U.S. Bank, National Association vs Countryside Homeowners Association, et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank, National Association
Defendant: Countryside Homeowners Association and K K Real Estate Investment Fund, LLC
Case Number: 2:2015cv01463
Filed: July 31, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 108 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 109 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Supplement Trial Brief (ECF No. 115 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall SUBMIT a proposed judgment within fourteen days of this Order (5/6/2020). Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/22/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting ECF No. 113 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Countryside Homeowners' Association. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/27/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Robert C. Jones, Senior District Judge on November 15, 2019, by Carrie Lipparelli, Judicial Assistant.ORDERED that the Motion to Reconsider Order Denying Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendant/Counter-Claimant KK Real Estate Investment Fund, LLC and Request to be Removed From ECF Service List (ECF No. 101) is GRANTED.Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CL)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER - Calendar Call VACATED and RESCHEDULED to 11/19/2019 at 9:00 AM in Las Vegas Courtroom 4B before Judge Robert C. Jones. Jury Trial VACATED and RESCHEDULED to 12/2/2019 at 8:30 AM in Las Vegas Courtroom 4B before Judge Robert C. Jones. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting ECF No. 85 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney - Luis Alonso Ayon withdrawn from case; directing Defendant KK Real Estate Investment Fund to retain new attorney by 9/17/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 9/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 PROTECTIVE ORDER pursuant to ECF No. 82 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting ECF No. 77 Motion to remove attorney Vatana Lay from the Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/1/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 FINAL JUDGMENT per ECF No. 58 Proposed Order. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting ECF No. 48 Motion for Summary Judgment. Within 14 days, Plaintiff shall submit either a proposed form of judgment or a notice of its intent to prosecute the remaining claims under NRS 116.1113 and/or the common law of wrongful foreclosure. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 04/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER denying ECF No. 29 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/6/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DENYING 19 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/9/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank, National Association vs Countryside Homeowners Association, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countryside Homeowners Association
Represented By: Joseph P Garin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K K Real Estate Investment Fund, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank, National Association
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Represented By: Donna M. Wittig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?