Harden v. High Desert State Prison et al
Plaintiff: Harold D. Harden
Defendant: Dr. Bannister, High Desert State Prison, High Desert State Prison Medical Department, Dr. Jim Holmes, Dr. Koehn and Nevada Department of Corrections
Case Number: 2:2015cv01168
Filed: June 19, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 193 Plaintiff's motion for contempt of court is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 194 Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 205 Plaintiff's motion for judicial notice is DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/18/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 170 Plaintiff's motion of objection is DENIED. No correction to the docket text is necessary. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 177 Plaintiff's motion for status inquiry is GRANTED. This order shall serve as a r esponse to the request for a status inquiry. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 187 Plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/28/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 181 Amended ORDER to Produce Harold D. Harden re 179 Order Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: USM - JM)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER Denying 159 Motion for Magistrate Judge to Reconsider Magistrate Judge Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/6/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER to Produce Harold D. Harden, #96165. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/2/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: USM - ADR)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that 172 Plaintiff's motion is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is instructed to print one copy of the docket in this case and mail it to Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/12/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that 84 , 86 , 90 , 91 , 92 , 93 , 94 , 138 , 143 , and 148 are DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 139 Plaintiff's motion to correct an incomplete document is GRANTED. The Clerk shall attach the p ages of 139 marked as "Exhibit A" to 130 .IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 136 Defendant's motion to strike 136 is GRANTED. The Clerk shall strike Plaintiff's objection. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 11/2/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 137 Plaintiff's motion to request correctionsis DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/4/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 122 Motion for Copies of Filed Documents. The Clerk of Court will send Plaintiff copies of 97 , 111 , 112 , 113 , 114 , and 116 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 09/15/2016. (Copies of requested documents sent to Plaintiff - NEV). (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
March 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER. THE COURT HEREBY FINDS that HAROLD D. HARDEN, #96165, is presently in custody of the Nevada Department of Corrections, located at Ely State Prison, Indian Springs, Nevada.IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Warden of Ely State Prison, or his des ignee, shall transport and produce HAROLD D. HARDEN, #96165, to the Bruce R. Thompson Federal Building and United States Courthouse, 400 S. Virginia Street in Reno, Nevada on or about Monday, 3/21/16, at the hour of 11:30 a.m., courtroom to be determ ined, to attend a hearing in the instant matter, and arrange for his appearance on said date as ordered and directed by the Court entitled above, until HAROLD D. HARDEN, #96165, is released and discharged by the said Court; and that HAROLD D. HARDEN, #96165, shall thereafter be returned to the custody of the Warden, Ely State Prison, Ely, NV, under safe and secure conduct. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/11/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER regarding 4 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and 5 Motion for Order to Show Cause filed by Harold D. Harden. IT IS ORDERED that Defendants shall provide Plaintiff Harold D. Harden with no less than six (6) hours of time to vie w his complete medical file by 9/10/15. Defendants are permitted to divide this time into smaller blocks; however, each block of time must be no shorter than one hour. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/3/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER to produce Harold D. Harden. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Warden of Ely State Prison, or his designee, shall transport and produce Harold D. Harden, #96165, to the Lloyd D. George United States Courthouse, 333 Las Vegas Boulevard South, in La s Vegas, NV on 8/27/15 at 11:30 a.m. to attend hearings in the instant matter. That Harold D. Harden shall thereafter be returned to the custody of the Warden, Ely State Prison, Ely, NV. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/17/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harden v. High Desert State Prison et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Bannister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: High Desert State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: High Desert State Prison Medical Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Jim Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Koehn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold D. Harden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?