Buxton et al v. Green Tree Servicing, LLC
Plaintiff: Gregory L. Buxton and Tracie L. Buxton
Defendant: Green Tree Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 2:2015cv01475
Filed: August 3, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting 18 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/24/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction Contained in 1 Petition for Removal. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/20/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that a preliminary injunction hearing be set for Thursday, August 13, 2015, at 1:30 PM in courtroom 6A. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant shall have up to, and including, Friday, August 7, 2015, to file a response. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall have up to and including Tuesday, August 11, 2015, to file a reply. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/5/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buxton et al v. Green Tree Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory L. Buxton
Represented By: Gregory A. Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracie L. Buxton
Represented By: Gregory A. Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Tree Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Sarah A. Mead
Represented By: Robin E Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?