Petrarca v. Aranas et al
Plaintiff: |
Richard W. Petrarca |
Defendant: |
Dr. Romeo Aranas, Dr. Robert Bannister, Greg Cox, Dr Karen Gedney, Terri Jacobs, Dr. Marsha Johns, John Kids and Lisa Walsh |
Case Number: |
2:2015cv01231 |
Filed: |
June 29, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Carl W. Hoffman |
Presiding Judge: |
Richard F. Boulware |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights: Other |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 2, 2017 |
Filing
29
ORDER that this case is dismissed with prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/2/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
August 23, 2016 |
Filing
28
ORDER that the Court will dismiss the case in ninety (90) days if there is no motion to substitute filed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25(a)(1). FURTHER ORDERED that 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/22/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
May 5, 2016 |
Filing
25
ORDER that 24 Motion to Extend Time is granted. Plaintiff must file his amended complaint no later than June 2, 2016. FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff falls to file an amended complaint curing the deficiencies outlined in the screening order (ECF No. 14), this action will proceed against Dr. Gedney and Does 1-12 on the Eighth Amendment claim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 5/5/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
March 7, 2016 |
Filing
22
ORDER that 17 Motion for Reconsideration of Plaintiff's Motion Seeking Appointment of Counsel is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that this case is referred to the Pilot Pro Bono Program adopted in General Order 2014-01 for the purpose of identifyin g an attorney willing to be appointed as a pro bono attorney for Plaintiff. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court must forward this order to the Pro Bono Liaison. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/7/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF: Pro Bono Liaison - MMM)
|
March 2, 2016 |
Filing
21
ORDER that 18 Motion to Extend Time to File Amended Complaint is granted. Plaintiff shall file his amended complaint no later than sixty (60) days from date of this order. FURTHER ORDERED that 16 Request for Submission is granted. FURTHER ORDER ED that 19 Motion for Leave to File an Expanded First Amended Complaint is granted. FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff falls to file an amended complaint curing the deficiencies outlined in the screening order (ECF No. 14 ), this action shall proceed against Dr. Gedney and Does 1-12 on the Eighth Amendment claim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/2/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?