Deutsche Bank National Trust Company v. Talasera and Vicanto Homeowners' Association et al
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool I, LLC and Talasera and Vicanto Homeowners' Association
Case Number: 2:2015cv01139
Filed: June 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition to Quiet Title
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 JUDGMENT in favor of SFR Investments Pool I, LLC against Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/1/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER Granting SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC's 108 Motion for Entry of Judgment. SFR shall within 10 days of the entry of this order prepare and file an appropriate judgment for the court's signature. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER Granting Defendant Talasera and Vicanto Homeowners' Association's 100 Motion for Summary Judgment. The clerk is instructed to enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/3/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER Granting 102 Stipulation to Dismiss Without Prejudice SFR's Third Claim for Relief for Slander of Title Claim against Deutsche Bank and Nationstar. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/5/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER that the HOA's 72 Motion to Dismiss is Granted in part and Denied in part. SFR's 62 Motion for Summary Judgment is Granted in part and Denied in part. The Bank's 89 Motion for Summary Judgment is Denied. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/24/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER Denying Defendant Talasera and Vicanto Homeowners' Association's 84 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 01/10/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER Granting 90 Emergency Motion to Stay Briefing and/or Litigation. This matter is Stayed until 30 days after the order of mandate is entered in Bourne Valley v. Wells Fargo Bank, Case No 13-cv-0649 JCM-GWF. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/12/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER Denying 83 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 81 defendant's reply, be, and the same hereby is, STRICKEN from the record. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the defendant shall have seven (7) days from the date of this order to file a reply to 78 lenders' response that complies with the page limit provided by the local rules. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/25/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Granting 52 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Bank of America. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/17/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER that the stay in this matter is LIFTED. The discovery cutoff is 5/20/2016 and the parties shall comply with the deadlines established by the 24 Joint Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/23/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company v. Talasera and Vicanto Homeowners' Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Represented By: Allison R. Schmidt
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool I, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Talasera and Vicanto Homeowners' Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?