United States of America v Joshua D. Flushman, et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Joshua D. Flushman and Joshua D. Flushman, D.C., Ltd
Case Number: 2:2015cv01531
Filed: August 12, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING 37 Stipulation and Order of Injunction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all pending motions [#34] are DENIED as moot, this action is DISMISSED, and the Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE THIS CASE. Should the government require additional action of the court to enforce the injunction, it must file a Motion to Reopen Case to seek that relief. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/23/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
July 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting 25 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Steven E. Hollingworth, Alexander G LeVeque, and Jeremy M. Welland are substituted in place and stead of Ken R Ashworth and Hans Baldau for Joshua D. Flushman and Joshua D. Flushman, D.C., Ltd. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/12/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER that 17 the parties' joint proposed discovery plan (mislabeled as a Case Management Report) is DENIED without prejudice. The parties shall file a new joint proposed discovery plan that complies in full with Local Rule 26-1 no later than March 10, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/9/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER that 14 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/4/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Denying without prejudice 7 Stipulation to Extend. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/9/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v Joshua D. Flushman, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua D. Flushman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua D. Flushman, D.C., Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Daniel G. Bogden
Represented By: Paul T. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?