Pamela v. Amore et al
Plaintiff: Pamela K. Lewis
Defendant: Michael Campagno, Casa Di Amore, LLC and Jeff Schwartz
Case Number: 2:2015cv01368
Filed: July 17, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 6/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER Granting 90 Stipulation. Adam K. Bult and Travis F. Chance of Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP are substituted in the place of Todd M. Leventhal for defendants Casa Di Amore and Michael Campagno, subject to the provisions of LR IA 11-6(b), (c) and (d). Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Lewis is directed to submit a Motion for Attorneys' Fees, and Costs, and Interest with underlying documentation, within 30 days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is instructed to enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/23/2018. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 40 the parties' Joint Stipulation to Consent to Trial by U.S. Magistrate Judge Under LR IB 2-1 & 28 U.S.C. § 636(c) is STRICKEN. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall comply with 2 the Notice if they wish to consent tojurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/13/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Granting 37 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Discovery Hearing reset for 8/23/2016 11:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/16/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED Defendants shall file their Certificate of Interested Parties, which fully complies with LR 7.1-1, no later than 02/02/2016. Failure to comply may result in the issuance of an order to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 01/19/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER that 14 Motion to Extend Time to Answer/Respond re 1 Complaint is GRANTED. Michael Campagno answer due 11/9/2015; Casa Di Amore, LLC answer due 11/9/2015; Jeff Schwartz answer due 11/9/2015. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/13/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pamela v. Amore et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Campagno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casa Di Amore, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela K. Lewis
Represented By: Patricia A Marr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?