Exhibit 99, #104 Exhibit 100, #105 Exhibit 101, #106 Exhibit 102, #107 Exhibit 103, #108 Exhibit 104, #109 Exhibit 105, #110 Exhibit 106, #111 Exhibit 107, #112 Exhibit 108, #113 Exhibit 109, #114 Exhibit 110, #115 Exhibit 111, #116 Exhibit 112, #117 Exhibit 113, #118 Exhibit 114, #119 Exhibit 115, #120 Exhibit 116, #121 Exhibit 117, #122 Exhibit 118, #123 Exhibit 119, #124 Exhibit 120, #125 Exhibit 121, #126 Exhibit 122, #127 Exhibit 123, #128 Exhibit 124, #129 Exhibit 125, #130 Exhibit 126, #131 Exhibit 127, #132 Exhibit 128, #133 Exhibit 129, #134 Exhibit 130, #135 Exhibit 131, #136 Exhibit 132, #137 Exhibit 133, #138 Exhibit 134, #139 Exhibit 135, #140 Exhibit 136, #141 Exhibit 137, #142 Exhibit 138)(Isaacson, William)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 536 MOTION to Seal #535 Response, #534 Response,,,, by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cramer, Eric)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 535 RESPONSE to #517 Motion, by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. Replies due by 4/13/2018. (Cramer, Eric)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 534 RESPONSE to #522 Motion, #524 Motion,,,, by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. Replies due by 4/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric L. Cramer ("CD2"), #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit 49, #4 Exhibit 50, #5 Exhibit 51, #6 Exhibit 52, #7 Exhibit 53, #8 Exhibit 54, #9 Exhibit 55, #10 Errata 56, #11 Exhibit 57, #12 Exhibit 58, #13 Exhibit 59, #14 Exhibit 60, #15 Exhibit 61, #16 Exhibit 62, #17 Exhibit 63, #18 Exhibit 64, #19 Exhibit 65, #20 Exhibit 66, #21 Exhibit 67, #22 Exhibit 68, #23 Exhibit 69, #24 Exhibit 70, #25 Exhibit 71, #26 Exhibit 72, #27 Exhibit 73, #28 Exhibit 74, #29 Exhibit 75, #30 Exhibit 76, #31 Exhibit 77, #32 Exhibit 78, #33 Exhibit 79, #34 Exhibit 80, #35 Exhibit 81, #36 Exhibit 82, #37 Exhibit 83, #38 Exhibit 84, #39 Exhibit 85) (Cramer, Eric)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 533 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/29/2018. IT IS ORDERED that #390 , #519 , #525 , #527 , and #529 Motions to Seal are GRANTED.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 532 ORDER granting #514 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CVL)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 531 RESPONSE to #527 Motion to Seal by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. Replies due by 3/14/2018. (Rayhill, Kevin)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 530 RESPONSE to #525 Motion to Seal by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. Replies due by 3/9/2018. (Rayhill, Kevin)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 529 MOTION to Seal #524 Motion,,,, by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Widnell, Nicholas)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 528 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #524 Motion,,,, by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Widnell, Nicholas)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 527 MOTION to Seal #518 Motion to Certify Class,,,, by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Widnell, Nicholas)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 526 FIRST NOTICE: of Non-Compliance with Local Rule IC 2-1 Joseph R. Saveri is in violation of LR IC 2-1(g). VIOLATION: Your CM/ECF account address information is different from the address information as provided within #515 NOTICE of Change of Address. Pursuant Local Rule IC 2-1(g), it is the responsibility of all attorneys to maintain and update their information in the case file and the CM/ECF system. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to review and update your CM/ECF account, pursuant to LR IC 2-1(g). (no image attached) (TR)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 525 MOTION to Seal #524 Motion,,, #522 Motion, #517 Motion, by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nicholas A. Widnell in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order) (Widnell, Nicholas)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 524 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Hal Singer by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. Responses due by 3/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Declaration of Nicholas A. Widnell in Support of Motion to Exclude, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 Exhibit 30, #33 Exhibit 31, #34 Exhibit 32, #35 Exhibit 33, #36 Exhibit 34, #37 Exhibit 35, #38 Exhibit 36) (Widnell, Nicholas) Modified on 2/26/2018 to restrict access to attachment 5, Exhibit 3, attorney to file Motion to Seal (TR). Corrected Image #528 for Attachment 5 (Exhibit 3) Attached on 2/26/2018 to attach(TR).
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 522 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. Andrew Zimbalist by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. Responses due by 3/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Declaration of Nicholas A. Widnell, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14) (Widnell, Nicholas)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 519 MOTION to Seal #518 Motion to Certify Class,,,, by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cramer, Eric)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 518 MOTION to Certify Class Responses due by 3/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric Cramer, #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27, #30 Exhibit 28, #31 Exhibit 29, #32 Exhibit 30, #33 Exhibit 31, #34 Exhibit 32, #35 Exhibit 33, #36 Exhibit 34, #37 Exhibit 35, #38 Exhibit 36, #39 Exhibit 37, #40 Exhibit 38, #41 Exhibit 39, #42 Exhibit 40, #43 Exhibit 41, #44 Exhibit 42, #45 Exhibit 43, #46 Exhibit 44, #47 Exhibit 45, #48 Exhibit 46, #49 Exhibit 47, #50 Exhibit 48) (Cramer, Eric)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 517 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Guy Davis by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. Responses due by 3/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Declaration of Nicholas A. Widnell, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5) (Grigsby, Stacey)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 515 NOTICE of Change of Address by Joseph R. Saveri. (Saveri, Joseph)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 514 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re:Daubert Motion Briefing Materials by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nicholas A. Widnell, #2 Proposed Order) (Widnell, Nicholas) Docket entry modified on 2/15/2018 to accurately describe title/purpose of document pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c). (LN)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 513 ORDER Granting #512 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. See Order for deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 512 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by Defendant Zuffa, LLC (Stipulated) (Grigsby, Stacey)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 511 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/28/2017. IT IS ORDERED that #509 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages is granted. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CVL)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 510 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that #485 , #487 , #498 the parties' Motions to Seal are GRANTED. 486 Plaintiffs' Sealed Exhibits and 499 Sealed Unredacted Notice of Resolution shall remain under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/16/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 509 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patrick F. Madden, #2 Proposed Order) (Madden, Patrick)
November 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 508 ORDER Granting #507 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. See Order for deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/3/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 507 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order filed by Defendant Zuffa, LLC (Stipulated). (Grigsby, Stacey)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 506 NOTICE OF RELATED CASES 2:17-cv-02657-JAD-PAL by Consol Plaintiffs Mac Danzig, Pablo Garza, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Kyle Kingsbury, Gabe Ruediger, Darren Uyenoyama, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry. (Springmeyer, Don)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 505 ORDER Granting #503 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mark R. Suter for Nathan Quarry and approving Designation of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/11/17. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 503 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Mark R. Suter and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-4802119) filed by Consol Plaintiffs Mac Danzig, Pablo Garza, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Kyle Kingsbury, Gabe Ruediger, Darren Uyenoyama, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry . (Springmeyer, Don)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 502 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 500 Order on Motion to Compel, Motion Hearing, held on 9/28/2017, before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Patricia Ganci, PG@nvd.uscourts.gov. Court Reporter/Transcriber: P. Any Redaction Request is due by 10/25/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline is set for 11/4/2017. Release of the Transcript Restriction is set for 1/2/2018. Before release date, the transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the reporter/transcriber. Transcript Order form is available on court website. After that date it may be obtained through the court reporter or PACER. (PG)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 501 Letter of Request for International Judicial Assistance from the Supreme Court of Singapore dated 9/18/2017. (MR)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 500 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 9/28/2017 before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen.. Crtrm Administrator: Jeff Miller; Pla Counsel: Don Springmeyer, Esq., Kevin Rayhill, Esq., Jiamin Chen, Esq.; Def Counsel: Suzanne Jaffe Nero, Esq., Stacey Grigsby, Esq., Phil Erwin, Esq.; Recording start and end times: 9:31:50 - 10:29:33; Courtroom: 3B; Pursuant to Notice #497 , the parties have indicated that Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel #470 has been resolved. The Court hears the arguments of Counsel regarding Plaintiffs' EMERGENCY Motion to Compel #443 . After hearing the respective positions of Counsel, IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiffs' EMERGENCY Motion to Compel #443 is DENIED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAM)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 498 MOTION to Seal #497 Notice (Other) of Resolution by Consol Plaintiffs Mac Danzig, Pablo Garza, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Kyle Kingsbury, Gabe Ruediger, Darren Uyenoyama, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Maysey, Robert)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 497 NOTICE of Resolution re #470 Motion to Compel, filed by Mac Danzig, Jon Fitch, Pablo Garza, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Kyle Kingsbury, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Gabe Ruediger, Darren Uyenoyama, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Maysey, Robert)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 504 ORDER Granting #368 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/26/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 496 ORDER Granting #366 Motion to Seal re #365 Response to Motion. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/26/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 495 ORDER Granting #349 Motion to Seal re #347 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/26/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 494 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 492 Motion Hearing, held on 9/21/2017, before Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Court Reporter: Patricia L. Ganci pattyganci@gmail.com. Any Redaction Request is due by 10/17/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline is set for 10/27/2017. Release of the Transcript Restriction is set for 12/25/2017. Before release date, the transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the reporter. Transcript Order form is available on court website. After that date it may be obtained through the court reporter or PACER. (PG)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 493 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II, on 9/26/2017. The Court finds it premature to rule on the #347 and 348 Motions for Partial Summary Judgment at this time. The arguments raised in these motions would be more properly considered with the full set of motions that will be filed at the close of discovery. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the #347 and 348 Motions for Partial Summary Judgment are DENIED without prejudice to being refiled at the close of discovery. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the #349 , #366 , and #368 Motions to Seal are GRANTED for the reasons stated in the respective motions. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 491 ORDER Granting #483 Stipulation for Extension of Time re #470 Motion to Compel (First Request). Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/25/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 492 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 9/21/2017 before the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Crtrm Administrator: Blanca Lenzi; Pla Counsel: Don Springmeyer, Esq., Michael Dell'Angelo, Esq., Jertome Elwell, Esq., Richard Koffman, Esq., Jiamen Chen, Esq.; Def Counsel: J. Colby Williams, Esq., Donald Campbell, Esq., William Isaacson, Esq., Nicholas Widnell, Esq., Evan North, Esq.; Court Reporter/Recorder: Patty Ganci; Time of Hearing: 4:10PM - 5:12PM; Courtroom: 7D. The Court makes preliminary statements and hears representation of counsel regarding 348 SEALED Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #347 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #349 Motion to Seal #347 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The Court takes the motions under submission. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CVL)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 490 ORDER Granting #489 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jiamin Chen for Mac Danzig, Jon Fitch, Pablo Garza, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Kyle Kingsbury, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Gabe Ruediger, Darren Uyenoyama, Luis Javier Vazquez, and Brandon Vera and approving Designation of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/21/17. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 489 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jiamie Chen and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-4783890) filed by Consol Plaintiffs Mac Danzig, Pablo Garza, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Kyle Kingsbury, Gabe Ruediger, Darren Uyenoyama, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry . (Springmeyer, Don)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 488 NOTICE of Hearing on #443 Emergency MOTION to Compel : Motion Hearing set for 9/28/2017 at 9:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen, to be heard in conjunction with the #470 Motion to Compel Deposition currently set for the same date and time.(no image attached)(TKH)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 487 MOTION to Seal #484 Reply to Response to Motion,, by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grigsby, Stacey)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 485 MOTION to Seal #484 Reply to Response to Motion,, by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Maysey, Robert)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 484 REPLY to Response to #470 Motion to Compel,,, filed by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert C. Maysey, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15)(Maysey, Robert) Modified on 11/16/2017 to Seal #484 -13, 14, 15, 16 per #510 Order (MR).
