Wilson v. Nevada Affordable Housing Assistance Corp.
Plaintiff: Nedra Wilson
Defendant: Nevada Affordable Housing Assistance Corporation
Case Number: 2:2015cv01387
Filed: July 21, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER Granting 98 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/8/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER denying 71 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Granting 37 Stipulated Protective Order Regarding Confidentiality of Documents Produced. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 02/24/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER that 22 Defendant Nevada Affordable Housing Assistance Corporation's Motion for Exception to Attendance Requirements at ENE is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/25/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER re 22 Motion for Exception to Attendance Requirements. ORDERED that any opposition must be filed on or before December 7, 2015. No reply necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/24/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Nevada Affordable Housing Assistance Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Affordable Housing Assistance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nedra Wilson
Represented By: Robert P Spretnak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?