March 11, 2024 |
Filing
140
ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that respondents motion to waive compliance with LSR 3-3 124 is GRANTED nunc pro tunc as of June 23, 2023. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that petitioners motion to extend time to file his response to the respondents motion to dismiss 139 is GRANTED. The response is due March 21, 2024. Responses due by 3/21/2024. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/11/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
|
January 17, 2024 |
Filing
138
ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that petitioners motion to extend time to file his response to the respondents motion to dismiss 137 is GRANTED. The response is due February 20, 2024. No further extensions will be granted absent a showi ng of extraordinary circumstances. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that petitioners prior motion for extension of time 136 is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/17/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CAH)
|
May 9, 2023 |
Filing
123
ORDER Granting 122 Motion to Extend Time. William Gittere and Adam Paul Laxalt answer due 6/23/2023. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/9/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
|
February 9, 2023 |
Filing
121
ORDER Granting 120 Motion to Extend Time to File Answer to 104 Second Amended Petition. William Gittere answer due 5/9/2023; Adam Paul Laxalt answer due 5/9/2023. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/9/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
|
November 9, 2022 |
Filing
119
ORDER Granting 118 Motion to Extend Time to Answer 104 Amended Petition. William Gittere answer due 2/8/2023; Adam Paul Laxalt answer due 2/8/2023. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/9/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
|
July 27, 2022 |
Filing
115
ORDER Granting 109 Motion for Compliance with Rule 2. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/27/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
|
January 31, 2022 |
Filing
108
ORDER Granting 107 Motion to Extend Time to answer 104 Second Amended Petition. William Gittere answer due 5/2/2022. Adam Paul Laxalt answer due 5/2/2022. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/31/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
|
October 5, 2021 |
Filing
102
ORDER Granting 101 Motion to Extend Time re 100 Order (Second Request). Amended Petition due by 12/3/2021. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/5/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
July 8, 2021 |
Filing
100
ORDER Granting 99 Motion to Extend Time re 98 Order (First Request). Amended Petition due by 10/4/2021. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/8/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
May 6, 2021 |
Filing
98
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 94 the motion to vacate the stay and reopen these proceedings is GRANTED. The stay of this action is lifted. See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/6/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
May 16, 2017 |
Filing
81
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 76 petitioner's Motion to Temporarily Lift the Stay to Supplement the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25(d), the Cler k of the Court shall substitute Timothy Filson for Renee Baker, on the docket for this case, as the respondent warden, and shall update the caption of the action to reflect this change. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/16/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
November 18, 2016 |
Filing
74
ORDER denying ECF No. 70 Respondents' Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order ECF No. 69 . Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/18/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
|
March 31, 2016 |
Filing
69
ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that 14 Motion for an amended petition filing deadline is GRANTED nunc pro tunc as of December 23, 2015. 57 Motion to strike is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 59 Motion for stay and abeyance is GRANTED. T his action is STAYED, while petitioner exhausts, in state court, all his unexhausted claims for habeas corpus relief. Status reports due 6/15/16, 12/15/16, 6/15/17, and 12/15/17.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 17 Motion for leave to conduct disc overy is DENIED without prejudice. 64 Motion for leave to file a sur-reply to motion for leave to conduct discovery is GRANTED nunc pro tunc as of January 15, 2016. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/30/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
August 12, 2015 |
Filing
13
ORDER. Respondents shall have sixty (60) days from the date this order is entered within which to file and serve an answer or other response to 1 habeas petition. Petitioner shall have forty-five (45) days following service of an answer to file and serve a reply. Respondents shall thereafter have thirty (30) days following service of a reply to file and serve a response to the reply. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/12/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
July 20, 2015 |
Filing
8
ORDER that 4 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. FURTHER ORDERED that 5 Motion to Appoint Counsel is GRANTED. The Federal Public Defender for the District of Nevada is appointed to r epresent petitioner, and shall have thirty (30) days from the date of entry of this Order to undertake representation of petitioner or to indicate to the court its inability to represent petitioner in these proceedings. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall SERVE a copy of this Order on Michael Pescetta, Capital Habeas Division, Office of the Federal Public Defender. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall SERVE the respondents, by certified mail, with a copy of this order and a copy of the habeas corpus petition. Respondents' counsel shall file a Notice of Appearance of Counsel within thirty (30) days from the date of entry of this order, but shall not answer the habeas corpus petition until the court orders otherwise. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/20/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF: cc M. Pescetta - MMM)
|