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 483 FIRST STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re #470 Motion to Compel, filed by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Saveri, Joseph)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 482 Copy of LETTER from Supreme Court of Singapore to the Attorney General's Chambers dated 8/1/2017. (MR)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 481 RESPONSE to #470 Motion to Compel,,,, filed by Defendants Robert Arum, Top Rank, Inc.. Replies due by 8/30/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David J. Marroso with Exhibits 1-2, #2 Declaration of Harrison Whitman, #3 Proposed Order)(Hone, Eric)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 480 ORDER Granting #478 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David Marroso for Robert Arum and Top Rank, Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel Eric D. Hone. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/22/17. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 479 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Phone Conference re: Scheduling held on 8/18/2017 before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Crtrm Administrator: Teresa Hoskin; Pla Counsel: Rob Maysey, Jerome Elwell; Def Counsel: Stacey Grigsby; Non-Parties Counsel: David Marroso; Court Reporter/Recorder: None; Time of Hearing: 10:00 - 10:17 a.m. IT IS ORDERED that the hearing currently set for 9/7/2017, on #470 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents is VACATED and CONTINUED to 9/28/2017, at 9:30 a.m. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 478 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by David Marroso and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Eric D. Hone (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-4740667) filed by Defendants Top Rank, Inc., Robert Arum . (Hone, Eric)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 477 ERRATA to #470 Motion to Compel filed by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Motion to Compel)(Maysey, Robert)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 476 ERRATA to #470 Motion to Compel; filed by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Maysey, Robert)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 475 RESPONSE to #470 Motion to Compel,,,, filed by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. Replies due by 8/21/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel to Top Rank, Inc.)(Grigsby, Stacey)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 474 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that #444 , #447 , #457 , #465 , #469 the parties' Motions to Seal are GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The Clerk of the Court shall UNSEAL #445 -10 Exhibit 17 to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/9/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 473 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that #434 , #439 the parties' Motions to Seal are GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The Clerk of the Court shall UNSEAL #435 -2 Exhibit 2. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/9/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 472 IT IS ORDERED that Non-Party Top Rank shall have until August 23, 2017 to file a response to the #470 Motion to Compel, and Plaintiff shall have until August 30, 2017, to file a reply.A hearing on the #470 MOTION to Compel is set for 9/7/2017 at 9:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (no image attached)(TKH)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 471 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Zuffa shall produce the six documents referred to in this order no later than 12:00 PM PDT on 8/7/2017. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/4/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 470 MOTION to Compel re: Discovery; filed by Consol Plaintiffs Mac Danzig, Pablo Garza, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Kyle Kingsbury, Gabe Ruediger, Darren Uyenoyama, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry. Responses due by 8/14/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert C. Maysey, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration, #8 Exhibit 7 to Declaration, #9 Exhibit 8 to Declaration, #10 Exhibit 9 to Declaration, #11 Exhibit 10 to Declaration, #12 Exhibit 11 to Declaration, #13 Exhibit 12 to Declaration, #14 Exhibit 13 to Declaration, #15 Exhibit 14 to Declaration, #16 Exhibit 15 to Declaration, #17 Exhibit 16 to Declaration, #18 Proposed Order)(Maysey, Robert)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 469 MOTION to Seal #468 Errata, by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grigsby, Stacey)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 468 ERRATA to #464 Reply to Response to Motion, ; filed by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Reply Brief, #2 Corrected Saveri Declaration)(Saveri, Joseph)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 465 MOTION to Seal #464 Reply to Response to Motion, by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rayhill, Kevin)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 464 REPLY to Response to #443 Motion to Compel,, filed by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Joseph R. Saveri ISO Plaintiffs' Reply, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11)(Saveri, Joseph)
July 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 463 NOTICE of Amended Certificate of Service by Zuffa, LLC re #456 Response to Motion,. (Grigsby, Stacey)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 462 ORDER Granting #453 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John D. Radice for Nathan Quarry and approving Designation of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/21/17. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 461 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #453 Verified Petition, by Consol Plaintiffs Mac Danzig, Pablo Garza, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Kyle Kingsbury, Gabe Ruediger, Darren Uyenoyama, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Springmeyer, Don)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 460 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, held on July 13, 2017, before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Court Transcriber: Kathy Eismann, KE@nvd.uscourts.gov. Any Redaction Request is due by 8/9/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline is set for 8/19/2017. Release of the Transcript Restriction is set for 10/17/2017. Before release date, the transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the transcriber. Transcript Order form is available on court website. After that date it may be obtained through the court reporter or PACER. (KE)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 459 NOTICE of Manual Filing by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. Certain Documents manually filed with the Clerk's Office. (Grigsby, Stacey)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 457 MOTION to Seal #456 Response to Motion, to Compel by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grigsby, Stacey)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 456 RESPONSE to #443 Motion to Compel,,, filed by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. Replies due by 7/21/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stacey Grigsby, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16)(Grigsby, Stacey)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 467 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Status Conference held on 7/13/2017 before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen.. Crtrm Administrator: Jeff Miller; Pla Counsel: Joseph Saveri, Esq., Eric Cramer, Esq.; Def Counsel: J. Williams, Esq., Marcy Lynch, Esq., Stacey Grigsby, Esq., Brent Nakamura, Esq.; Recording start and end times: 1:47:42 - 3:02:44; Courtroom: 3B; The Court has reviewed Counsels' Letter #450 requesting a dispute resolution, as well as Joint Status Report #454 . The Court will treat the Letter as Zuffa's Motion to Modify and Narrow, and hears arguments from Counsel. IT IS ORDERED: The Court will GRANT Zuffa's Motion to Modify #450 as stated in open court, IT IS ORDERED: The Court will require Zuffa to produce 25% of the privileged documents regarding Dana White, as specified in open court, to the Court as an in-camera submission, including a spreadsheet, by no later than 7/17/2017 at 12:00pm. Zuffa shall serve opposing Counsel with the cover sheet of the production. Counsel make additional representations. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAM)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 455 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II, on 7/13/2017. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a ruling on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and Designation of Local Counsel #453 is DEFERRED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner Don Springmeyer shall provide a current Certificate of Good Standing from EACH state in which Petitioner has been admitted to practice law, in accordance with the instruction set forth on Page 2, No. 3 of the Verified Petition For Permission To Practice In This Case Only By Attorney Not Admitted To The Bar Of This Court And Designation Of Local Counsel. Judge Boulware requires provision of Certificate(s) of Good Standing that have been issued within the last six months, in order for the certificates to be considered current. Petitioner's submission #453 was not issued within the last six months. Petitioner shall have 14 days from the entry of this order to file the corrected Verified Petition using the "Notice of Corrected Image/Document" event. Failure to timely remedy this deficiency will result in the denial of the Verified Petition, and Petitioner will be required to refile and to repay the filing fee. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CVL)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 454 Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Saveri, Joseph)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 453 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by John D. Radice and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-4685995) filed by Consol Plaintiffs Mac Danzig, Pablo Garza, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Kyle Kingsbury, Gabe Ruediger, Darren Uyenoyama, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry . (Springmeyer, Don) Corrected image #461 attached on 7/21/2017 (RFJ).
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 452 ORDER Granting #448 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Matthew Sinclair Weiler withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/11/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 451 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II, on 7/11/2017. At the request and consent of the parties, IT IS ORDERED that a hearing regarding #347 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, 348 SEALED MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and #349 MOTION to Seal #347 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, set for August 29, 2017 is vacated and RESET to September 21, 2017 at 4:00 PM in LV Courtroom 7D before Judge Richard F. Boulware, II.A hearing is for September 21, 2017. Counsel for the parties are ordered to appear at this hearing. Failure to appear at the scheduled hearing time may result in the imposition of sanctions, including but not limited to monetary sanctions, granting of the opposing party's motion or case-dispositive sanctions. Each party shall have three days to notify the Courtroom Administrator by email at blanca_lenzi@nvd.uscourts.gov if unable to attend and propose an alternative hearing time after consulting with opposing counsel.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 450 STATEMENT of Joint Statement re Custodian of Records Deposition by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grigsby, Stacey)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 449 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II, on 7/7/2017. IT IS ORDERED that a hearing regarding #347 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, 348 SEALED MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and #349 MOTION to Seal #347 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, is set for August 29, 2017 at 4:00 PM in LV Courtroom 7D before Judge Richard F. Boulware, II.A hearing is for August 29, 2017. Counsel for the parties are ordered to appear at this hearing. Failure to appear at the scheduled hearing time may result in the imposition of sanctions, including but not limited to monetary sanctions, granting of the opposing party's motion or case-dispositive sanctions. Each party shall have three days to notify the Courtroom Administrator by email at blanca_lenzi@nvd.uscourts.gov if unable to attend and propose an alternative hearing time after consulting with opposing counsel. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 448 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Matthew S. Weiler by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw Matthew S. Weiler as Counsel of Record)(Rayhill, Kevin)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 447 MOTION to Seal #443 Motion to Compel, by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 [REDACTED], #2 Exhibit 5 [REDACTED], #3 Proposed Order)(Grigsby, Stacey)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 446 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Hearing re Dispute Resolution Conference held on 6/30/17 before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Crtrm Administrator: Teresa Hoskin; Pla Counsel: Patrick Madden, Kevin Rayhill, Matthew Weiler; Def Counsel: Stacey Grigsby, Evan Norris, Nicholas Widnell; Court Reporter/Recorder: None; Time of Hearing: 9:30 - 10:03 A.M. See minutes for details. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 445 SEALED EXHIBIT(s) to #443 Motion to Compel,, #444 Motion to Seal ; filed by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs Emergency Motion To Compel Production of Documents Withheld on Privilege Grounds and for Other Relief, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit)(Saveri, Joseph) Modified to UNSEAL Exhibit 17 per #474 Order on 8/10/2017 (MR).
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 444 MOTION to Seal #443 Motion to Compel,, by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Joseph)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 443 Emergency MOTION to Compel, filed by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. Responses due by 7/14/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew S. Weiler, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Joseph)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 442 ORDER re #436 , #437 Letters. IT IS ORDERED that plaintiffs are authorized to serve a subpoena and subpoena duces tecum to secure the testimony of Matt Hume, and obtain discoverable documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/29/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 441 LETTER of Request for Documents from Group One Holdings Pte. Ltd. re #440 Order on Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 440 ORDER granting #433 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 439 MOTION to Seal #433 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory, by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stacey Grigsby, #2 Exhibit 8, #3 Proposed Order)(Grigsby, Stacey)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 438 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 422 Order on Motion, Order on Motion to Extend Time/Shorten Time regarding Discovery or Nondispositive matter, Order on Motion to Compel, Motion Hearing, held on 6/1/2017, before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Patricia L. Ganci pattyganci@gmail.com. Any Redaction Request is due by 7/12/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline is set for 7/22/2017. Release of the Transcript Restriction is set for 9/19/2017. Before release date, the transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the reporter/transcriber. Transcript Order form is available on court website. After that date it may be obtained through the court reporter or PACER. (PG)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 437 MEMORANDUM Letter in Response to #436 Letter. (Grigsby, Stacey) Modified event on 6/21/2017 (TR).
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 436 MEMORANDUM Letter Requesting Clarification re June Hearing, filed by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Rayhill, Kevin) Modified event on 6/21/2017 (TR).
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 435 SEALED EXHIBIT(s) to #433 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory, #434 Motion to Seal ; filed by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs Emergency Motion For Letter of Request, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 7, #4 Exhibit 8)(Rayhill, Kevin) Modified to UNSEAL Exhibit 2 per #473 Order on 8/10/2017 (MR).
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 434 MOTION to Seal #433 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory, by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rayhill, Kevin)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 433 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory, filed by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - Letter of Request, #2 Declaration of Kevin E. Rayhill, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8)(Rayhill, Kevin)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 430 NOTICE OF FIRM NAME CHANGE by Mac Danzig, Gabe Ruediger. (Spector, Eugene)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 432 ORDER Granting #428 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. See Order for deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/14/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 431 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that #398 , #403 , #411 , #416 , #425 the parties' Motions to Seal related to #395 the Motion to Compel are GRANTED. Plaintiffs' Motion to Seal 419 as it relates to 414 the Motion to Extend Duration of Depositions is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/13/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 429 ORDER that Bellator's #1 Motion to Quash Subpoenas is Denied and Bellator's #1 Motion to Modify Subpoenas is Granted. Plaintiffs' #26 Motion to Compel Documents is Denied. Bellator shall have until 7/5/2017 to produce all responsive information required by this order and all documents responsive to the subpoenas (documents filed in 2:17-cv-00849-RFB-PAL; see Order for specific details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 428 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera (STIPULATED). (Madden, Patrick)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 427 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER Modifying Subpoenas as to Non-Party Bellator Sport Worldwide, LLC. (DKJ)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 426 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Challenge Work Product Designation 281 , #282 is GRANTED and Zuffa shall produce the three disputed documents. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that #296 , #298 , #305 , #308 , #310 the parties' Motions related to this motion are GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/9/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 425 MOTION to Seal 415 Reply to Response to Motion, by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stacey K. Grigsby in Support of Zuffa, LLC's Motion to Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant to Produce a Log of Communications, #2 Proposed Order Granting Zuffa, LLC's Motion to Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant to Produce a Log of Communications, #3 Exhibit 40 to the Declaration of Stacy K. Grigsby, #4 Exhibit 41 to the Declaration of Stacy K. Grigsby, #5 Exhibit 42 to the Declaration of Stacy K. Grigsby)(Grigsby, Stacey)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 424 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER filed by Plaintiffs Cung Le, Nathan Quarry Plaintiffs' Proposed Order Modifying Their Subpoena to Bellator. (Weiler, Matthew)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 423 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER filed by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. re Motion to Quash or Modify Subpoenas (in related matter 17-cv-0849) (Widnell, Nicholas)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 422 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 6/1/2017 before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Crtrm Administrator: Jeff Miller; Pla Counsel: Don Springmeyer, Esq., Michael Dell'Angelo, Esq., Matthew Weiler, Esq., Joseph Saveri, Esq., Eric Cramer, Esq., Robert Maysey, Esq.; Def Counsel: J. Williams, Esq., Marcy Lynch, Esq., Stacey Grigsby, Esq., Nicholas Widnell, Esq., Brent Nakamura, Esq.; Recording start and end times: 9:32:39 - 11:11:12, 11:22:56 - 12:21:16; Courtroom: 3B; Attorney Phillip Kelly is present representing Bellator. The Court summarizes the matters scheduled to be heard during today's proceedings. As an initial matter, IT IS ORDERED: Request for Status Conference #393 is GRANTED. The Court first hears the arguments of Counsel in regards to Non-Party Bellator's Motion to Quash #1 and Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel #26 (filed in related action 2:17-cv-0849-RFB-PAL). IT IS ORDERED: Non-Party Bellator's Motion to Quash #1 is DENIED in regards to the Request to Quash and GRANTED in regards to the Request to Modify Subpoenas with respect to Bellator data, IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel #26 is DENIED. The parties will have until 5:00pm on Monday, 6/05/2017, in which to file a Proposed Order outlining what is being proposed to be produced as a reasonable accommodation and compromise as discussed in open court. If the parties cannot concur on a single proposed form of order, they are permitted to submit competing proposals and the Court will determine the final form of order. The Court next addresses Plaintiffs' Motion to Challenge Work Product Designation #282 . The Court remind Counsel that, pursuant to Local Rule IA 7-1(a), an attorney may send a letter or other notice to the Court if a Motion has been fully briefed for longer than 90 days and no written ruling has issued. The Court encourages Counsel to utilize the provisions of this Local Rule if necessary. The Court informs Counsel that a separate written Order will issue in regards to Plaintiffs' Motion to Challenge... #282 , but that the Court intends to GRANT the Motion. Plaintiffs' Counsel notes that there are many other identified documents in the Privilege Log that relates to the Mercer challenge. The Court will not give Counsel an advisory ruling and makes additional remarks.The Court next hears the arguments of Counsel regarding Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel #395 . After hearing the arguments of Counsel, IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel #395 is DENIED. The Court RECESSES at 11:11am.The Court RESUMES at 11:22am. The Court hears representations from Plaintiffs' Counsel regarding the status of a Motion to Quash filed by AXS TV, LLC in the Northern District of Texas. Additionally, there is a pending Motion to Compel filed on behalf of Third Party Zinkin Entertainment, LLC in the Eastern District of California. The Court is inclined to defer consideration regarding discovery in relation to these two entities until the Motions are resolved in their respective Districts. The Court next hears the positions of Counsel regarding Plaintiffs' Request for an Extension of Time... 414 . IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiffs' Request for an Extension of Time... 414 is GRANTED, with 7/31/2017 being the discovery cutoff and the remaining dates extended 60 days accordingly, including an 8/31/2017 deadline for the class and merits discovery. Plaintiffs will be granted up to 10 hours with respect to the Zuffa employees whose depositions have been agreed upon. The parties will make arrangements to have the deponents available over a two day period, if necessary, subject to a Motion to Terminate under Rule 30(d) if Counsel believes that the examination is harassing, burdensome, or cumulative. Counsel are informed that they can seek to contact this Court's Chambers telephonically for a discovery dispute resolution conference in the event that a dispute arises, subject to this Court's availability. With respect to the ten third party depositions, not including the two deferred AXS TV, LLC depositions and not including the depositions of WME|IMG and Scott Coker which are permitted, Counsel will be limited to their choice of four depositions out of the remaining parties on the list. With respect to the 17 third parties listed as being served with subpoenas duces tecum, Counsel will be limited to One Championship and their choice of an additional five parties.Status Conference set for 7/13/2017 01:45 PM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAM) Modified on 6/12/2017 (JAM).
