First 100, LLC v. Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation et al
Plaintiff: |
First 100, LLC |
Defendant: |
Alexandre Dupree LLC and Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation |
Counter Claimant: |
Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation |
Counter Defendant: |
First 100, LLC |
Case Number: |
2:2015cv01303 |
Filed: |
July 9, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Andrew P. Gordon |
Presiding Judge: |
Peggy A. Leen |
Nature of Suit: |
Real Property: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1442 Petition for Removal |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 21, 2019 |
Filing
58
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 57 the motion to lift stay is GRANTED. The stay is lifted and the defendants' counterclaims against plaintiff First 100, LLC are dismissed without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of court is instructed to enter judgment in favor of the defendants and against the plaintiff on the claims in the plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/21/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
April 2, 2018 |
Filing
56
ORDER that 54 Report and Recommendation is ACCEPTED. Plaintiff First 100, LLC's complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice. The defendants' counterclaims remain pending subject to the stay previously entered. See ECFNo. 42 . Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
December 1, 2017 |
Filing
53
ORDER Granting 52 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Attorney Matthew I Knepper terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/1/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
September 6, 2017 |
Filing
46
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 45 Weil & Drage's Motion to Withdraw is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff shall have until 10/6/17 in which to retain substitute counsel who shall make an appearance in accordance with the requirements of the Local Rules of Practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/6/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: First 100, LLC - ADR)
|
August 17, 2016 |
Filing
42
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 32 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED this case is administratively STAYED until the Ninth Circuit issues the mandate in Bourne Valley Court Trust v. Wells Fargo Bank, case number 15-15233 (2:13-cv-649-PMP-NJK). Once the mandate issues, any party may move to lift the stay. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/17/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
March 8, 2016 |
Filing
39
ORDER Granting 38 Stipulation re 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Responses due by 4/8/2016. Replies due by 5/9/2016. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/8/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
February 5, 2016 |
Filing
37
ORDER Granting 36 Stipulation to Continue Plaintiff's Opposition Deadline to 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment (First Request). Plaintiff's responses due by 3/7/2016. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/5/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
|
January 21, 2016 |
Filing
35
ORDER Granting 34 Stipulation to Stay Discovery Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/21/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
|
October 8, 2015 |
Filing
21
ORDER re 20 Notice of change of attorney filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/7/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?