Absolute Business Solutions, Inc. et al v. Mortgage Electronic Registration Sys. Inc (MERS) et al
Plaintiff: Absolute Business Solutions, Inc.
Defendant: Bank of America, NA, as Successor by merger to BAC Home Loans Servicing LP, Irma Mendez and Mortgage Electronic Registration Sys. Inc (MERS)
Intervenor Plaintiff: Alessi & Koenig LLC
Intervenor Defendant: Crossbox, Federal National Mortgage Association and James M Mccord
Case Number: 2:2015cv01325
Filed: July 13, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDERED that the Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 65 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment in favor of Fannie Mae and close the case. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/23/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting ECF No. 68 Motion to Substitute Party : Joel A. Stokes and Sandra E. Stokes substituted and joined as counter-defendants. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/11/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER denying ECF No. 61 Motion to Compel Deposit. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/4/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER denying ECF No. 59 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/18/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER denying ECF No. 20 Motion to Consolidate (case 2:15-cv-1325); denying ECF Nos. 24 , 30 Motions for Summary Judgment (case 2:15-cv-1325); denying ECF No. 45 Motion for Sanctions (case 2:15-cv-1325); granting in par t and denying in part ECF No. 11 Motion to Dismiss, with leave to amend in part (case 2:16-cv-1077); granting ECF No. 18 Motion to Dismiss, with leave to amend (case 2:16-cv-1077). Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/2/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER re ECF Nos. 20 , 24 , 30 , 45 , 11 , and 18 motions, scheduling Oral Argument for 7/29/2016 at 9:00 AM in LV Courtroom 4B before Judge Robert C. Jones. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/18/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Denying Defendant Irma Mendez' 27 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 05/11/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Granting 41 Motion for Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically. On or before Friday, December 11, 2015, defendant shall provide certification. Defendant is not authorized to file electronically until said certification is filed with the Court within the time frame specified. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/3/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
October 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting 21 Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/22/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
September 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting 15 Stipulation Permitting Federal Housing Finance Agency to Intervene as Conservator of the Federal National Mortgage Association. Federal Housing Finance Agency answer due 9/30/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 9/23/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Absolute Business Solutions, Inc. et al v. Mortgage Electronic Registration Sys. Inc (MERS) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Absolute Business Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick W Kang
Represented By: Erica D Loyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Alessi & Koenig LLC
Represented By: Bradley D Bace
Represented By: Huong X Lam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, NA, as Successor by merger to BAC Home Loans Servicing LP
Represented By: Darren T Brenner
Represented By: Tenesa S Scaturro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irma Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Sys. Inc (MERS)
Represented By: Darren T Brenner
Represented By: Tenesa S Scaturro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Crossbox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Chelsea Crowton
Represented By: Dana Jonathon Nitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: James M Mccord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?