Harriet H. Roland, M.B.A., J.D., Ltd. vs Darlene Hickman, et al
Plaintiff: Harriet H. Roland, M.B.A., J.D., Ltd.
Defendant: Darlene Hickman, Marvin Hickman, Internal Revenue Service and Summerlin Hospital Medical Center
Unknown: Andrew L. Kynaston
Case Number: 2:2015cv01133
Filed: June 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1442 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that 74 Magistrate Judge Ferenbach's report and recommendation be, and the same hereby is, ADOPTED in its entirety. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the instant case be, and the same hereby is, DI SMISSED with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 47 defendant IRS's motion to reconsider be, and the same hereby is, DENIED as moot. The clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/6/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. IT IS HEREBY RECOMMENDED that this action be dismissed with prejudice each party bearing its own costs and attorneys fees. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for Marvin Hickman and Darlene Hickman must file certifications with the court documenting the time and manner in which they provided each client with a copy of this Order and Report and Recommendation, and informed them of the deadline for objection. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, effective on the respe ctive date each counsel files the certification required above, 49 , 61 Motions to Withdraw are GRANTED. ( Objections to R&R due by 10/25/2017.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/11/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 69 the IRS' motion to continue 9/22/17, Status hearing and 70 Motion to Appear at 9/19/17, hearing by Telephone are GRANTED. The hearing on Motion for Guidance as to Whether it May Contact Defendant Da rlene Hickman Directly scheduled for 9/19/17 and Status hearing on 9/22/17 are rescheduled to 10:30 AM, 10/11/17, in Courtroom 3D. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Thomas C. Michaelides, Esq. must attend the 10/11/17 hearing in person. The IRS may appear telephonically at the 10/11/17 hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/18/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER re 69 Government's Motion to Continue 9/22/17 Status Hearing and 70 Motion for Leave to Appear at 9/19/17 hearing by Telephone. ORDERED that any opposition to the governments motion to continue September 22, 2017, Status hearing ( ECF No. 69 ) and Motion to Appear at September 19, 2017, hearing by Telephone (ECF No. 70 ) must be filed on or before September 15, 2017. No reply necessary. If no opposition is filed, the status hearing will be rescheduled to 10:30 AM, October 11, 2017, in Courtroom 3D, and may appear by telephone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/12/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a hearing on 67 the Motion for Guidance as to Whether it May Contact Defendant Darlene Hickman Directly is scheduled for 2:00 PM, 9/19/17, in Courtroom 3D. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Thomas C. Michaelides, Esq. must attend the hearing in person. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/11/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a status hearing is scheduled for 10:00 AM, 9/22/17, in Courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/16/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 60 the IRS's motion to stay be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED IN PART and DENIED AS MOOT IN PART. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the IRS shall submit a status report regarding the notic e of levy to the court within ten (10) days of the date of this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline to object to the magistrate judge's 5/23/17, orders shall be EXTENDED to fourteen (14) days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/5/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a hearing on 48 the Motion to Stay is scheduled for 11:00 AM, 5/23/17, in Courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/1/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a hearing on 49 the Motion and Proposed Order to Withdraw as Counsel of Record is scheduled for 11:00 AM, 5/23/17, in Courtroom 3D. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Tiffany Barney, Esq. is directed to deliver a copy of this Order to Theresa Mains, Esq. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Marvin Hickman must arrange for Ms. Mains to attend the scheduled hearing at 11:00 AM, 5/23/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/21/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 39 the IRS's motion be, and the same hereby is, DENIED, without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the IRS may file motions seeking the forms of relief presented by the instant motion within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this order, consistent with the foregoing. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/17/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 43 Motion to Stay Pending Motions is Granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 01/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the report and recommendation of Magistrate Judge Ferenbach 34 are ADOPTED, consistent with the foregoing.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Marvin Hickman's Motion to Dismiss for l ack of subject matter jurisdiction 15 be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Harriet H. Roland, M.B.A., J.D., Ltd.s interpleader action [1-2] be, and the same hereby is, REMANDED to state court for further proceedings. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of court shall transfer the funds in the courts registry 32 to the Eighth Judicial District Court, Department E, for further proceedings in the matter of Harriet H. Roland, M.B.A., J.D., Ltd. v. Darlene Hickman, et al., D-14-490939-d. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/28/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting 9 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Tiffany S. Barney is substituted in place and stead of Andrew L. Kynaston for defendant Marvin Hickman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/6/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harriet H. Roland, M.B.A., J.D., Ltd. vs Darlene Hickman, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harriet H. Roland, M.B.A., J.D., Ltd.
Represented By: Harriet H Roland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darlene Hickman
Represented By: Thomas C. Michaelides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Hickman
Represented By: Tiffany S Barney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Virginia Cronan Lowe
Represented By: E. Carmen Ramirez
Represented By: Blaine T Welsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summerlin Hospital Medical Center
Represented By: Richard Dreitzer
Represented By: Amanda L. Ireland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Andrew L. Kynaston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?