Trujillo v. Bannister et al
Plaintiff: Jorge Trujillo
Defendant: R. Bruce Bannister, Gregory Cox, Francisco M. Sanchez, M.D. and Brian E. Williams
Case Number: 2:2015cv01362
Filed: July 17, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER re ECF No. 37 USCA REFERRAL NOTICE : This Court certifies that Plaintiff's appeal from its order enforcement the settlement agreement and dismissing this case is not frivolous and his in forma pauperis should continue on appeal. USCA case 17-16650. ( E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. ) Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/25/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting ECF Nos. 24 Defendants' Motion to Enforce Settlement, 25 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Medical Records under Seal and 32 Defendants' Motion to Strike; Clerk instructed to strike Plaintiff's reply in response to Defendants' reply ECF No. 31 ; Clerk is instructed to close case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 08/02/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying without prejudice ECF No. 17 Motion for Leave to File Motion Under Seal; granting ECF No. 18 Motion to Extend Time to Answer Complaint. NDOC Defendants' answer due within 14 days of entry of decision on enforcement motion, provided any claims remain. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/26/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
May 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Temporarily Unsealing Recording, re ECF No. 7 Early Mediation Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/20/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER directing the AG's Office to file an updated status report by 5/25/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/12/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trujillo v. Bannister et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Bruce Bannister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francisco M. Sanchez, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian E. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Trujillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?