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 421 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II, on 6/1/2017. In light of #386 order granting #383 stipulation, #381 Motion to Extend Time is denied as moot. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CVL)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 420 ORDER Granting #402 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Eugene A. Spector for Gabe Ruediger and approving Designation of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/31/17. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 418 Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Dell'Angelo, Michael)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 416 MOTION to Seal 415 Reply to Response to Motion, by Consol Plaintiffs Mac Danzig, Pablo Garza, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Kyle Kingsbury, Gabe Ruediger, Darren Uyenoyama, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry. (Dell'Angelo, Michael)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 413 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #402 Verified Petition, by Consol Plaintiff Gabe Ruediger. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Springmeyer, Don)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 412 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for 409 Response to Motion,, by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Grigsby, Stacey)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 411 MOTION to Seal 409 Response to Motion,, filed by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stacey K. Grigsby, #2 Proposed Order)(Grigsby, Stacey)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 408 ORDER Granting #405 Stipulation for Extension of Time re Deadline for Expert Reports (First Request). Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/23/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 407 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II, on 5/22/2017. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a ruling on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and Designation of Local Counsel #402 is DEFERRED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that in appointing resident counsel, each plaintiff's Authorized Representative is directed to print his/her name AND TITLE and sign. Petitioner shall have 14 days from the entry of this order to correct the deficiency by filing the Corrected Verified Petition using the "Notice of Corrected Image/Document" event. Failure to timely remedy this deficiency will result in the denial of the Verified Petition, and Petitioner will be required to refile and to repay the filing fee. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CVL) Modified text on 5/23/2017 (BEL).
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 406 AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ADDENDUM to #397 Memorandum, #395 Motion to Compel, filed by Consol Plaintiffs Mac Danzig, Pablo Garza, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Kyle Kingsbury, Gabe Ruediger, Darren Uyenoyama, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry. (Dell'Angelo, Michael)Court modified event on 5/23/2017 (TR).
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 405 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #311 Scheduling Order ; Deadline for Expert Reports by Consol Plaintiffs Mac Danzig, Pablo Garza, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Kyle Kingsbury, Gabe Ruediger, Darren Uyenoyama, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry. (Dell'Angelo, Michael)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 404 IT IS ORDERED that the hearing currently scheduled for May 18, 2017, at 1:45 p.m. is VACATED and CONTINUED.NOTICE of Hearing on:(1) #363 MOTION to Extend Time re: Discovery Deadlines;(2) #393 Request for Status Conference;(3) #395 MOTION to Compel;(4) #1 Motion to Quash (in related matter 17-cv-0849); and(5) #26 Motion to Compel (in related matter 17-cv-0849). Motion Hearing set for 6/1/2017, at 9:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (no image attached)(TKH)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 403 MOTION to Seal 396 Declaration, by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stacey K. Grigsby, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit 15, #9 Exhibit 18, #10 Exhibit 19, #11 Exhibit 22, #12 Exhibit 23, #13 Exhibit 26, #14 Exhibit 28, #15 Exhibit 30, #16 Exhibit 36, #17 Proposed Order)(Grigsby, Stacey)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 402 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Eugene A. Spector and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-4608765) filed by Consol Plaintiffs Mac Danzig, Pablo Garza, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Kyle Kingsbury, Gabe Ruediger, Darren Uyenoyama, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry . (Springmeyer, Don) Corrected image #413 added on 5/30/2017. (EDS).
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 401 STATEMENT re #393 Statement, ; of Plaintiffs' Counsel Requesting Status Conference by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Grigsby, Stacey)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 398 MOTION for Leave to File Materials Under Seal by Consol Plaintiffs Mac Danzig, Pablo Garza, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Kyle Kingsbury, Gabe Ruediger, Darren Uyenoyama, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 through 4, #2 Exhibit 6 through 19, #3 Exhibit 21 through 36)(Dell'Angelo, Michael)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 397 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of #395 Motion to Compel, filed by Consol Plaintiffs Mac Danzig, Pablo Garza, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Kyle Kingsbury, Gabe Ruediger, Darren Uyenoyama, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry RE 396 Declaration, #395 Motion to Compel,. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 through 4, #3 Exhibit 5, #4 Exhibit 5 through 19, #5 Exhibit 20, #6 Exhibit 21 through 36)(Dell'Angelo, Michael)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 395 MOTION to Compel , filed by Consol Plaintiffs Mac Danzig, Pablo Garza, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Kyle Kingsbury, Gabe Ruediger, Darren Uyenoyama, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry. Responses due by 5/23/2017. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Proposed Order)(Dell'Angelo, Michael)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 394 NOTICE of Hearing on #363 MOTION to Extend Time re: Discovery Deadlines, and #393 Request for Status Conference: Motion Hearing set for 5/18/2017, at 1:45 PM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (no image attached)(TKH)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 393 STATEMENT of Plaintiffs' Counsel Requesting Status Conference by Consol Plaintiffs Mac Danzig, Pablo Garza, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Kyle Kingsbury, Gabe Ruediger, Darren Uyenoyama, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry. (Springmeyer, Don)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 392 ORDER Granting #387 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Evan Edmund North for Zuffa, LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel Richard J. Pocker. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/2/17. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 391 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #388 Reply to Response to Motion by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Nakamura, Brent)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 390 MOTION to Seal #388 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nicholas A. Widnell, #2 Proposed Order)(Widnell, Nicholas)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 388 REPLY to Response to #347 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, filed by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Reply to Plaintiffs' Seperate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts)(Isaacson, William)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 387 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Evan Edmund North and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Richard J. Pocker (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-4587863) filed by Defendant Zuffa, LLC . (Grigsby, Stacey)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 386 ORDER Granting #383 Stipulation for Extension of Time (Second Request). The parties stipulate to a one-week extension for Zuffa's reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition such that Zuffa's reply will be due on Monday, 5/1/2017. Plaintiffs' emergency motion to reschedule depositions #377 is hereby withdrawn. See Order for further details/deadlines. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/27/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 385 ORDER Granting #378 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Abby L. Dennis for Zuffa, LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel Richard J. Pocker. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/27/17. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 384 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #375 Order on Stipulation addressed to Andrew Michael Purdy. No new address available; Unable to remail. (MR)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 383 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re #377 Motion, #381 Motion to Extend Time, filed by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Grigsby, Stacey)
April 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 381 MOTION to Extend Time regarding dispositive matter (Second Request) re #347 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stacey K. Grigsby in Support of Zuffa, LLCs Motion for Extension of Time to File Its Reply in Support of Its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment As to Plaintiff Nathan Quarry on Statute of Limitations Grounds, #2 Proposed Order Granting Zuffa, LLCs Motion for Extension of Time to File Its Reply in Support of Its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment As to Plaintiff Nathan Quarry on Statute of Limitations Grounds)(Grigsby, Stacey)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ORDER Granting #364 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/21/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 380 RESPONSE to #377 Motion,, filed by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. Replies due by 4/28/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stacey K. Grigsby, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Proposed Order)(Grigsby, Stacey)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 379 ORDER Granting #376 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Andrew Michael Purdy withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/21/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 378 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Abby L. Dennis and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Richard J. Pocker (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-4574906) by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Grigsby, Stacey)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 377 MOTION Emergency Motion to Reschedule Depositions by Plaintiffs Cung Le, Nathan Quarry. Responses due by 5/5/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Matthew S. Weiler, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1 to Weiler Declaration, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2 to Weiler Declaration)(Weiler, Matthew)
April 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 376 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Andrew M. Purdy by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Rayhill, Kevin)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 375 ORDER Granting #373 Stipulation re Authenticity of Documents. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/13/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 374 NON-OPPOSITION to #368 Motion to Seal ; filed by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Rayhill, Kevin)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 373 STIPULATION re: Authenticity of Documents, filed by Consol Plaintiffs Mac Danzig, Pablo Garza, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Kyle Kingsbury, Gabe Ruediger, Darren Uyenoyama, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry. (Springmeyer, Don)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 372 FIRST NOTICE: of Non-Compliance with Local Rule IC 2-1 (a)(d) and Local Rule IA 11-2. Attorney Action Required by Andrew Michael Purdy, Donald Jude Campbell, Eugene A. Spector and, Joshua P. Davis are in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1 (a)(d) and Local Rule IA 11-2. After review of the Courts records, there has been no filing of your Verified Petition which is past due and that you have not registered for CM/ECF. - Pursuant to Local Rule IA 11-2 and Local Rule IC 2-1: You are required to be granted permission to practice before this Court as well as register for the Courts Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) program and the electronic service of pleadings. - For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. - Upon approval of the Verified Petitions attorneys are required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of pleadings at the Court's website. Failure to comply with the local rules governing permission to practice by 4/17/2017, will be referred to the Presiding Judge for further action. (no image attached) (RFJ) Modified entry regarding Donald Jude Campbell is actually registered as Donald J. Campbell and is compliance with LR IC 2-1 on 4/7/2017 (RFJ).
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 371 REPLY to Response to #363 MOTION to Extend Time re: Discovery Deadlines; filed by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Madden, Patrick)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 370 RESPONSE to #363 Motion to Extend Time/Shorten Time regarding Discovery or Nondispositive matter, filed by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. Replies due by 4/11/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ross P. McSweeney, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Proposed Order)(McSweeney, Ross)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 369 NOTICE OF RELATED CASES 2:17-cv-00849-RFB-GWF and 2:17-ms-00023 by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grigsby, Stacey)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 368 MOTION to Seal #365 Response to Motion, by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nicholas A. Widnell, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order)(Widnell, Nicholas)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 366 MOTION to Seal #365 Response to Motion,,, by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew S. Weiler, #2 Proposed Order)(Weiler, Matthew)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 365 RESPONSE to #347 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment,, filed by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. Replies due by 4/7/2017. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Separate Statement of Disputed and Undisputed Material Facts, #2 Declaration of Matthew S. Weiler, #3 Index of Exhibits, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit 16, #20 Exhibit 17, #21 Exhibit 18, #22 Exhibit 19, #23 Exhibit 20, #24 Exhibit 21, #25 Exhibit 22, #26 Exhibit 23, #27 Exhibit 24, #28 Declaration of Plaintiff Nathan Quarry)(Weiler, Matthew) Attachments: Main Document, 6, 7, and 18 replaced on 10/5/2017 per #504 Order (MR).
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 364 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re: #347 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment; filed by Consol Plaintiffs Mac Danzig, Pablo Garza, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Kyle Kingsbury, Gabe Ruediger, Darren Uyenoyama, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Declaration of Kevin E. Rayhill)(Schrager, Bradley) Court Modified entry to properly establish docket entry relationship pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d) on 3/24/2017 (RFJ).
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 363 MOTION to Extend Time re: Discovery Deadlines; filed by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Madden, Patrick)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 362 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court SHALL UNSEAL Exhibit 2 ( 281 -3), Exhibit 7 ( 281 -6), and Exhibit 9 ( 281 -7). Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/21/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 361 ORDER Granting #357 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brent K. Nakamura for Zuffa, LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel Richard J. Pocker. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 02/14/2017. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 360 ORDER Granting #356 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ross P. McSweeney for Zuffa, LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel Richard J. Pocker. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 02/14/2017. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 359 ORDER that #320 Plaintiffs' Motion to Challenge Attorney-Client Privilege is GRANTED with the exception of portions of the Merch memo which Defendant Zuffa, LLC shall produce redacted as listed in this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/13/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 358 ORDER Granting #354 Stipulation to Extend Time re Defendant's #347 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Plaintiffs' responses due by 3/24/2017. Defendant's reply due by 4/24/2017. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 02/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 357 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Brent K. Nakamura and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Richard J. Pocker (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-4477069) filed by Defendant Zuffa, LLC . (Grigsby, Stacey)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 356 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Ross P. McSweeney and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Richard J. Pocker (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-4477028) filed by Defendant Zuffa, LLC . (Grigsby, Stacey)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 355 ORDER Granting #352 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Perry Grossman withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 02/10/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 354 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #347 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, ; by Consol Plaintiffs Mac Danzig, Pablo Garza, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Kyle Kingsbury, Gabe Ruediger, Darren Uyenoyama, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry. (Springmeyer, Don)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 352 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Perry M. Grossman by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grigsby, Stacey)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 353 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 2/7/2017 before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Crtrm Administrator: Jeff Miller; Pla Counsel: Kevin Rayhill, Esq., Matthew Weiler, Esq.; Def Counsel: J. Williams, Esq., Stacey Grigsby, Esq.; Recording start and end times: 11:02:26 - 11:42:45; Courtroom: 3B; The Court scheduled these proceedings in regards to Plaintiffs' Motion To Challenge Attorney-Client Privilege #320 . As an initial matter, IT IS ORDERED: Motions to Seal #321 , #324 , #330 , #335 , and #342 are GRANTED. The Court hears the arguments of Counsel. IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiffs' Motion To Challenge Attorney-Client Privilege #320 is GRANTED as to all documents with the exception of the Mersch memoranda. The Court will issue a written Order that allows for the redaction of portions the Mersch memoranda and will direct which portions may be produced in redacted form. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAM)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 351 REPLY to Response to #342 Motion to Seal filed by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Grigsby, Stacey)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 350 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Widnell, Nicholas)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 349 MOTION to Seal #347 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nicholas A. Widnell, #2 Proposed Order)(Widnell, Nicholas)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 347 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment; filed by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. Responses due by 2/22/2017. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, #2 Appendix of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Proposed Order)(Widnell, Nicholas) Modified pursuant to ECF 493 on 9/26/2017 (BEL).
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ORDER Granting #344 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Rory L. Skaggs for Zuffa, LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel Richard J. Pocker. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 02/01/2017. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 345 RESPONSE to #342 Motion to Seal, filed by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. Replies due by 2/7/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rayhill, Kevin)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 344 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Rory L. Skaggs and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Richard J. Pocker (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-4457924) filed by Defendant Zuffa, LLC . (Grigsby, Stacey)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 343 NOTICE of Hearing on #320 MOTION To Challenge Attorney-Client Privilege : Motion Hearing set for 2/7/2017, at 11:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (no image attached)(TKH)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 342 MOTION to Seal #334 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stacey K. Grigsby, #2 Proposed Order)(Grigsby, Stacey)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 341 REPLY to Response to #330 Motion to Seal, filed by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Grigsby, Stacey)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 338 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #334 Reply to Response to Motion, by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Rayhill, Kevin)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 337 RESPONSE to #330 Motion to Seal, filed by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. Replies due by 1/17/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rayhill, Kevin)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 335 MOTION to Seal #334 Reply to Response to Motion, by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rayhill, Kevin)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 334 REPLY to Response to #320 Motion,, filed by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Rayhill Declaration ISO Reply, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Rayhill, Kevin) Corrected Image #338 Attached on 1/12/2017 (TR).
