Wise v. Southern Tier Express, Inc.

Plaintiff: Roderick Wise
Defendant: Southern Tier Express, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2015cv01219
Filed: June 26, 2015
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Referring Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 2, 2018 247 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 246 Stipulation; Re: 239 Motion for New Trial. Motion Hearing reset for 6/5/2018 at 10:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 9, 2018 241 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 240 Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 239 Motion for New Trial. Responses due by 3/30/2018. Replies due by 4/23/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 29, 2018 214 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that all meals and lodging, if required, for said jury shall be paid by the Clerk of Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Finance - SLD)
January 10, 2018 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 150 Stipulation re Defense Experts. Defendant's 149 Motion for Order Compelling Plaintiff to Compensate Experts is withdrawn as moot. The Calendar Call scheduled for 1/11/2018 is no longer needed and is vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 4, 2017 140 Opinion or Order of the Court REFERENCE ORDER. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Foley to conduct all proceedings and order the entry of final judgment. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/4/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 28, 2017 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Foley for Trial. Telephonic Status Check set for 12/5/2017 at 10:30 AM before Judge Andrew P. Gordon. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc:SLD)
July 10, 2017 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Defendant Southern Tier's 90 Omnibus Motion in Limine. The parties are to confer before calendar call to determine what portions of Ms. Springston's life care plan have become obsolete. The parties will update the court with a joint brief on this issue one week before calendar call. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/10/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 16, 2016 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Settlement Conference is continued to 1/4/2017 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach, Room 3005. Settlement statements are due to Judge Ferenbach's Chambers no later than 4:00 p.m., 12/28/2016. Defendant's 52 Motion to Reschedule Conference is Moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/10/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wise v. Southern Tier Express, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Tier Express, Inc.
Represented By: William W. McGaha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roderick Wise
Represented By: Luis A Ayon
Represented By: Joseph A. Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?