Corns v. Residential Credit Solutions, Inc.
Plaintiff: Robert S Corns
Defendant: Residential Credit Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2015cv01233
Filed: June 30, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Granting 40 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/4/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Granting 34 Motion to Withdraw re 33 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/7/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Denying Defendant's 7 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/3/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting 22 Stipulation to Continue Briefing Schedule for Defendant Residential Credit Solutions, Inc.'s 7 Motion to Dismiss (Fourth Request). Responses due by 11/25/2015. Replies due by 12/2/2015. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/17/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting 20 Stipulation to Continue the Briefing Schedule for Defendant's 7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6). Responses due by 11/12/2015. Replies due by 11/23/2015. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/8/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER that the discovery hearing scheduled for 10:30 a.m., October 8, 2015, is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/5/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a discovery hearing is scheduled for 10:30 a.m. on 10/8/15 before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach in courtroom 3D. The hearing may be vacated upon the filing of the discovery plan and scheduling order in compliance with Local Rule 26-1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/14/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting 14 Stipulation to Continue the briefing Schedule for Defendant Residential Credit Solutions, Inc.'s 7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6). Responses due by 10/12/2015. Replies due by 10/22/2015. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/8/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corns v. Residential Credit Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert S Corns
Represented By: Mitchell D Gliner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Residential Credit Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Dana Jonathon Nitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?