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER Granting Plaintiffs' #325 Motion to Extend Time re #320 Motion to Challenge Attorney Client-Privilege. Zuffa's Responses due by 1/3/2017. Plaintiffs' Replies due by 1/10/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/9/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 332 REPLY to Response to #324 Motion to Seal filed by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Grigsby, Stacey)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 331 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #329 Response to Motion by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Grigsby, Stacey)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 330 MOTION to Seal #329 Response to Motion, filed by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Grigsby, Stacey)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 329 RESPONSE to #320 Motion,,, filed by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. Replies due by 1/10/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Appendix, #6 Proposed Order)(Grigsby, Stacey)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 327 RESPONSE to #324 Motion to Seal, filed by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. Replies due by 1/10/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rayhill, Kevin)
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 326 NOTICE of Change of Address by Stacey K. Grigsby. (Grigsby, Stacey)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 325 First MOTION to Extend Time re #320 Motion, filed by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stacey K. Grigsby, #2 Proposed Order)(Grigsby, Stacey)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 324 MOTION to Seal #320 Motion, by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stacey K. Grigsby, #2 Proposed Order)(Grigsby, Stacey)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 323 FIRST NOTICE: of Non-Compliance with Local Rule IC 5-1 that Kevin Rayhill is in violation of Local Rule LR IC 5-1 as to #321 MOTION. The signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document. Attorney advised in the future to file documents in accordance with the Local Rules governing Electronic Case Filing. (no image attached) (TR)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 321 MOTION to Seal #320 Motion,, To Challenge Attorney-Client Privilege by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rayhill, Kevin)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 320 MOTION To Challenge Attorney-Client Privilege by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. Responses due by 12/29/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Kevin E. Rayhill, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Proposed Order)(Rayhill, Kevin)
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER Granting, as modified, #317 STIPULATION re: Expert Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/9/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 318 FIRST NOTICE: of Non-Compliance with Local Rule IC 5-1 that Don Springmeyer is in violation of Local Rule LR IC 5-1 as to #317 STIPULATION. The signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document. Attorney advised in the future to file documents in accordance with the Local Rules governing Electronic Case Filing. (no image attached) (TR)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 317 STIPULATION re: Expert Discovery, filed by Consol Plaintiffs Mac Danzig, Pablo Garza, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Kyle Kingsbury, Gabe Ruediger, Darren Uyenoyama, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry. (Springmeyer, Don)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 316 REPLY to Response to #310 Motion to Seal filed by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Grigsby, Stacey)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 315 RESPONSE to #310 Motion to Seal, filed by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. Replies due by 11/7/2016. (Saveri, Joseph)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER Denying #64 Motion to Dismiss and Granting #160 Stipulation of Electronically Stored Information. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/19/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 313 REPLY to Response to #305 Motion to Seal re: #303 Reply to Response to Motion to Challenge Work Product Designation filed by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Grigsby, Stacey) Court modified docket entry on 2/15/2017 to accurately describe title of document pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c).(LN).
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 312 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.)NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER 2013-1 AND OPPORTUNITY FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL SETTING: The parties in this action are provided with a link to General Order 2013-1 and the USDC Short Trial Rules on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. If the parties agree that this action can be ready for trial within 180 days and that a trial of this matter would take three (3) days or less, the parties should consider participation in the USDC Short Trial Program. If the parties wish to be considered for entry into the Court's Short Trial Program, they should execute and electronically file with USDC Short Trial Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2). (no image attached) (TR)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 310 MOTION to Seal #307 Response to Motion, by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stacey K. Grigsby, #2 Proposed Order)(Grigsby, Stacey)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 311 SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #306 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. (see Order for specific deadlines). Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/14/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 308 MOTION to Seal #307 Response to #305 Motion to Seal, by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Joseph) Court modified docket entry on 2/15/2017 to accurately describe title of document pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c). (LN).
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 307 SEALED per #426 Order (ADR) RESPONSE to #305 Motion to Seal re: Reply to Response to Motion to Challenge Work Product Designation, filed by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. Replies due by 10/22/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew S. Weiler, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Saveri, Joseph) Court modified docket entry on 2/15/2017 to accurately describe title of document pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c). (LN).
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 306 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order filed by Defendant Zuffa, LLC . (Grigsby, Stacey)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 305 MOTION to Seal re: #303 Reply to Response to Motion to Challenge Work Product Designation, filed by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stacey K. Grigsby, #2 Proposed Order)(Grigsby, Stacey) Court modified docket entry on 2/15/2017 to accurately describe title of document pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c).(LN).
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 304 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Status Conference held on 9/27/2016 before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Crtrm Administrator: Jeff Miller; Pla Counsel: Don Springmeyer, Esq., Michael Dell'Angelo, Esq., Matthew Weiler, Esq.; Def Counsel: J. Williams, Esq., Stacey Grigsby, Esq., Hunter Campbell, Esq.; Court Reporter/FTR #: 10:23:29 - 11:16:01; Time of Hearing: 10:30am; Courtroom: 3B; The Court inquires if Counsel are prepared to provide oral argument on Plaintiff's Motion to Challenge Work Product #282 before taking it under submission for decision. The Court next turns to the issues raised in Joint Status Report #297 , beginning with the status of Plaintiffs' review of document production made by the Defendants. After hearing the representations of Counsel, IT IS ORDERED: The Court will extend the case management deadlines by 30 days without prejudice and for good cause shown as stated in open court. Any request to extend the deadline beyond this additional 30 days will be scrutinized for a strong showing of good cause and due diligence. The Court next hears the arguments of Counsel regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Challenge Work Product #282 . Defense Counsel asks for guidance as to how the parties should refer to the documents at issue on the public record. IT IS ORDERED: The Court will TEMPORARILY SEAL the transcript until a decision and determine whether or not the transcript should be redacted or if it should be filed in whole or in part depending on the outcome of the motion. After hearing Counsels' arguments, the Court takes the matter under submission. The Court notes that Defense Counsel is claiming there are materials contained in Plaintiff's Reply Brief 300 that should not be, and hears the positions of Counsel. IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiff's Reply Brief 300 shall be SEALED, and Plaintiffs' Counsel is directed to file an appropriately redacted version of the brief until the merits of the sealing application are decided. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAM)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 303 SEALED per #426 Order (ADR). REDACTED REPLY to Response to #282 Motion to Challenge Work Product Designation, filed by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Kevin E. Rayhill, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4 Placeholder, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Saveri, Joseph) Court modified docket entry on 2/15/2017 to accurately describe title of document pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c).(LN).
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 301 NOTICE: of Non Compliance with LR IC 2-2(c) and Attorney Action Required to Motion filed on 9/26/2016: ERROR: Event selected doesnt match title of document, wrong event selected by attorney Joseph Saveri CORRECTION: Attorney advised to refile document, filed on 9/26/2016 using the correct event pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c) and properly link newly filed document to the appropriate document it supports pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d). (no image attached)(RFJ)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 298 MOTION to Seal Reply In Support Of Motion To Challenge Work Product Designation and Exhibit by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Joseph) Court modified docket entry on 2/15/2017 to accurately describe title of document pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c).(LN).
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 297 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Grigsby, Stacey)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 296 MOTION to Seal #294 Response to Motion to Challenge Work Product Designation, filed by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stacey K. Grigsby, #2 Proposed Order)(Grigsby, Stacey) Court modified docket entry on 2/15/2017 to accurately describe title of document pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c).(LN).
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 294 SEALED per #426 Order (ADR). RESPONSE to #282 Motion To Challenge Work Product Designation, filed by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. Replies due by 9/29/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William Hunter Campbell, #2 Declaration of Kirk D. Hendrick, #3 Declaration of Stacey K. Grigsby, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, #15 Exhibit L, #16 Proposed Order)(Grigsby, Stacey) Court modified docket entry on 2/15/2017 to accurately describe title of document pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c).(LN).
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER Granting in part with respect to Exhibits 1, 3, and 5; and Denying in part without prejudice Exhibits 2, 7, and 9 #280 Plaintiff's Motion to Lodge Materials Under Seal and Granting 289 Defendant's Motion to Seal. Exhibit 1 281 -2, Exhibit 3 281 , and Exhibit 5 281 -5 shall remain under seal. Exhibit 2 281 -3, Exhibit 7 281 , and Exhibit 9 281 -7 shall remain under seal until September 29, 2016. If parties fail to comply with this Order, the Clerk of the Court will be directed to unseal the documents to make them available on the public docket. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/16/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL) Modified on 9/19/2016 to add text - (DL).
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER.Clerk of Court shall UNSEAL Plaintiffs Motion to Lodge Materials UnderSeal #250 , but not the attached exhibits. Plaintiffs Motion to Lodge Materials Under Seal #250 and Defendant's Motion to Seal #257 are GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/14/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER Granting #290 Stipulation To Reset Joint Status Conference. Status Conference set for 9/27/2016 10:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Joint Status Report and proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order due by 9/23/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/13/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 290 STIPULATION to Continue Joint Status Conference, filed by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Grigsby, Stacey)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER Granting 287 Motion to Seal #282 Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/2/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 286 REDACTED MOTION To Challenge Work Product Designation, filed by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Saveri, Joseph) Court modified on 9/14/2016 pursuant to #288 Order sealing improperly redacted motion. (LN).
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 285 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #280 Motion to Seal, by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Joseph)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 283 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen, on 9/1/2016. By Deputy Clerk: Jeff Miller. By Judicial Assistant: Teresa Hoskin. The Court has received a joint request from Counsel for a brief continuance of the Status and Scheduling Conference and related deadlines to coincide to a date when they will be in this District for a deposition. The Court will grant the request. IT IS ORDERED: The Status and Scheduling Conference, previously scheduled for 9/15/2016 at 10:15AM, is VACATED and CONTINUED to 9/20/2016 @ 11:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED: that the parties shall submit (1) a Joint Status Report, and (2) a proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order no later than 9/16/2016.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAM)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 282 MOTION To Challenge Work Product Designation; filed by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. Responses due by 9/17/2016. (Attachments: #1 Rayhill Declaration ISO Motion, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Joseph) Corrected image #286 attached on 9/2/2016 (RFJ).
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 280 MOTION to Seal re: #282 Motion to Challenge Work Product Designation; filed by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Joseph) Court Modified entry to properly establish docket entry relationship pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d) on 9/1/2016 (RFJ). Corrected image #285 added on 9/1/2016. (EDS).
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 279 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen, on 8/29/2016.IT IS ORDERED that a Status and Scheduling Conference is set for 9/15/2016, at 10:15 AM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall submit (1) a Joint Status Report, and (2) a proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order no later than 9/12/2016. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TKH)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER Granting #260 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Nicholas Widnell for Defendant Zuffa, LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel Richard J. Pocker. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 08/17/2016. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER Granting #275 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel H Silverman for Jon Fitch,Kyle Kingsbury, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry Luis Javier Vazquez for Brandon Vera and approving Attorney Don Springmeyer as Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/22/2016. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER Granting #274 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. John F. Cove, Jr withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/18/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 275 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Daniel H. Silverman and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-4202543) filed by Consol Plaintiffs Mac Danzig, Pablo Garza, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Kyle Kingsbury, Gabe Ruediger, Darren Uyenoyama, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry . (Springmeyer, Don)
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 274 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by John F. Cove, Jr. by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jaffe Nero, Suzanne)
June 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 273 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Grigsby, Stacey)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER directing Zuffa, LLC to produce certain responsive, non-privileged documents from the FTC collection. Re: 264 status conference and #268 proposed order submission. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/3/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 271 Mail addressed to Andrew Michael Purdy, Esq., returned as Attempted - Not Known re #266 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. No new address provided. (AF)
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER Granting #229 Motion to Challenge Privilege. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/26/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 269 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 264 Order on Motion to Seal, Status Conference, held on 5/17/2016, before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Transcriber: Patricia L. Ganci pattyganci@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Transcriber using the court's Transcript Order form available on our website, at www.nvd.uscourts.gov, before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Transcriber or PACER Redaction Request due 6/15/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/25/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/23/2016. (PG)
May 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 268 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER filed by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Saveri, Joseph)
May 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 267 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #244 Status Report,, ; filed by Defendant Zuffa, LLC . (Cove, John)
May 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER Granting #263 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Hiba Hafiz withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/20/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER Granting #259 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Stacey Grigsby for Zuffa, LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel Richard James Pocker. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/17/16. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 264 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Status Conference held on 5/17/2016 before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Crtrm Administrator: Jeff Miller; Pla Counsel: Michael Dell'Angelo, Esq., Bradley Schrager, Esq., Kevin Rayhill, Esq., Joseph Saveri, Esq., Jerome Elwell, Esq., Patrick Madden, Esq.; Def Counsel: J. Williams, Esq., John Cove, Esq. Marcy Lynch, Esq., Kirk Hendrick, Esq., Helen Morey, Esq.; Court Reporter/FTR #: 8:50:19 - 10:30:00; Time of Hearing: 8:45am; Courtroom: 3C; The Court begins these proceedings by relating to Counsel that future Joint Status Reports will be limited to 40 pages in length with 20 pages for each side, further advising Counsel to refrain from excessive foot notes and compressed text. Additionally, no supplemental Status Reports shall be filed unless the parties jointly agree that a supplementation is in order and they jointly submit it.The Court next hears oral arguments of Counsel on Plaintiffs' Motion Challenging Privilege Designation [250-1] and #251 . After hearing Counsels' respective positions, IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiff's Motion Challenging Privilege Designation [250-1] and #251 is DENIED, and the document at issue is determined to be privileged.Turning next to the Joint Status Report #244 , the Court hears the representations of Counsel regarding search terms, ESI Protocols, the status of discovery production, and the FTC production materials. IT IS ORDERED: By no later than 5/20/2016 at 4:00pm Pacific time, Counsel shall meet and confer with regards to the FTC document production, and file their competing proposals with the Court as proposed forms of order. The Court will either select one of the two proposals and enter the order or file a hybrid order.As the hearing concludes, Plaintiffs' Counsel inquires about another pending Motion Concerning Privilege Designation. The Court will review the briefing and issue a separate written Order. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAM) Modified on 5/18/2016 (JAM).
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 263 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Hiba Hafiz by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Proposed Order)(Hafiz, Hiba)
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 262 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #260 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Cove, John)
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 261 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #259 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Cove, John)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 260 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas Widnell and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Richard J. Pocker (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-4119774) by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Cove, John) Corrected image #262 attached on 5/17/2016 (RFJ).
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 259 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Stacey K. Grigsby and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Richard J. Pocker (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-4119773) by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Cove, John) Corrected image #261 attached on 5/17/2016 (RFJ).
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 257 MOTION to Seal re: #256 Response to Motion to Challenge Privilege Designation, filed by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John F. Cove, Jr., #2 Proposed Order)(Cove, John). Court modified description on 9/14/2016 for clarity (LN).
