Bank of America, N.A. v. Woodcrest Homeowners Association et al
Plaintiff: |
Bank of America, N.A. |
Defendant: |
Las Vegas Development Group, LLC and Woodcrest Homeowners Association |
Case Number: |
2:2015cv01193 |
Filed: |
June 23, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Miranda M. Du |
Presiding Judge: |
George Foley |
Nature of Suit: |
Real Property: Foreclosure |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 11, 2019 |
Filing
93
ORDERED Defendant Airmotive's motion to dismiss (ECF No. 75 ) is denied. Plaintiff BANA's motion for partial summary judgment (ECF No. 76 ) is granted. The Court declares that the HOA Sale did not extinguish BANA's DO T. BANAs remaining claims are dismissed as moot. The following motions are denied as moot: Defendant Airmotive's motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 74 ); Defendant HOA's motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 77 ); and Plai ntiff BANA's motion for leave to file supplemental authority (ECF No. 92 ). The parties' stipulation for extension of time (ECF No. 73 ) is granted nunc pro tunc. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment in favor of BANA on its first claim for declaratory relief/quiet title and close this case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
December 20, 2018 |
Filing
90
ORDER granting ECF No. 89 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Reply Supporting ECF Nos. 76 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and 77 Motion for Summary Judgment. Replies due by 1/9/2019. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
|
December 3, 2018 |
Filing
83
ORDER granting ECF No. 81 Stipulation to Extend re ECF Nos. 74 , 76 and 77 Motions for Summary Judgment (First Request): Airmotive's Reply to ECF No. 74 Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/12/2018. Responses to ECF Nos. 76 and 77 Motions for Summary Judgment are due by 12/12/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/3/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
|
September 13, 2018 |
Filing
72
ORDER granting ECF No. 71 Stipulation to Substitute Real Party In Interest Airmotive Investments, LLC. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
|
July 26, 2018 |
Filing
64
ORDER approving ECF No. 63 Motion to Remove Attorney David A. Markman from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 7/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
|
November 29, 2017 |
Filing
55
ORDER granting ECF No. 54 Stipulation : Reply to ECF No. 51 Response re ECF No. 49 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment due by 12/22/2017. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/29/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
January 19, 2017 |
Filing
33
ORDER lifting temporary stay. Pending motions that were denied without prejudice when the stay was imposed may be refiled within 30 days. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/19/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
August 19, 2016 |
Filing
32
ORDER Staying Case Pending Issuance of Mandate in Bourne Valley Court Trust v. Wells Fargo Bank and Denying Pending Motions without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/19/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
August 4, 2016 |
Filing
31
ORDER granting ECF No. 30 Ex Parte Motion to Withdraw. Attorney H. Sunny Jeong withdrawn from case. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 8/4/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
November 25, 2015 |
Filing
20
ORDER Granting 19 Stipulation to Extend Time for Bank of America, N.A.'s to file a Response to 14 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative motion for summary judgment. Responses due by 12/7/2015. Replies due by 12/21/2015. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/24/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
|
November 13, 2015 |
Filing
18
ORDER Granting 17 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to 1 Complaint filed by Bank of America, N.A.. Woodcrest Homeowners Association answer due 11/5/2015. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/12/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?