Farmers Insurance Exchange v. LG Electronics USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Farmers Insurance Exchange
Defendant: Best Buy Stores, L.P. and LG Electronics USA, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2015cv01389
Filed: July 21, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that 109 Magistrate Judge Ferenbach's report and recommendation be, and the same hereby is, ADOPTED in its entirety. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 106 Best Buy's motion to deem confiden tial release and agreement fully executed be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the instant case be, and the same hereby is, DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER Granting 101 Joint Motion to Continue Status Hearing. Status Hearing continued to 10/23/2017 at 01:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/5/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER re 99 Status Report. A Status Hearing to help resolve the terms of the finalized settlement agreement is set for 10/6/2017 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/18/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER that the parties shall file a Stipulation to Dismiss or a Status Report by 9/15/2017. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER that the parties shall file a stipulation to dismiss or a status report by 8/3/2017. The pending 82 , 84 , 88 , and 94 Motions for Summary Judgment are Denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/5/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Granting Defendant LG's 49 Motion to Dismiss Best Buy Stores, LP's 44 Third-Party Complaint. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/8/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Granting 55 Stipulation re 49 MOTION to Dismiss. Replies due by 9/1/2016. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/23/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Granting 50 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) re 44 Third Party Complaint. Penn Ridge Transportation's answer due 8/16/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/11/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER that a hearing on LG Electronics USA, Inc.'s 26 Emergency Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement is set for 4/13/2016 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/16/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting Defendant's 17 Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 3/25/2016. Motions due by 4/25/2016. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/25/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/17/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farmers Insurance Exchange v. LG Electronics USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Buy Stores, L.P.
Represented By: Wade M. Hansard
Represented By: Michael R Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics USA, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce Scott Dickinson
Represented By: Jacquelyn M. Franco
Represented By: Michael E. Hottman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Farmers Insurance Exchange
Represented By: Kirk Nevada Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?