Mark Elliott v. Oakridge Industries, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Mark Elliott
Defendant: Oakridge Industries, Inc. and Prescott Companies, LLC
Case Number: 2:2015cv01143
Filed: June 17, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 113 defendant Oakridge Industries, Inc.'s motion for summary judgment is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 121 defendant The Prescott Companies, LLC's motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of court shall enter judgment in favor of defendants Oakridge Industries, Inc. and The Prescott Companies, LLC and against plaintiff Mark Elliott and close this case. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 129 Oakridge's Motion for Protective Order and 131 Motion for Sanctions are GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall pay Oakridge $1,000 to partially offset attorney's fees attributabl e to the motion for protective order. Payment is stayed pending further order of the Court upon the resolution of this lawsuit. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 132 Oakridge's Motion for Hearing is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the 2/16/18 deposition of Chris Eskridge is vacated pending resolution of this motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 129 , 131 , 132 Motion for Protective Order, Hearing and Sanctions will be briefed in the ordinary course. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a show cause hearing is scheduled for 10:00 a.m., 11/1/17, in courtroom TBD. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on or before 4:00 p.m., 10/20/17, Injury Lawyers of Nevada must file with the Court a response showing cause as to why it should not be sanctioned for failure to respond to Plaintiff's subpoena. No reply is required. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on or before 4:00 p.m.,10/20/17, Injury Lawyers of Nevada must file with the Court a response to 103 Pla intiff's Motion to Compel. A reply is due not later than 4:00 p.m., 10/27/17. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff must personally serve Injury Lawyers of Nevada with a copy of 103 the Motion to Compel and this Order by means of a licensed process server, and file the return of service on the Court no later than 4:00 pm, 10/13/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/10/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER denying 95 Objection to Report and Recommendation and affirming 86 Order. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/24/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER Granting 89 Stipulation to Extend Time re 78 , 79 , 80 MOTIONS to Compel. See Order for deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/10/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER Granting 87 Stipulation to Extend Time re 78 , 79 , 80 MOTIONS to Compel. (Responses due by 8/23/2017.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/8/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER Granting 84 Unopposed Motion for Out of State Counsel to Appear by Telephone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/2/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a hearing on 73 Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines is scheduled for 1:00 PM, 8/4/17, in Courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the status hearing scheduled for 6/8/2017 is VACATED and RESCHEDULED to 11:00 AM, 4/18/2017, in Courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/8/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Declining to adopt 44 the Magistrate Judge's report and recommendation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties are referred to the Magistrate Judge to discuss moving the proceedings along in this case. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/5/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Granting 47 Motion for Copy of Sealed Transcript. The Court of Clerk is directed to mail a copy of 45 the sealed transcript to Plaintiff Mark Elliott at the address listed on the docket. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/28/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting ECF No. 19 Motion to Dismiss Punitive Damages Claim. Amended complaint due within 21 days. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/17/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER that 36 Emergency Motion to Allow Mark Elliot to Appear by Telephone is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/13/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER that a hearing on Plaintiff's counsel's 34 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record is scheduled for 5/17/2016 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Plaintiff Mark Elliott must appear in person at the hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/5/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mark Elliott v. Oakridge Industries, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Elliott
Represented By: Jared B Anderson
Represented By: David J. Churchill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakridge Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Brooke A. Bohlke
Represented By: Janice M Michaels
Represented By: Andrew J Sharples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prescott Companies, LLC
Represented By: Avece M. Higbee
Represented By: Jack C. Juan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?