December 9, 2021 |
Filing
111
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant shall reimburse Plaintiffs in the sum of $19,542.00. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/9/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
|
August 19, 2021 |
Filing
110
ORDER Granting 109 Stipulation For Dismissal with Prejudice as to Amanda La Forte and Joseph Portilla. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/19/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
July 23, 2020 |
Filing
103
ORDER Granting 102 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 101 Order (Second Request). Supplemental Briefing due by 8/10/2020. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/23/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
July 13, 2020 |
Filing
101
ORDER Granting 100 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 99 Minutes of Proceedings (First Request). Supplemental Briefing due by 7/27/2020. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/13/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
June 4, 2020 |
Filing
95
ORDER FOR VIDEO TELECONFERENCE & TELEPHONE CONFERENCE APPEARANCE In Response to General Order 2020-5 by the Chief Judge of this District in which she has specifically authorized video teleconferences and telephone conferences pursuant to Section 15002(b) of the CARES Act, this Court has reviewed the record in this case and finds pursuant to Section 15002(b) that delay of the Evidentiary Hearing until an in-person hearing can be safely arranged would do harm to the interests of justice .Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that a Video Evidentiary Hearing is set for June 10, 2020 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 7C Before Judge Richard F. Boulware, II.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that members of the public seeking to have ac cess to this hearing must, prior to the day of the hearing, contact the Court by email to request access to and receive permission to listen this hearing by telephone. Members of the public granted such access must join the remote proceedings prior t o their official commencement. Once a remote proceeding has begun, no access will be granted to the proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that no one or entity or organization, including but not limited to counsel, counsel's agents or staff, the Defendant, law enforcement agents/officers, members of the public, who participate in or listen to this proceeding may record it in any manner. Any individual, entity or organization that records this proceeding without written authorization of the Court shall be subject to civil and/or criminal contempt penalties by this Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if questions, the parties shall contact the Courtroom Administrator at "blanca_lenzi@nvd.uscourts.gov", or (702) 464-5470 with information on how to participate in the video conference. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file any necessary signed documents at least ONE (1) Day prior to the scheduled hearing consistent with General Order 2020-05. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/4/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
|
April 29, 2019 |
Filing
73
ORDER granting 72 Stipulation; Re: 71 Motion for Hearing Before District Judge, Responses due by 4/29/2019. Replies due by 5/13/2019. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/29/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
September 30, 2018 |
Filing
58
ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 34 Motion for Summary Judgment.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' 35 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that declaratory relief is GRANTED in favor of Plaintiffs. The Court declares that the District deprived Plaintiffs of due process when it divested them of their post-probationary status without notice or a meaningful chance to be heard.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs be reinstated as post-probationary teachers of the District with back pay and benefits. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a status conference be set for October 19, 2018 at 2:00 PM in LV Courtroom 7C to determine the manner of awarding back pay and other relief in this case. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/30/2018. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
|
July 23, 2018 |
Filing
56
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Clark County Education Association shall have until 8/20/2018 to designate local counsel as counsel of record. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
May 31, 2018 |
Filing
55
ORDER Granting 54 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall add the last known address of Plaintiff, Clark County Education Association to the civil docket and serve Plaintiff with a copy of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/31/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
July 3, 2017 |
Filing
44
ORDER Granting 40 Stipulation to Extend Time re 34 , 35 Motions for Summary Judgment. See Order for deadlines. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/3/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
June 8, 2017 |
Filing
39
ORDER Granting 37 Stipulation to Extend Time re 35 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Responses due by 6/29/2017., Replies due by 7/27/2017.) Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/8/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
April 14, 2017 |
Filing
33
ORDER Granting 32 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request). Motions due by 5/25/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/14/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
April 3, 2017 |
Filing
31
ORDER Granting 30 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request). Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/3/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
September 26, 2016 |
Filing
24
ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 9 Motion to Dismiss as follows: Count I (Violation of the Contracts Clause) is dismissed.Count II (Due Process Clause) is not dismissed. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/26/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
|
November 3, 2015 |
Filing
21
ORDER Granting 20 Stipulation for Stay of Discovery Pending Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/03/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
|
September 28, 2015 |
Filing
14
ORDER Granting 13 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Reply to 9 MOTION to Dismiss. Replies due by 9/30/2015. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/28/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
July 30, 2015 |
Filing
8
ORDER Granting 7 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond re 1 Complaint. Clark County School District answer due 9/4/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/30/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|