Dixon Legacy Transportation Systems, LLC
Plaintiff: Sarah Dixon
Defendant: Leoncio Angeles, Angeles Transportation, LLC and Legacy Transportation Systems, LLC
Case Number: 2:2015cv01359
Filed: July 17, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER Denying Third-Party Defendant's 167 Motion to be Excused from Personally Appearing at the Mandatory Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/18/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER Denying Legacy's 69 Motion for Reconsideration. Magistrate Judge Leen's 68 Order Denying in part Legacy's Motions to Exclude Expert Witnesses Reyes, Crouse, and Smith is Affirmed. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/19/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER Granting in part Defendants'/Third-Party Plaintiffs' 109 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Treating Providers or, Alternatively, to Preclude Plaintiff from Offering or Relying Upon any Expert Testimony. Plaintiff has until 9/12 /2017 to serve opposing counsel with a list of the four providers plaintiff elects to testify at trial. Follow up Status Conference set for 9/25/2017 at 10:30 a.m. in LV Courtroom 3B. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/11/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER that Plaintiff's 130 Motion to Strike Legacy's Expert Witness Michael Dilich, or Alternatively, to Preclude Expert Testimony is DENIED without prejudice to filing a motion in limine to exclude or limit the scope of his testimony at trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/6/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER Granting 128 Emergency Motion to Continue Hearing on Motions 101 , 102 , 109 , and 119 . Motion Hearing continued to 8/31/2017 at 09:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/14/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting in part 114 motion to stay or. alternatively, extend deadlines. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for a settlement conference 115 is GRANTED. This case is referred to a magistrate judge to schedule a mandatory settlement conference. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER Granting the 41 Motion to Determine Plaintiff's Domicile. The 45 Motion to Compel Joinder of Third Party Defendant as a Necessary Party under FRCP 19 or to Dismiss is Denied. The 78 Motion for Leave to Supplement is Denied. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/8/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER Granting 87 Stipulation for Extension of Time (Fourth Request) re Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 5/2/2017. Motions due by 6/1/2017. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/30/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Granting 46 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 40 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents. Legacy Transportation Systems, LLC's Responses due by 1/12/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/9/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dixon Legacy Transportation Systems, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leoncio Angeles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angeles Transportation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legacy Transportation Systems, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Dixon
Represented By: Chris R. McCullough
Represented By: Frank Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?