Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Plaintiff: Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Case Number: 2:2015cv01377
Filed: July 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER granting 161 Stipulation to Extend time to Respond to 158 Motion for Reconsideration, Responses due by 2/12/2021. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/29/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 156 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC against SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 12/18/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER granting 144 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to Bank of America, N.A. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/27/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER granting 139 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to Oak Park Homeowners' Association; Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/11/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER Joint Status Report due by 6/14/2020. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/17/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER denying 110 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order; Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting 94 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order.; denying 96 Motion for Judgment.; Case terminated. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/3/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER Granting 93 Stipulation Allowing Defendant Oak Park Homeowner's Association to Submit Disclosure of Documents and Witnesses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/7/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER denying 44 Motion for Summary Judgment.; denying 45 Motion for Summary Judgment.; granting in part and denying in part 61 Motion to Dismiss.; denying 86 Motion. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/8/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER denying 78 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/1/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EW)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER that the 68 Order to Show Cause is DISCHARGED. The Court cautions all parties and their counsel that they are expected to comply with the local rules. The Court also cautions all parties and their counsel that they owe this Court a duty of candor and must ensure that their factual representations are accurate and not misleading. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/12/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Discharging the 59 Order to Show Cause with respect to jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/4/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting Defendant's 34 Motion for Protective Order as unopposed. The Court Vacates the hearing set for 02/09/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 02/05/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Denying Defendant's 32 Amended Motion for Protective Order. To the extent Defendant believes its relevancy objection remains valid, it shall promptly meet-and-confer with Plaintiff's counsel. Any refiled motion must be filed no l ater than 01/29/2016, and must address the standards outlined in this Order. Any response due by 2/3/2016. Any reply due by 2/4/2016. Motion Hearing set for 2/9/2016 02:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 01/27/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Denying Discovery Plan. The court hereby DENIES 22 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/12/2015. The Court further ADMONISHES Defendant's counsel for repeatedly submitting discovery plans that the undersigned has already found are improper. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/7/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC
Represented By: Natalie C. Lehman
Represented By: Dana Jonathon Nitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?