October 16, 2023 |
Filing
134
ORDER Joint Status Report due by 11/17/2023. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/16/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LG)
|
September 26, 2023 |
Filing
131
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the status hearing scheduled for October 16, 2023, is VACATED. All claims between U.S. Bank and SFR have been dismissed pursuant to the parties 129 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/26/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
|
September 22, 2023 |
Filing
130
ORDER Granting 129 Stipulation Dismissing With Prejudice all claims between U.S. Bank National Association against SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC. Each party to bear its own fees and costs. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/22/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
|
September 8, 2023 |
Filing
127
ORDER Granting 126 Stipulation to Continue Status Hearing on Settlement re 124 Status Conference. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the hearing scheduled for September 15, 2023, is RESCHEDULED to in-person at 11:00 AM, October 16, 2023, in Courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/8/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
|
July 17, 2023 |
Filing
125
ORDER Granting 123 Stipulation Dismissing Action as to Antelope Canyon Homeowners Association. U.S. Bank National Association and Antelope Canyon Homeowners Association, by and through their respective counsel of record, hereby stipulate that th e above-entitled action shall be dismissed with prejudice as to, and only as to, the claims of U.S. Bank against Antelope Canyon. Each party shall bear its own attorney's fees, prejudgment interest, and costs of suit. Antelope Canyon Homeowners Association terminated. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/17/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
|
June 27, 2023 |
Filing
122
ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that an in-person status hearing is scheduled for 10:00 AM, July 17, 2023, in Courtroom 3D. The hearing will be vacated if both proposed stipulations and orders for dismissal are filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/27/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
|
April 19, 2023 |
Filing
120
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that US Bank National Association as Trustee for the Holders of the WMALT 2006-AR8 Trust, and Antelope Canyon Homeowners' Association, must file a proposed stipulation and order for dismissal on or before May 22, 2023. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Antelope Canyon Homeowners Association is excused from participating in the April 24, 2023, settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/19/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
|
March 24, 2022 |
Filing
111
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that this court's order (ECF No. 70 ) be, and the same hereby is, VACATED as to its granting summary judgment to SFR. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the judgment entered in favor of SFR (ECF No. 78 ) be, and the same hereby is, VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that SFR's motion to substitute counsel (ECF No. 106 ) be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. The clerk is instructed to reopen this case for further proceedings and to appoint a new magistrate judge. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/24/2022., Case reopened. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
|
March 12, 2021 |
Filing
102
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED, that the court's December 9, 2020 order, (ECF No. 94 ), is hereby amended (1) to state there is no just reason for delay of entry of final judgment against the bank parties on the bank partie s' declaratory relief/quiet title claim and defendant, counterclaimant and cross-claimant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC's ("SFR") counter-and crossclaims for quiet title/declaratory judgment and (2) confirm the court's May 3 1, 2018 judgment, (ECF No. 78 ), is a final judgment as to the bank parties' declaratory relief/quiet title claim and SFR's quiet title/declaratory judgment counter- and cross-claims against the bank parties. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/12/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
|
April 23, 2018 |
Filing
75
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the clerk shall lift the stay in the instant case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
September 26, 2016 |
Filing
65
ORDER Granting 63 Motion to Stay. IT IS ORDERED that a temporary stay of proceedings is entered until the order of mandate is entered in the Bourne Valley decision. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/23/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
September 14, 2016 |
Filing
62
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 59 the Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief is GRANTED. Bank parties shall have until 9/20/2016 to file a supplemental brief not to exceed 10 pages limited to the two recent decisions mentioned in the motion. Defendants shall have until 9/27/2016 to file a response not to exceed 10 pages. No reply shall be allowed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/14/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
August 9, 2016 |
Filing
58
ORDER Denying 52 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages and Striking 54 Motion for Order Granting Non-Monetary Status. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/8/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
February 5, 2016 |
Filing
33
ORDER. Defendant Antelope Canyon Homeowners Association's Motion to Amend Answer to Include Third-Party Complaint 29 is GRANTED. Defendant shall separately file the Proposed Amended Answer and Third-Party Complaint, which is attached to the Motion as Exhibit A. Defendant shall serve the Third Party Complaint no later than 90 days from entry of this order. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m), effective 12/1/15. Failure to timely serve the Third Party Complaint may result in its dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/4/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
|
November 18, 2015 |
Filing
31
ORDER Granting 30 Motion to Substitute Attorney. James W. Pengilly and Elizabeth Lowell of the Pengilly Law Firm are substituted in the place of Jordan Butler, Justin Jones and Gregory Kerr of Wolf Rifkin Shapiro Schulman & Rabkin, LLP for Defendant Antelope Canyon HOA, subject to the provisions of LR IA 10-6(c) and (d). Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/17/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
|