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 256 REDACTED RESPONSE to #251 REDACTED MOTION to Challenge Privilege Designation, filed by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. Replies due by 5/23/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Marcy Norwood Lynch, #2 Declaration of Kirk D. Hendrick, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F)(Cove, John)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 255 RESPONSE to #254 Supplement; filed by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Madden, Patrick)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 254 SUPPLEMENT to #244 Status Report,, ; by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Helen Bergman Moure)(Cove, John)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER Granting #228 , #232 , #237 , and #246 Motions to Seal. The Clerk of the Court SHALL UNSEAL the moving papers incorrectly filed under seal, which do not contain confidential material: #227 Motion to Seal Unredacted Motion and Exhibits, #227 -3 Proposed Order, #237 Motion to Seal Unredacted Reply, #237 -1 Declaration, and #237 -2 Proposed Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/12/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that, with respect to filing documents under seal, the parties must comply with: (1) the Local Rules of Practice regarding electronic filing and filing under seal, (2) the Ninth Circuits opinions in Kamakana v. City and County of Honolulu, 447 F.3d 1172 (9th Cir. 2006) and Center for Auto Safety v. Chrysler Group, LLC, 809 F.3d 1092 (9th Cir. 2016), and (3) the CM/ECF filing instructions stated herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/11/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 251 REDACTED MOTION to Challenge Privilege Designation; filed by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. Responses due by 5/23/2016. (Attachments: #1 Rayhill Declaration, #2 Redacted Exhibit 1, #3 Redacted Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Joseph).
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 250 MOTION to Seal by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Motion to Challenge Privilege, #2 Rayhill Declaration ISO Motion to Challenge Privilege, #3 Exhibit 1 The Challenged Communication, #4 Exhibit 2 Plaintiffs' Draft JSR, #5 Exhibit 3 Lynch Email, #6 Exhibit 4 Second Lynch Email, #7 Exhibit (Proposed Order re Motion to Challenge Privilege), #8 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Joseph).
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 249 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen, on 5/5/2016. IT IS ORDERED that the parties' #248 Stipulation is GRANTED. The status conference currently scheduled for 5/10/2016, at 1:45 p.m., is CONTINUED to 5/17/2016, at 08:45 AM in LV Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TKH)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 248 STIPULATION to Reset re: 247 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - Status Conference; filed by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Dell'Angelo, Michael)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 247 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen, on 5/2/2016. By Deputy Clerk: Jeff Miller. By Judicial Assistant: Teresa Hoskin. IT IS ORDERED: Status Conference CONTINUED to 5/10/2015 @ 1:45 PM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAM)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen, on 5/2/2016. By Deputy Clerk: Jeff Miller. By Judicial Assistant: Teresa Hoskin. IT IS ORDERED: The Status Hearing scheduled May 3, 2016, at 1:45 p.m. in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen is VACATED, and will be rescheduled with the new date to be announced. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAM)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 246 MOTION to Seal #244 Status Report,, by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration John F. Cove, Jr., #2 Proposed Order)(Cove, John)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 244 Joint STATUS REPORT (REDACTED) by Consol Plaintiffs Mac Danzig, Pablo Garza, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Kyle Kingsbury, Gabe Ruediger, Darren Uyenoyama, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Charles Kellner, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17)(Cove, John)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER Granting #234 Stipulation to Seal #230 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/20/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 242 REDACTED REPLY to Response to #229 Motion, filed by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Saveri, Joseph)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 241 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen, on 4/19/2016.IT IS ORDERED that the parties' Stipulation is GRANTED and the Status Conference currently scheduled for April 25, 2016, at 1:45 p.m., is VACATED and CONTINUED TO May 3, 2016, at 1:45 p.m. in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TKH)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 240 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #230 Response to Motion, by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Cove, John)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 239 NOTICE: of Attorney Action Required to #238 Memorandum: ERROR: Wrong event selected by attorney Joseph R. Saveri. document does not match event selected. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to refile documents using the correct event, REPLY to Response to Motion and properly link newly filed Redacted Reply to #229 Motion, pursuant to Special Order #109. (no image attached)(RFJ)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ERROR: Wrong event selected, by attorney . CORRECTION: Attorney advised to refile documents using the correct event. MEMORANDUM re #229 Motion, filed by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Consol Plaintiffs Pablo Garza, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Kyle Kingsbury. (Saveri, Joseph) Modified on 4/19/2016 (RFJ).
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 237 SEALED MOTION to Seal Reply re: #229 Motion to Challenge; filed by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Pablo Garza, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Kyle Kingsbury. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Weiler, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Unredacted Reply)(Saveri, Joseph) . Modified on 5/13/2016 to Unseal per #253 Order(TR).
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 236 NOTICE: of Attorney Action Required to #235 Brief: ERROR: Wrong event selected by attorney John F. Cove, Jr.. document does not match event selected. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to refile documents using the correct event, NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document, found under the NOTICES category and properly link newly filed Notice to #230 Response to Motion, pursuant to Special Order #109. (no image attached)(RFJ)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ERROR: Wrong event selected, by attorney . CORRECTION: Attorney advised to refile documents using the correct event. BRIEF re #230 Response to Motion, filed by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Cove, John) Modified on 4/18/2016 (RFJ).
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 234 STIPULATION to Seal re #230 Response to Motion, filed by Consol Plaintiffs Mac Danzig, Pablo Garza, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Kyle Kingsbury, Gabe Ruediger, Darren Uyenoyama, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Cove, John)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 233 STIPULATION to Continue Status Conference re: 225 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Status Conference; filed by Consol Plaintiffs Mac Danzig, Pablo Garza, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Kyle Kingsbury, Gabe Ruediger, Darren Uyenoyama, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Cove, John)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 232 MOTION to Seal 231 Response to Motion, by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John F. Cove, Jr., #2 Proposed Order)(Cove, John) Modified on 5/3/2016 to reflect correct link(LN).
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 230 STRICKEN per #243 Order. (TR)REDACTED RESPONSE to #229 Motion to Challenge re: 217 Revised Protective Order;, filed by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. Replies due by 4/21/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Marcy Lynch, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Declaration of Charles Thomas Paschall, #13 Proposed Order)(Cove, John) Corrected image #240 attached on 4/19/2016 (RFJ)..
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 229 Redacted Motion to Challenge re: #217 Revised Protective Order; filed by Consol Plaintiffs Mac Danzig, Pablo Garza, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Kyle Kingsbury, Gabe Ruediger, Darren Uyenoyama, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry. Responses due by 4/18/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew S. Weiler, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Joseph) Modified on 5/3/2016 to reflect redacted version (LN).
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 228 MOTION to Seal by Consol Plaintiffs Mac Danzig, Pablo Garza, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Kyle Kingsbury, Gabe Ruediger, Darren Uyenoyama, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Joseph).
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 227 SEALED EXHIBITS re: #228 MOTION to Seal Exhibits; filed by Consol Plaintiffs Mac Danzig, Pablo Garza, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Kyle Kingsbury, Gabe Ruediger, Darren Uyenoyama, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Unredacted Motion to Challenge Revised Protective Order)(Saveri, Joseph) Modified event per Chambers on 5/3/2016 (RFJ). Modified on 5/13/2016 to Unseal per #253 Order (TR).
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 226 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 225 Status Conference, held on 2/23/2016, before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Transcriber: Patricia L. Ganci pattyganci@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Transcriber using the court's Transcript Order form available on our website, at www.nvd.uscourts.gov, before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Transcriber or PACER Redaction Request due 3/31/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/10/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/8/2016. (PG)
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER Granting #222 Motion to Seal re #218 Status Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/25/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 225 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Status Conference held on 2/23/2016 before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Crtrm Administrator: Jeff Miller; Pla Counsel: Don Springmeyer, Esq., Michael Dell'Angelo, Esq., Matthew Weiler, Esq., Jerome Elwell, Esq., Patrick Madden, Esq.; Def Counsel: J. Williams, Esq., John Cove, Esq., Marcy Lynch, Esq.; Court Reporter/FTR #: 1:45:44 - 2:44:36, 2:46:43 - 2:47:15; Time of Hearing: 1:45pm; Courtroom: 3B; Present with Plaintiffs' Counsel is Consultant Chuck Kellner. Present with Defense Counsel is Consultant Helen Moure and In House Counsel Tim Bellamy. The Court has reviewed Counsels' Joint Status Report #218 and related Declarations. The Parties' Consultants have been dealing directly through Counsel and have had discussions about the negotiations concerning keyword searches from February 4, 2016 until now. The Court hears updates from Counsel, as well as proposals on how Counsel plan to review the materials they receive and how they may be able to potentially narrow the sets materials that will require review. After conferring with Counsel and hearing extensive representations, IT IS ORDERED: The parties will proceed with Zuffa's proposal with respect to 392 search terms and the additional 100,000 documents. As the process is an iterative one, it will need to be tested to determine how it will work, IT IS ORDERED: Zuffa shall find and disclose, and have the experts discuss, the FTC search protocols to inform the process and to determine if there are search terms that Zuffa internally decided on using to respond to the FTC's inquiries. The Court would like the parties to proceed on this basis, and not with the expectation that this will end the inquiry. The Court hears additional representations from Plaintiffs' Counsel, and the Court addresses Counsels' respective productions of documents. The Court will continue to inquire as to Counsels' progress regarding their document productions at each scheduled Status Hearing. The Court will schedule the next Status Conference for 60 days to give Counsel more time to work on the discussed matters. OFF RECORD at 2:44pm to discuss scheduling. RECORD RESUMES at 2:46pm.Status Conference set for 4/25/2016 @ 1:45 PM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Joint Status Report due by 4:00pm Pacific Time on 4/21/2016.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAM)
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 223 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #220 Declaration by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Cove, John)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 222 MOTION to Seal Exhibits re: #218 Status Report; filed by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Cove, Jr., #2 Proposed Order)(Cove, John)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 221 DECLARATION of Charles Kellner re #218 Status Report; filed by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Cove, John)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 220 DECLARATION of Helen Bergman Moure re #218 Status Report; filed by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Cove, John) Corrected image #223 attached on 2/23/2016 (RFJ).
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 218 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Cove, John) Modified on 2/26/2016 to Seal Exhibits G, H, and I per #224 Order(TR).
February 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 217 Revised Protective Order re #215 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/10/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 216 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 214 Status Conference, held on 1/26/2016, before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Transcriber: Patricia L. Ganci pattyganci@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Transcriber using the court's Transcript Order form available on our website, at www.nvd.uscourts.gov, before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through Transcriber or PACER Redaction Request due 2/24/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/5/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/3/2016. (PG)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 215 SECOND STIPULATION for Protective Order; filed by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Cove, John)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 214 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Status Conference held on 1/26/2016 before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Crtrm Administrator: Jeff Miller; Pla Counsel: Don Springmeyer, Esq., Michael Dell'Angelo, Esq., Joseph Saveri, Esq., Jerome Elwell, Esq.; Def Counsel: J. Williams, Esq., John Cove, Esq., Marcy Lynch, Esq.,; Court Reporter/FTR #: 1:47:11 - 3:30:37; Time of Hearing: 1:45pm; Courtroom: 3B; The Court has reviewed Counsels' Joint Status Report #213 and addresses several portions of the Report with Counsel. The Court first hears representations from Defense Counsel regarding their progress in discovery as it pertains to their production and privilege review. After hearing from Defense Counsel, The Court turns to a dispute concerning the list of custodians as discussed and ordered at the previous Status Conference. The Court hears the respective positions of Counsel. The Court will keep the matter open if, while conducting discovery and reviewing the information the Plaintiffs' Counsel receives, they find a critical party who is appropriately subject to an additional request and a reasonable request for their inclusion is made. However, for purposes of encouraging continual progress, the Court will not adjust the custodian list at this time and it will remain as previously ordered. The Court next hears the positions of Counsel regarding disputes over the list of search terms. After hearing Counsels' arguments, IT IS ORDERED: The Court will hear input from the consultants who talk to one another as experts in their field in order to give Counsel what they deem is reasonable. Counsel will be required to identity to each other their consultants. Counsel shall make arrangements to have their consultants confer with one another about the parties' respective proposals concerning keyword searches for E.S.I. before the next scheduled Status Conference. Counsel will be permitted to participate in these discussions. The Court next hears arguments of Counsel regarding the relevant time frame for Defendants' Production of Documents #3, 6, 14, and 20. The Court expects Counsel to use a reasonable methodology to respond to the requests dating back to 1/01/2000 and the Court will limit to promoters involved in combat sports related activities and not in any endeavor the Plaintiffs have engaged in. The next dispute concerns medical and drug test records. The Court hears from Defense Counsel as to what they specifically are seeking. IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiffs' arguments are sustained, and the Court finds that the Defendants are not entitled to this information. The Court will require Plaintiffs to give Counsel any documents they may have with respect to a request for or receipt of any tolling or extension or contract with any promoter in a combat field, but not required to produce the underlying medical basis.Finally, with respect to a proposed amendment to the Protective Order to include a provision for attorneys eyes only documents of a highly personal nature from the personal files of the athletes. The parties have already agreed to modify the Protective Order to accommodate the concerns of non-party witnesses, but they disagree with respect to the necessity of attorney's eyes only treatments for information for other fighters in the contract files. Counsel state their positions. IT IS ORDERED: The Court will allow the parties to have the attorneys eyes only protection for that specified category of information to eliminate the additional cost and expense of having to redact portions of relevant and discoverable materials, but expects that designation to be very circumspect. Defense Counsel brings up an issue regarding Requests for Production #2 and #15. The Court did not specifically address them but will not require the Plaintiffs to produce any non-MMA or non-combat sports related activity materials and intended for it to be understood in the Court's previous directions for other categories as stated earlier in open court. Status Conference set for 2/23/2016 @ 1:45 PM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAM)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 213 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A, #2 Exhibit Attachment B, #3 Exhibit Attachment C, #4 Exhibit Attachment D)(Cove, John)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ANSWER to #208 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand; filed by Zuffa, LLC. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 1/29/2016. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/4/2016.(Grossman, Perry)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 211 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 207 Status Conference held on 12/8/2015, before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Court Reporter/Transcriber: NW Transcripts, LLC, 208-989-3455. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's Transcript Order form available on our website, at www.nvd.uscourts.gov, before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 1/13/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/23/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/22/2016. (ABB)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 210 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 200 Status Conference, held on 11/17/2015, before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Transcriber: Patricia L. Ganci pattyganci@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Transcriber using the court's Transcript Order form available on our website, at www.nvd.uscourts.gov, before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Transcriber PACER Redaction Request due 1/13/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/23/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/22/2016. (PG)
December 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 209 NOTICE re: #208 AMENDED COMPLAINT; filed by Mac Danzig, Jon Fitch, Pablo Garza, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Kyle Kingsbury, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Gabe Ruediger, Darren Uyenoyama, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Springmeyer, Don)
December 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 208 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Zuffa, LLC, filed by Jon Fitch, Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Nathan Quarry, Darren Uyenoyama, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Cung Le, Pablo Garza, Gabe Ruediger, Mac Danzig, Brandon Vera. Removes parties. Proof of service due by 4/16/2016. (Springmeyer, Don)
