Nationstar Mortgage, LLC v. The Springs at Spanish Trail Association et al
Plaintiff: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Defendant: Saticoy Bay, LLC, Series 6974 Emerald Springs and The Springs at Spanish Trail Association
Counter Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Counter Claimant: Saticoy Bay, LLC, Series 6974 Emerald Springs
Case Number: 2:2015cv01217
Filed: June 26, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Granting in Part 71 Motion for Summary Judgment and denying 72 Motion for Summary Judgment as moot. The Clerk of Court is directed to ENTER JUDGMENT in favor of Nationstar Mortgage, LLC and against Saticoy Bay, LLC, Series 6974 Emerald Springs, DECLARING that Saticoy Bay purchased the property at 6974 Emerald Springs Lane subject to the deed of trust dated 3/21/05, and CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/24/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Main Document 83 replaced on 5/24/2019) (MR).
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting 74 Stipulation; Re: 71 Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses due 1/4/2019. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 61 the motion to lift stay is GRANTED IN PART, in that THE STAY IS LIFTED. Motions due by 11/30/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/7/2018. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Granting 51 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Michael F. Bohn terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/3/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER denying without prejudice to the filing of a new motion after the Supreme Court rules on the Bourne Valley and Saticoy Bay petitions for certiorari review 47 Motion to Lift Stay. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER STAYING CASE Pending Issuance of Mandate and Denying All Motions without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/16/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Discharging Obligations under the Order to Show Cause Why this Case Should Not Be Dismissed for Want of Subject-matter Jurisdiction. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's obligations under 34 order to show cause are deemed to have been discharged. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/20/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part Defendant The Springs at Spanish Trail Association's 12 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 03/31/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting 26 Stipulation to Withdraw 22 Proposed Discovery Plan. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/3/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
August 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting 23 Stipulation to Extend Time to Reply to 12 Motion to Dismiss. Reply due by 9/4/2015. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/31/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting 20 Stipulation to Extend Time to Reply to 12 Motion to Dismiss. Reply due by 8/28/2015. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/26/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC v. The Springs at Spanish Trail Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Represented By: Christine M. Parvan
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Represented By: Christine M. Parvan
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Saticoy Bay, LLC, Series 6974 Emerald Springs
Represented By: Michael F. Bohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saticoy Bay, LLC, Series 6974 Emerald Springs
Represented By: Michael F. Bohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Springs at Spanish Trail Association
Represented By: Ryan D Hastings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?