Christiana Trust v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
Christiana Trust |
Defendant: |
Cornerstone Homeowners Association, SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC and Terra West Collections Group, LLC |
Case Number: |
2:2015cv01149 |
Filed: |
June 17, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Cam Ferenbach |
Presiding Judge: |
Richard F. Boulware |
Nature of Suit: |
Real Property: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 30, 2020 |
Filing
137
ORDER that Plaintiff Christiana Trust's 118 Motion for Summary Judgment is Granted as to the quiet title claim only. Defendant Cornerstone Homeowners Association's 119 Motion for Summary Judgment and Defendant Terra West Collections Group's 120 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings are Granted. The 3 and 21 Notices of Lis Pendens are expunged. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to close the case. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/30/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
March 3, 2017 |
Filing
93
ORDER Granting 92 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) to File a Reply to 82 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. SFR's Replies due by 3/13/2017. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/3/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
February 10, 2017 |
Filing
90
ORDER Granting 87 Stipulation to Withdraw Slander of Title Claim. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/10/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
January 11, 2017 |
Filing
86
ORDER Granting 85 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 82 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Christiana Trusts' Responses due by 2/2/2017. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/11/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
January 6, 2017 |
Filing
84
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC's 80 Motion to Certify a Question of Law to Nevada's Supreme Court is Denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 01/05/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
|
April 7, 2016 |
Filing
46
ORDER that a hearing on the 45 Stipulation to Continue Dispositive Motion Deadline is set for 4/13/2016 02:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/7/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
March 17, 2016 |
Filing
42
AMENDED ORDER that a hearing on Plaintiff Christina Trust's 35 Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines and 39 Motion to Stay Pending a Ruling On Defendant Bank of America, N.A.'s Motion to Dismiss is set for 4/13/2016 02:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/17/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?