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 207 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Status Conference held on 12/8/2015 before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Crtrm Administrator: Jeff Miller; Pla Counsel: Don Springmeyer, Esq., Michael Dell'Angelo, Esq., Patrick Madden, Esq.; Def Counsel: J. Williams, Esq., John Cove, Esq., Marcy Lynch, Esq., Kirk Hendrick, Esq.; Court Reporter/FTR #: 1:48:33 - 3:00:47; Time of Hearing: 1:45pm; Courtroom: 3B; The Court has reviewed Counsels' Joint Status Report #206 and will address Counsels' disputes. Counsel initially inform the Court of the results of a meet and confer process in which they have reached an agreement on a search for custodian information. The Court first hears the respective positions of Counsel regarding the identification of custodians. The parties have agreed on 16 custodians, but differ on a number of additional custodians. IT IS ORDERED: The Court will allow Plaintiffs to select an additional 6 custodians beyond the agreed upon 16 custodians unless for good cause shown there is some essential person that has not been identified at this stage. The Court next hears representations of Counsel regarding the proposal to limit the custodial search and production for certaincustodians in the legal department. After hearing the parties' positions, the Court will not allow the Defendants to not produce internal communications among the legal custodians that are at issue, but will allow the parties to come up with a reasonable proposal to limit the search methodology in a way that is likely to isolate and prohibit them from doing a document by document review of likely privileged materials. The Court suggests that the Defendants talk to their consultants about this issue to come up with a proposal that will limit the burden.The Court next addresses the identification of the Identity Class/Bout Class members and contracts. After hearing Counsels' positions, the Court sustains Defendant Zuffa's position. The Court makes findings for the record.The Court turns to the issue concerning the number of interrogatories that each party may serve and hears the parties' respective positions. IT IS ORDERED: The Court will limit the number of interrogatories to 10 for each individual Plaintiff and 25 total consolidated. Regarding Counsels' competing proposals concerning the number of depositions that may be taken, IT IS ORDERED: The Court will limit the number of depositions at this point to 45 per side and limit the number of Zuffa employee depositions to 15. Custodian of records depositions or authentification depositions that are short in duration are excluded from the 45 deposition limit.With regards to the Case Schedule in this case, the Court will adopt the Plaintiffs' proposal regarding motions deadlines. Dispositive Motions shall be filed 2/22/2018, with Oppositions due 3/23/2018 and Replies due 4/20/2018.The Court clarifies portions of it's Orders for Counsel and hears additional representations. Status Conference set for 1/26/2016 @ 1:45 PM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAM)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 206 Joint STATUS REPORT by Consol Plaintiffs Mac Danzig, Pablo Garza, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Kyle Kingsbury, Gabe Ruediger, Darren Uyenoyama, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Cove, John)
November 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 205 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 186 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Stipulation, Motion Hearing, held on 9/25/2015, before Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Court Reporter: Patricia L. Ganci pattyganci@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter using the court's Transcript Order form available on our website, at www.nvd.uscourts.gov, before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter or PACER Redaction Request due 12/11/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/21/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/18/2016. (PG)
November 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER Granting #202 Stipulation to File a Consolidated Complaint and to Extend Deadline to Answer Consolidated Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/20/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
November 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER Granting #201 Stipulation to Withdraw #191 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Answer Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/20/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 202 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to File a Consolidated Complaint and to Extend Zuffa, LC's Deadline to Answer Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Complaint by Consol Plaintiffs Mac Danzig, Pablo Garza, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Kyle Kingsbury, Gabe Ruediger, Darren Uyenoyama, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Cove, John)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 201 STIPULATION to Withdraw #191 Stipulation by Consol Plaintiffs Mac Danzig, Pablo Garza, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Kyle Kingsbury, Gabe Ruediger, Darren Uyenoyama, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Cove, John)
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 200 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Status/Dispute Resolution Conference held on 11/17/2015 before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Crtrm Administrator: Eileen Wood; Pla Counsel: Don Springmeyer, Michael Dell'Angelo, Patrick Madden; Def Counsel: J. Williams, John Cove, Marcy Lynch, Kirk Hendrick; FTR #: 9:29-10:08; Time of Hearing: 9:29-10:08 AM; Courtroom: 3B. Representations of counsel are heard. The Court will approve Stipulations #191 and #195 once counsel submit corrected images pursuant to Local Rule 6. The Court adopts Plaintiffs' position as to relevant time frame. The documents as to which there are agreement shall be produced for the time period of January 1, 2005 to cutoff date June 30, 2015. The Court adopts Defendant's position as to identification of custodians. The Court will not Order a Rule 30(b)(6) deposition at this point. It may, however, remain a possibility if the Court is not persuaded that the defendants are making good faith efforts to continue to cooperate in identifying relevant custodians. The Court will require Defendants to provide the additional information concerning custodians by the end of this week. Status/Dispute Resolution Conference set for 12/8/2015 at 01:45 PM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Joint Status Report due by 12/4/2015. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EW)
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 199 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Cove, John)
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 198 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen, on 10/29/2015. By Deputy Clerk: Jeff Miller. By Judicial Assistant: Teresa Hoskin. IT IS ORDERED: Status/Dispute Resolution Conference set for 11/17/2015 @ 9:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAM)
October 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER Granting #194 Stipulation and Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/27/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
October 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER Granting #193 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Jay S. Cohen withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/27/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
October 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 195 FIRST STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME to File a Consolidated Amended Complaint and to Extend time to Answer; filed by Consol Plaintiffs Mac Danzig, Pablo Garza, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Kyle Kingsbury, Gabe Ruediger, Darren Uyenoyama, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry. (Dell'Angelo, Michael)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 194 STIPULATION and Protective Order by Consol Plaintiffs Mac Danzig, Pablo Garza, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Kyle Kingsbury, Gabe Ruediger, Darren Uyenoyama, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry. (Springmeyer, Don)
October 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 193 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Jay S. Cohen of Spector Roseman Kodroff & Willis, PC by William G. Caldes by Consol Plaintiffs Mac Danzig, Gabe Ruediger, Darren Uyenoyama. (Caldes, William)
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 192 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 190 Status Conference held on 9/30/2015, before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting Services, Inc., 361-949-2988. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's Transcript Order form available on our website, at www.nvd.uscourts.gov, before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 11/3/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/13/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/11/2016. (ABB)
October 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 191 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Complaints by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Cove, John)
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 190 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Status Conference held on 9/30/2015 before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Crtrm Administrator: Jeff Miller; Pla Counsel: Don Springmeyer, Esq., Michael Dell'Angelo, Esq., Benjamin Brown, Esq., Matthew Weiler, Esq., Robert Maysey, Esq.; Def Counsel: John Cove, Esq., Marcy Lynch, Esq., Phil Erwin, Esq.,; Court Reporter/FTR #: 2:02:22 - 2:48:37; Time of Hearing: 2:00pm; Courtroom: 3B; The Court has reviewed Counsels' Joint Status Report #185 and their competing proposals for a Protective Order. The Court hears the arguments of Counsel concerning their proposals. IT IS ORDERED: Defense Counsel have not met their burden of establishing the need for the highly confidential 'attorneys eyes only' designation in this case, and the Court will adopt the proposed form of Protective Order without that designation. Counsel are directed to file the proposed Stipulation with the appropriate signatures consistent with the Court's Order. The Court next hears the representations of Counsel concerning discovery. Counsel jointly request more time to confer and refine a proposed schedule as well as determine if there are any discovery disputes that may need Court intervention. The Court encourages Counsel to reach an accommodation concerning redaction of personal identifiers. The Court intends to set this case for regular Status Hearings, and directs Counsel to meet and confer regarding a date and time they prefer and to contact this Court's Courtroom Administrator to have the next hearing calendared. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAM)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 189 REPLY to #159 Proposed Order Submission, ; filed by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Suzanne E. Jaffe, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Cove, John)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 188 MOTION to Strike #183 Response - Other, by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. Responses due by 10/15/2015. (Cove, John)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER Granting #121 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Hiba Hafiz for Jon Fitch,Hiba Hafiz for Kyle Kingsbury,Hiba Hafiz for Cung Le,Hiba Hafiz for Nathan Quarry,Hiba Hafiz for Luis Javier Vazquez and approving Designation of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/28/15. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 186 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 9/25/2015 before the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II. Crtrm Administrator: Blanca Lenzi; Pla Counsel: Don Springmeyer, Esq., Benjamin Brown, Esq., Erik Cramer, Esq., Matthew Weiler, Esq.; Def Counsel: J. Williams, Esq., William Isaacson, Esq., John Cove, Esq., Donald Campbell, Esq., Kirk Hendrick, Esq., Perry Grossman, Esq.; Court Reporter/FTR #: Patty Ganci; Time of Hearing: 1:36 PM; Courtroom: 7C. The Court makes preliminary statements and hears arguments of counsel regarding the motions pending before the Court. For the reasons stated on the record at the hearing, IT IS ORDERED that in Case no. 2:15-cv-01045-RFB-PAL #64 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED; #160 Stipulation of Electronically Stored Information is GRANTED; Case no. 2:15-cv-01046-RFB-PAL, #16 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED; Case no. 2:15-cv-01055-RFB-PAL, #39 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED; Case no. 2:15-cv-01056-RFB-PAL, #39 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED; Case no. 2:15-cv-01057-RFB-PAL, #16 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. The Court shall issue a written Order as to the Court's ruling. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL) Added last sentence on 9/28/2015, (BEL).
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 185 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Cove, John)
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 184 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II, on 9/25/2015. Due to a time conflict with this Court's calendar, IT IS ORDERED that the hearing and oral argument set for September 25, 2015 at 3:00 PM is RESET to 4:00 PM in LV Courtroom 7C before Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. The hearing will address: #64 MOTION to Dismiss and #160 STIPULATION re: Discovery of Electronically Stored Information.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
September 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 183 RESPONSE to #159 Proposed Order Submission, ; filed by Consol Plaintiffs Mac Danzig, Pablo Garza, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Kyle Kingsbury, Gabe Ruediger, Darren Uyenoyama, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry. (Attachments: #1 Rayhill Decl. ISO Response to Zuffa Memo ISO P.O., #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Rayhill, Kevin)
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER Granting #157 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Proposed ESI Protocols. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/21/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER Granting #174 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Eric L. Cramer for Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Jon Fitch, Brandon Vera, Pablo Garza, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez and approving Designation of Local Counsel Don Sprinmeyer. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/21/15. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 180 WITHDRAWAL of Motion re #58 Motion for Appointment of Counsel,, ; by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry (Springmeyer, Don)
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 179 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II, on 9/9/2015. IT IS ORDERED that a hearing and oral argument set for Thursday, September 24, 2015 is VACATED and RESET to Friday, September 25, 2015 at 3:00 PM in LV Courtroom 7C before Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. The following motions will be addressed: 2:15-cv-01045-RFB-PAL: #64 Motion to Dismiss; #160 Stipulation re: Discovery of Electronically Stored Information; 2:15-cv-01046-RFB-PAL: #16 Motion to Dismiss; 2:15-cv-01055-RFB-PAL, 2:15-cv-01056-RFB-PAL, 2:15-cv-1057-RFB-PAL: #34 Motion to Appoint Counsel Motion to Appoint Intermin Co-Lead Class Counsel.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ERRATA to #158 Plaintiffs Notice of Proposed Protective Order filed by Consol Plaintiffs Mac Danzig, Pablo Garza, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Kyle Kingsbury, Gabe Ruediger, Darren Uyenoyama, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order)(Springmeyer, Don)
September 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 177 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II, on 9/4/2015. IT IS ORDERED that a hearing and oral argument is set for Thursday, September 24, 2015 at 1:00 PM in LV Courtroom 7C before Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. The following motions will be addressed: 2:15-cv-01045-RFB-PAL: #64 Motion to Dismiss; #160 Stipulation re: Discovery of Electronically Stored Information; 2:15-cv-01046-RFB-PAL: #16 Motion to Dismiss; 2:15-cv-01055-RFB-PAL, 2:15-cv-01056-RFB-PAL, 2:15-cv-1057-RFB-PAL: #34 Motion to Appoint Counsel Motion to Appoint Intermin Co-Lead Class Counsel. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL) Modified on 9/4/2015 (BEL).
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER Granting #122 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Richard Adam Koffman for Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Jon Fitch, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Pablo Garza and Kyle Kingsbury and approving Designation of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/3/15. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER Granting #155 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney William G. Caldes for Gabe Ruediger, Mac Danzig and Darren Uyenoyama and approving Designation of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/3/15. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 174 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Eric L. Cramer and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-3802633) filed by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Pablo Garza, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera . (Springmeyer, Don)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 173 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II, on 9/3/2015. In its order ECF No. 133 the Court identified one or more deficiencies on Petitioner's Eric Cramer; Hiba Mahmoud Hafiz and Jeffrey Corrigan's Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and gave petitioners 14 days to correct those deficiencies. Petitioners have failed to file a corrected Verified Petition in the time allocated.THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED that Verified Petitions #110 , #121 and #132 are DENIED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CVL)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER Granting #154 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jeffrey J. Corrigan for Gabe Ruediger. Mac Danzig and Darren Uyenoyama and approving Designation of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/3/15. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER Granting #153 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Matthew Sinclair Weiler for Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Jon Fitch, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Pablo Garza and Kyle Kingsbury and approving Designation of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/3/15. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER Granting #152 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joshua P. Davis for Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Jon Fitch, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Pablo Garza, and Kyle Kingsbury and approving Designation of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/3/15. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER Granting #131 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jay S. Cohen for Gabe Ruediger and Darren Uyenoyama and approving Designation of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/2/15. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER Granting #113 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Frederick S. Schwartz for Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Jon Fitch, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Pablo Garza and Kyle Kingsbury and approving Designation of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/2/15. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER Granting #115 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jerome K. Elwell for Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Jon Fitch, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Pablo Garza and Kyle Lingsbury and approving Designation of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/2/15. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER Granting #114 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Robert Charles Maysey for Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Jon Fitch, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Pablo Garza and Kyle Kingsbury and approving Designation of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/2/15. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER Granting #126 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Benjamin Doyle Brown for Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Jon Fitch, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Pablo Garza and Kyle Kingsbury and approving Designation of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/2/15. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER Granting #123 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Joseph R. Saveri for Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Jon Fitch, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Pablo Garza and Kyle Kingsbury and approving Designation of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/2/15. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER Granting #125 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kevin E. Rayhill for Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Jon Fitch, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Pablo Garza and Kyle Kingsbury and approving Designation of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/2/15. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER Granting #111 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael C Dell'Angelo, IV for Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Jon Fitch, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Pablo Garza and Kyle Kingsbury and approving Designation of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/2/15. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR) Modified on 9/3/2015 to correct parties(TR).
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER Granting #112 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Patrick Fanning Madden for Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Jon Fitch, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Pablo Garza, and Kyle Kingsbury and approving Designation of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/2/15. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR) Modified on 9/3/2015 to add correct parties(TR).
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 160 STIPULATION re: Discovery of Electronically Stored Information by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Cove, John)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 159 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER filed by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Memorandum in support of the Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Perry Grossman, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Declaration of Kirk Hendrick)(Cove, John)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 158 NOTICE Plaintiffs Notice of Proposed Protective Order by Mac Danzig, Jon Fitch, Pablo Garza, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Kyle Kingsbury, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Gabe Ruediger, Darren Uyenoyama, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera re 139 Order on Motion to Stay,,,,,,, Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel,,,,,,, Motion Hearing,,,,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Declaration Robert Maysey, #7 Exhibit 1 - to Maysey Dec)(Springmeyer, Don)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 157 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re 139 Order on Motion to Stay,,,,,,, Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel,,,,,,, Motion Hearing,,,,,, ; to File Proposed ESI Protocols by Consol Plaintiffs Mac Danzig, Pablo Garza, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Kyle Kingsbury, Gabe Ruediger, Darren Uyenoyama, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry. (Springmeyer, Don)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 156 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 139 Order on Motion to Stay, Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, Motion Hearing, held on 7/28/2015, before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Transcriber: Patricia L. Ganci pattyganci@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Transcriber using the court's Transcript Order form available on our website, at www.nvd.uscourts.gov, before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Transcriber or PACER Redaction Request due 9/16/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/26/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/24/2015. (PG)
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 155 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by William G. Caldes and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-3780851) filed by Consol Plaintiffs Mac Danzig, Gabe Ruediger, Darren Uyenoyama . (Springmeyer, Don)
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 154 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey J. Corrigan and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-3770755) filed by Consol Plaintiffs Mac Danzig, Gabe Ruediger, Darren Uyenoyama . (Springmeyer, Don)
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 153 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Matthew S. Weiler and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-3767597) filed by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Pablo Garza, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera . (Springmeyer, Don)
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 152 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Joshua P. Davis and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-3764667) filed by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Pablo Garza, Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera . (Springmeyer, Don)
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 151 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #114 Verified Petition, by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Pablo Garza, Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Springmeyer, Don)
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 150 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #131 Verified Petition, by Consol Plaintiffs Gabe Ruediger, Darren Uyenoyama. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Springmeyer, Don)
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 149 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #113 Verified Petition, by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Pablo Garza, Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Springmeyer, Don)
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 148 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #115 Verified Petition, by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Pablo Garza, Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Springmeyer, Don)
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 147 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #122 Verified Petition, by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Pablo Garza, Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Springmeyer, Don)
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 146 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #126 Verified Petition, by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Pablo Garza, Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Springmeyer, Don)
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 145 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #121 Verified Petition, by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Pablo Garza, Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Springmeyer, Don)
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 144 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #123 Verified Petition, by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Pablo Garza, Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Springmeyer, Don)
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 143 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #125 Verified Petition, by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Pablo Garza, Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Springmeyer, Don)
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 142 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #111 Verified Petition, by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Pablo Garza, Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Springmeyer, Don)
August 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 141 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #112 Verified Petition, by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry, Consol Plaintiffs Kyle Kingsbury, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Springmeyer, Don)
July 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER Granting #127 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/31/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 139 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 7/28/2015 before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Crtrm Administrator: Jeff Miller; Pla Counsel: Don Springmeyer, Esq., Benjamin Brown, Esq., Eric Cramer, Esq.; Def Counsel: J. Williams, Esq., William Isaacson, Esq., John Cove, Esq.; Court Reporter/FTR #: 10:02:01 - 10:46:51; Time of Hearing: 10:00am; Courtroom: 3B; IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiffs' Motion to Appoint Counsel #127 is GRANTED as unopposed. The Court will enter a Proposed Order if it is attached to the Motion. If there is not one attached, Plaintiffs' Counsel are directed to draft a Proposed Order and submit it for the Court's signature. The Court hears the arguments of Counsel regarding Defendant's Motion to Stay #103 . IT IS ORDERED: Defendant's Motion to Stay #103 is DENIED. The parties are directed to meet and confer and submit a proposed form of Confidentiality and Protective Order, as well as ESI Protocols, within 30 days from today's date. The Court is going to impose restrictions on discovery while the District Judge considers the pending Motion to Dismiss, and periodic Status Conferences will be held. Plaintiffs' Counsel are encouraged to reconsider their broad discovery requests. Status Conference set for 9/30/2015 @ 2:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Joint Status Report due by 9/25/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAM)
July 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER Granting #118 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Suzanne E. Jaffe and approving Designation of Local Counsel Richard J. Pocker for Zuffa, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/21/15. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER Granting #130 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Perry M. Grossman and approving Designation of Local Counsel Richard J. Pocker for Zuffa, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/21/15. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER Granting #119 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Marcy Norwwod Lynch and approving Designation of Local Counsel Richard J. Pocker for Zuffa, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/21/15. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER Granting #117 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John F. Cove, Jr. and approving Designation of Local Counsel Richard J. Pocker for Zuffa, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/21/15. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER Granting #116 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney William A. Isaacson and approving Designation of Local Counsel Richard J. Pocker for Zuffa, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/21/15. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 133 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Richard F. Boulware, II, on 7/21/2015. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that rulings on Plaintiffs Counsels Verified Petitions for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and Designation of Local Counsel #110 , #111 , #112 , #113 , #114 , #115 , #121 , #122 , #123 , #124 , #125 , #131 , and #132 are DEFERRED. While not every Petition is deficient in precisely the same ways, each Petition suffers from one or more deficiencies described herein.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioners shall respond completely to question No. 2 on Page 1 of the Verified Petition For Permission To Practice In This Case Only By Attorney Not Admitted To The Bar Of This Court And Designation Of Local Counsel. All clients represented must be identified; "Plaintiff" or "Plaintiffs" does not identify a client(s).IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioners shall provide a current Certificate of Good Standing from EACH state in which Petitioners have been admitted to practice law, in accordance with the instructions set forth on Page 2, No. 3 of the Verified Petition. Federal courts are neither the highest admitting state court nor the state bar.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioners shall respond completely to question No. 4 on Page 2 of the Verified Petition. Unknown is an inappropriate description of any aspect of a Petitioners bar status. The District of Columbia is a state, territory, or insular possession of the United States and may not be omitted.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioners shall respond to all questions, including Nos. 6 and 8, in the Verified Petition.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioners signatures, on Page 4 of the Verified Petition, must be notarized, and the notary must sign where indicated and affix his/her notary seal.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioners shall include the printed name and, if applicable, title of EACH party appointing Designated Resident Nevada Counsel in this case, in accordance with the instruction set forth on Page 5 of the Verified Petition. Petitioners shall have 14 days from the entry of this order to file their corrected Verified Petitions using the "Notice of Corrected Image/Document" event. Failure to timely remedy deficiencies will result in the denial of the Verified Petition, and Petitioner will be required to refile and to repay the filing fees. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CVL) Modified on 7/23/2015 to correct "" in 2nd paragraph only (BEL).
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 132 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey J. Corrigan and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-3739654) filed by Consol Plaintiffs Mac Danzig, Pablo Garza, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Kyle Kingsbury, Gabe Ruediger, Darren Uyenoyama, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry . (Springmeyer, Don)
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 131 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jay S. Cohen and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-3739617) filed by Consol Plaintiffs Mac Danzig, Pablo Garza, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Kyle Kingsbury, Gabe Ruediger, Darren Uyenoyama, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry . (Springmeyer, Don)
July 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 130 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Perry M. Grossman and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Richard J. Pocker (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-3738834) filed by Defendant Zuffa, LLC . (Pocker, Richard)
July 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 129 NOTICE of Hearing on #127 Unopposed MOTION for Appointment of Counsel Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel And Interim Liaison Counsel : Motion Hearing set for 7/28/2015, at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen, to be heard in conjunction with the #103 Motion to Stay Discovery currently scheduled for the same date and time.(no image attached)(TKH)
July 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 128 REPLY to Response to #103 Motion to Stay filed by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Williams, J.)
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 127 Unopposed MOTION for Appointment of Counsel Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel And Interim Liaison Counsel by Consol Plaintiffs Mac Danzig, Pablo Garza, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Kyle Kingsbury, Gabe Ruediger, Darren Uyenoyama, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Don Springmeyer, #2 Exhibit 1 - Cramer Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 - Saveri Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 - Brown Declaration, #5 Proposed Order)(Springmeyer, Don)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 126 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Benjamin Doyle Brown and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-3726962) filed by Consol Plaintiffs Mac Danzig, Pablo Garza, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Kyle Kingsbury, Gabe Ruediger, Darren Uyenoyama, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry . (Springmeyer, Don) Corrected image #146 attached on 8/4/2015 (DKJ).
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 125 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Kevin E. Rayhill and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-3724603) filed by Consol Plaintiffs Mac Danzig, Pablo Garza, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Kyle Kingsbury, Gabe Ruediger, Darren Uyenoyama, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry . (Springmeyer, Don) Corrected image #143 attached on 8/4/2015 (DKJ).
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 124 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Matthew S. Weiler and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-3724595) filed by Consol Plaintiffs Mac Danzig, Pablo Garza, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Kyle Kingsbury, Gabe Ruediger, Darren Uyenoyama, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry . (Springmeyer, Don)
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 123 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Joseph R. Saveri and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-3724575) filed by Consol Plaintiffs Mac Danzig, Pablo Garza, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Kyle Kingsbury, Gabe Ruediger, Darren Uyenoyama, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry . (Springmeyer, Don) Corrected image #144 attached on 8/4/2015 (DKJ).
July 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 122 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Richard A. Koffman and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-3723667) filed by Consol Plaintiffs Mac Danzig, Pablo Garza, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Kyle Kingsbury, Gabe Ruediger, Darren Uyenoyama, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry . (Springmeyer, Don) (Main Document 122 replaced on 7/6/2015) (DKJ). Corrected image #147 attached on 8/4/2015 (DKJ).
July 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 121 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Hiba Mahmoud Hafiz and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-3723654) filed by Consol Plaintiffs Mac Danzig, Pablo Garza, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Kyle Kingsbury, Gabe Ruediger, Darren Uyenoyama, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry . (Springmeyer, Don) Corrected image #145 attached on 8/4/2015 (DKJ).
July 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 120 RESPONSE to #103 Motion to Stay, filed by Consol Plaintiffs Mac Danzig, Pablo Garza, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Kyle Kingsbury, Gabe Ruediger, Darren Uyenoyama, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry. Replies due by 7/12/2015. (Springmeyer, Don)
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 119 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Marcy Norwood Lynch and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Richard J. Pocker (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-3721879) filed by Defendant Zuffa, LLC . (Pocker, Richard)
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 118 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Suzanne E. Jaffe and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Richard J. Pocker (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-3721867) filed by Defendant Zuffa, LLC . (Pocker, Richard)
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 117 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by John F. Cove, Jr. and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Richard J. Pocker (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-3721850) filed by Defendant Zuffa, LLC . (Pocker, Richard)
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 116 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by William A. Isaacson and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Richard J. Pocker (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-3721840) filed by Defendant Zuffa, LLC . (Pocker, Richard)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 115 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jerome K. Elwell and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-3718681) filed by Consol Plaintiffs Mac Danzig, Pablo Garza, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Kyle Kingsbury, Gabe Ruediger, Darren Uyenoyama, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry . (Springmeyer, Don) Corrected image #148 attached on 8/4/2015 (DKJ).
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 114 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Robert C. Maysey and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-3718663) filed by Consol Plaintiffs Mac Danzig, Pablo Garza, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Kyle Kingsbury, Gabe Ruediger, Darren Uyenoyama, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry . (Springmeyer, Don) Corrected image #151 attached on 8/4/2015 (RFJ).
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 113 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Frederick S. Schwartz and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-3718612) filed by Consol Plaintiffs Mac Danzig, Pablo Garza, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Kyle Kingsbury, Gabe Ruediger, Darren Uyenoyama, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry . (Springmeyer, Don) Corrected image #149 attached on 8/4/2015 (DKJ).
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 112 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Patrick F. Madden and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-3718606) filed by Consol Plaintiffs Mac Danzig, Pablo Garza, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Kyle Kingsbury, Gabe Ruediger, Darren Uyenoyama, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry . (Springmeyer, Don) Corrected image #141 attached on 8/4/2015 (DKJ).
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 111 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Michael C. Dell'Angelo and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-3718578) filed by Consol Plaintiffs Mac Danzig, Pablo Garza, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Kyle Kingsbury, Gabe Ruediger, Darren Uyenoyama, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry . (Springmeyer, Don) Corrected image #142 attached on 8/4/2015 (DKJ).
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 110 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Eric L. Cramer and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-3718548) filed by Consol Plaintiffs Mac Danzig, Pablo Garza, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Kyle Kingsbury, Gabe Ruediger, Darren Uyenoyama, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry . (Springmeyer, Don)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER Granting #105 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to #103 Motion to Stay. Response due 7/2/2015. Reply due 7/14/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/29/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC) Modified on 6/30/2015 to reflect proper deadline dates - (DC).
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER Granting #106 Stipulation to Continue Hearing Date re #103 Motion to Stay. Motion Hearing reset for 7/28/2015 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/29/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ERRATA to #103 Motion to Stay ; filed by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Williams, J.)
June 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 106 STIPULATION to continue re 104 Notice of Hearing on Motion ; filed by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Williams, J.)
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 105 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re #103 Motion to Stay filed by Consol Plaintiffs Mac Danzig, Pablo Garza, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Kyle Kingsbury, Gabe Ruediger, Darren Uyenoyama, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Springmeyer, Don)
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 104 NOTICE of Hearing on #103 MOTION to Stay re Discovery : Motion Hearing set for 7/21/2015, at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (no image attached)(TKH)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MOTION to Stay re Discovery filed by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John F. Cove, Jr.)(Williams, J.)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 102 Joint STATUS REPORT by Consol Plaintiffs Mac Danzig, Pablo Garza, Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Kyle Kingsbury, Gabe Ruediger, Darren Uyenoyama, Luis Javier Vazquez, Brandon Vera, Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry. (Springmeyer, Don)
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER to Consolidate. It is ORDERED that 2:15-cv-1046-RCJ-NJK; 2:15-cv-01055-APG-GWF; 2:15-cv-01056-RFB-GWF; 2:15-cv-01057-JCM-CWH is/are consolidated under 2:15-cv-01045-RFB-PAL. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that #52 Motion to Consolidate is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/11/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR) Modified on 9/30/2015 to correct motion link (AF).
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 100 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Zuffa, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate January Capital, Other Affiliate Fertitta Business Management, LLC, Other Affiliate Frank J. Fertitta III Family Trust, Other Affiliate Lorenzo J. Fertitta Family Trust, Other Affiliate Dana White Family Trust, Other Affiliate Zuffa Pipco 1, LLC for Zuffa, LLC added. . (Pocker, Richard)
June 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 99 NOTICE OF RELATED CASES 2:15-cv-1056; 2:15-cv-1055; 2:15-cv-1057; 2:15-cv-1046 by Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry. (Springmeyer, Don)
June 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 98 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Don Springmeyer on behalf of Plaintiffs Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry. (Springmeyer, Don)
June 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney J. Colby Williams on behalf of Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Williams, J.)
June 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 96 NOTICE OF RELATED CASES 2:15-cv-01055-APG-GWF; 2:15-cv-01056-RFB-GWF; 2:15-cv-01057-JCM-CWH; 2:15-cv-01046-RCJ-NJK by Defendant Zuffa, LLC. (Pocker, Richard)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 5:14-cv-05484. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (TR)
June 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 95 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 10-2. Counsel: All out of State Counsel to comply with completion and electronic filing of the Designation of Local Counsel and Verified Petition. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney(s). Verified Petition due by 7/18/2015. (no image attached) (TR)
June 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (TR)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting #31 Motion to Transfer Case. The Clerk shall TRANSFER the above-captioned actions to the United States District Court for the District of Nevada, Las Vegas Division, and close this court's files. All matters calendared before the undersigned are VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/2/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/4/2015.]
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER Granting (91) Stipulation in case 5:14-cv-05484-EJD; Granting (60) Stipulation in case 5:14-cv-05591-EJD; Granting (60) Stipulation in case 5:14-cv-05621-EJD; Granting (37) Stipulation in case 5:15-cv-00521-EJD; Granting (32) Stipulation in case 5:15-cv-01324-EJD to STAY DISCOVERYPENDING RESOLUTION OF THE MOTION TO TRANSFER. Discovery will be stayed pending the resolution of the pending Motion to Transfer. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/1/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/4/2015.]
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 91 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY PENDING RESOLUTION OF THE MOTION TO TRANSFER filed by Zuffa, LLC. (Cove, John) (Filed on 5/29/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/4/2015.]
May 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER GRANTING (35 in 5:15-cv-00521-EJD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (34) MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Mac Danzig, Gabe Ruediger, (58 in 5:14-cv-05591-EJD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (57) MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Dennis Lloyd Hallman, Luis Javier Vazquez, (89 in 5:14-cv-05484-EJD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (87) MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Nathan Quarry, Jon Fitch, Cung Le, (58 in 5:14-cv-05621-EJD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (57) MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Pablo Garza, Brandon Vera, (30 in 5:15-cv-01324-EJD) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (29) MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Darren Uyenoyama, Kyle Kingsbury, Set/Reset Deadlines as to (87 in 5:14-cv-05484-EJD) MOTION to Stay Discovery, (57 in 5:14-cv-05591-EJD) MOTION to Stay Discovery, (57 in 5:14-cv-05621-EJD) MOTION to Stay Discovery, (34 in 5:15-cv-00521-EJD) MOTION to Stay Discovery, (29 in 5:15-cv-01324-EJD) MOTION to Stay Discovery: Responses due by 6/3/2015. Replies due by 6/17/2015. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/26/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/4/2015.]
May 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 89 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #87 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 5/22/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/4/2015.]
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Transcript of Proceedings held on 05/07/2015, before Judge Davila. Court Reporter Irene L. Rodriguez, Telephone number (408)947-8160 Irene_Rodriguez@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #85 Transcript Order, #84 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/12/2015. (Related documents(s) #85 , #84 ) (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 5/14/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/4/2015.]
May 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Zuffa, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 9/10/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 5/27/2015. Replies due by 6/3/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Isaacson, William) (Filed on 5/13/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/4/2015.]
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options of Plaintiff Jon Fitch (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 5/7/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/4/2015.]
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 85 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 5/7/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/4/2015.]
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 84 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Zuffa, LLC for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Grossman, Perry) (Filed on 5/7/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/4/2015.]
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 83 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Edward J. Davila: Motion Hearing held on 5/7/2015 re (31 in 5:14-cv-05484-EJD, 18 in 5:14-cv-05591-EJD, 18 in 5:14-cv-05621-EJD, 18 in 5:15-cv-00521-EJD, 12 in :15-cv-01324 ) MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Zuffa, LLC.) Motions submitted. The Court to issue further order following hearing. 5/7/2015 case management conference vacated. The Court to issue further order following hearing. Court Reporter Name: Irene Rodriguez (Time in Court 9:06 - 10:11) (ecg, COURT STAFF)(Date Filed: 5/7/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/4/2015.]
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 82 REPLY (re #64 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byZuffa, LLC. (Isaacson, William) (Filed on 5/1/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/4/2015.]
May 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 81 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Amended) filed by Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 5/1/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/4/2015.]
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 80 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 4/30/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/4/2015.]
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 79 REPLY (re #31 MOTION to Transfer Case ) filed byZuffa, LLC. (Isaacson, William) (Filed on 4/28/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/4/2015.]
April 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS. These parties will participate in mediation with a mutually agreed upon mediator at a time to be agreed upon not later than September 30, 2015 in satisfaction of the parties' ADR obligations in this case pursuant to Civil L.R. 16-8 and ADR L.R. 3-5. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/17/2015. Motions terminated: (28 in 5:15-cv-00521-EJD) STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Zuffa, LLC filed by Zuffa, LLC, (77 in 5:14-cv-05484-EJD) STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Zuffa, LLC filed by Zuffa, LLC, (21 in 5:15-cv-01324-EJD) STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Zuffa, LLC filed by Zuffa, LLC, (50 in 5:14-cv-05591-EJD) STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Zuffa, LLC filed by Zuffa, LLC, (50 in 5:14-cv-05621-EJD) STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Zuffa, LLC filed by Zuffa, LLC (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/4/2015.]
April 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 77 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Zuffa, LLC filed by Zuffa, LLC. (Cove, John) (Filed on 4/16/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/4/2015.]
April 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options of Plaintiff Nathan Quarry (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 4/16/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/4/2015.]
April 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options for Plaintiff Cung Le (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 4/16/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/4/2015.]
April 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Cove, John) (Filed on 4/16/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/4/2015.]
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 73 DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF CUNG LE re CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [69-1] by Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 4/13/2015) Modified on 4/14/2015 (cv, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 6/4/2015.]
April 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Request for Judicial Notice filed byJon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry. (Attachments: #1 Decl of Joseph Saveri ISO Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exh 1 to Saveri Decl, #3 Exh 2 to Saveri Decl, #4 Exh 3 to Saveri Decl, #5 Exh 4 to Saveri Decl, #6 Exh 5 to Saveri Decl, #7 Exh 6 to Saveri Decl, #8 Exh 7 to Saveri Decl, #9 Exh 8 to Saveri Decl, #10 Exh 9 to Saveri Decl, #11 Exh 10 to Saveri Decl, #12 Exh 11 to Saveri Decl, #13 Exh 12 to Saveri Decl, #14 Exh 13 to Saveri Decl, #15 Exh 14 to Saveri Decl, #16 Exh 15 to Saveri Decl, #17 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 4/10/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/4/2015.]
April 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 71 RESPONSE (re #64 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byJon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 4/10/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/4/2015.]
April 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Request for Judicial Notice filed byJon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry. (Attachments: #1 Decl of Joseph Saveri ISO Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exh 1 to Saveri Decl, #3 Exh 2 to Saveri Decl, #4 Exh 3 to Saveri Decl, #5 Exh 4 to Saveri Decl, #6 Exh 5 to Saveri Decl, #7 Exh 6 to Saveri Decl, #8 Exh 7 to Saveri Decl, #9 Exh 8 to Saveri Decl, #10 Exh 9 to Saveri Decl, #11 Exh 10 to Saveri Decl, #12 Exh 11 to Saveri Decl, #13 Exh 12 to Saveri Decl, #14 Exh 13 to Saveri Decl, #15 Exh 14 to Saveri Decl, #16 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 4/10/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/4/2015.]
April 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 69 RESPONSE (re #31 MOTION to Transfer Case ) filed byJon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry. (Attachments: #1 Le Decl ISO Plaintiff's Opposition, #2 Kingsbury Decl ISO Plaintiff's Opposition, #3 Fitch Decl ISO Plaintiff's Opposition, #4 Proposed Order)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 4/10/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/4/2015.]
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 RELATED CASE ORDER. Kingsbury et al. v. Zuffa, LLC, No. 5:15-cv-01324-PSG and Le et al v. Zuffa, LLC, No. 5:14-cv-05484-EJD ARE RELATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/24/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/4/2015.]
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MOTION to Relate Case - Kingsbury et al. v. Zuffa, LLC, No. 5:15-cv-01324-PSG filed by Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Rayhill Declaration ISO Motion to Relate Case, #3 Exh A- Le Complaint, #4 Exh B- Kingsbury Complaint)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 3/23/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/4/2015.]
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 66 REPLY (re #52 MOTION to Consolidate Cases ) filed byJon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry. (Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 3/3/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/4/2015.]
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Request for Judicial Notice re #64 MOTION to Dismiss filed byZuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Suzanne E. Jaffe, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J)(Related document(s) #64 ) (Isaacson, William) (Filed on 2/27/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/4/2015.]
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Zuffa, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 7/23/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 4/10/2015. Replies due by 5/1/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Isaacson, William) (Filed on 2/27/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/4/2015.]
February 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 RESPONSE (re #58 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion to Appoint Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel ) filed byZuffa, LLC. (Cove, John) (Filed on 2/27/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/4/2015.]
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 RESPONSE (re #52 MOTION to Consolidate Cases ) (Amended) and Cross-Motion for Consolidation for All Purposes filed byZuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cove, John) (Filed on 2/24/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/4/2015.]
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 RESPONSE (re #52 MOTION to Consolidate Cases ) and Cross-Motion to Consolidate for All Purposes filed byZuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cove, John) (Filed on 2/24/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/4/2015.]
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 CLERK'S NOTICE Setting Motion for Hearing. Set/Reset Deadlines as to (58 in 5:14-cv-05484-EJD) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion to Appoint Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel, (34 in 5:14-cv-05591-EJD) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion to Appoint Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel, (34 in 5:14-cv-05621-EJD) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion to Appoint Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel. Motion Hearing set for 6/11/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/4/2015.]
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 RELATED CASE ORDER. 5:14-cv-05484-EJD Le et al v. Zuffa, LLC and 5:15-cv-00521-NC Ruediger et al v. Zuffa, LLC ARE RELATED. Motions terminated: (6 in 5:15-cv-00521-NC) MOTION to Relate Case filed by Mac Danzig, Gabe Ruediger, (49 in 5:14-cv-05484-EJD) MOTION to Relate Case filed by Nathan Quarry, Jon Fitch, Cung Le. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/17/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/4/2015.]
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion to Appoint Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel filed by Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Saveri Decl ISO Motion to Appoint Lead Counsel, #3 Saveri Decl Ex. 1, #4 Saveri Decl Ex. 2, #5 Saveri Decl Ex. 3, #6 Saveri Decl Ex. 4, #7 Saveri Decl Ex. 5, #8 Saveri Decl Ex. 6, #9 Cramer Decl ISO Motion to Appoint Lead Counsel, #10 Cramer Decl Ex. A, #11 Brown Decl ISO Motion to Appoint Lead Counsel, #12 Brown Decl Ex. A)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/13/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/4/2015.]
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard James Pocker (Pocker, Richard) (Filed on 2/13/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/4/2015.]
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 RESPONSE (re #49 MOTION to Relate Case ) Statement of Non-Opposition filed byZuffa, LLC. (Cove, John) (Filed on 2/13/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/4/2015.]
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Certificate of Interested Entities by Zuffa, LLC (Cove, John) (Filed on 2/13/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/4/2015.]
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Charles Maysey (Maysey, Robert) (Filed on 2/13/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/4/2015.]
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick S. Schwartz (Schwartz, Frederick) (Filed on 2/11/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/4/2015.]
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry. Motion Hearing set for 6/11/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 2/24/2015. Replies due by 3/3/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Case Management Order)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/10/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/4/2015.]
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER denying (32) Motion to Advance Hearing Date in case 5:14-cv-05484-EJD; denying (19) Motion to Advance Hearing Date in case 5:14-cv-05591-EJD; denying (19) Motion to Advance Hearing Date in case 5:14-cv-05621-EJD. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/10/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/4/2015.]
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearing re (27 in 5:14-cv-05621-EJD, 27 in 5:14-cv-05591-EJD, 50 in 5:14-cv-05484-EJD) Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel: Anticipated Motion Hearing set for 6/11/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/4/2015.]
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER denying without prejudice (42) Motion to Appoint Counsel in case 5:14-cv-05484-EJD; denying without prejudice (24) Motion to Appoint Counsel in case 5:14-cv-05591-EJD; denying without prejudice (24) Motion to Appoint Counsel in case 5:14-cv-05621-EJD. Plaintiffs may re-file the motions pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-2, and shall notice the motions for hearing at 9:00 a.m. on 6/11/2015. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/9/2015. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/4/2015.]
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Rayhill Declaration ISO Motion to Relate Case, #3 Ex. A- Complaint, Le et al. v. Zuffa, LLC, 5:14-cv-05484-EJD,, #4 Ex. B- Complaint, Ruediger et al. v. Zuffa, LLC, 5:15-cv-00521-NC))(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/9/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/4/2015.]
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 RESPONSE (re #42 Amended MOTION to Appoint Counsel Replacing Dkt. No. 41 ) filed byZuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration John F. Cove, Jr., #2 Proposed Order)(Isaacson, William) (Filed on 2/9/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/4/2015.]
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Granting (45) Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document in case 5:14-cv-05484-EJD; Granting (21) Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document in case 5:14-cv-05591-EJD; Granting (21) Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document in case 5:14-cv-05621-EJD. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/4/2015. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/4/2015.]
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Declaration of Kirk D. Hendrick in Support of #31 MOTION to Transfer Case filed byZuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z)(Related document(s) #31 ) (Grossman, Perry) (Filed on 2/4/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/4/2015.]
February 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document filed by Zuffa, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grossman, Perry) (Filed on 2/4/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/4/2015.]
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Order Granting #38 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Donald J. Campbell for Defendant. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 2/3/2015.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/4/2015.]
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Order Granting #37 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of J. Colby Williams for Defendant. Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 2/3/2015.(ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/4/2015.]
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Amended MOTION to Appoint Counsel Replacing Dkt. No. 41 filed by Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Saveri Declaration ISO Mot. to Appoint Lead Counsel, #3 Exhibit A - Berger Montague Firm Bio, #4 Exhibit B - Cohen Milstein Firm Bio, #5 Exhibit C - Joseph Saveri Firm Bio)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/3/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/4/2015.]
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 *** POSTED IN ERROR *** please see #42 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Jon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Saveri Declaration ISO Mot. to Apoint lead Counsel)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/3/2015) Modified on 2/3/2015 (cv, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 6/4/2015.]
February 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Charles Maysey (Maysey, Robert) (Filed on 2/3/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/4/2015.]
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 RESPONSE (re #32 MOTION to Expedite /Advance Hearing Date on Motion to Transfer Case (Dk. 31) [ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION] ) filed byJon Fitch, Cung Le, Nathan Quarry. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph R. Saveri, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Joseph R. Saveri, #3 Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Joseph R. Saveri)(Saveri, Joseph) (Filed on 2/2/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/4/2015.]
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9255210.) filed by Zuffa, LLC. (Campbell, Donald) (Filed on 2/2/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/4/2015.]
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9255163.) filed by Zuffa, LLC. (Williams, Jon) (Filed on 2/2/2015) [Transferred from California Northern on 6/4/2015.]