Christiana Trust v. K&P Homes
Plaintiff: Christiana Trust
Defendant: K&P Homes and Rita Wiegand
Counter Defendant: Christiana Trust
ThirdParty Plaintiff: K&P Homes
Counter Claimant: K&P Homes
ThirdParty Defendant: Rita Wiegand
Case Number: 2:2015cv01534
Filed: August 12, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2409(a) Quiet Title Action
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER AND JUDGMENT - Judgment on the Complaint and Counterclaim is entered in favor of Christiana Trust and against K&P Homes, a Series LLC of DEK Holdings, LLC (K&P Homes). Clerk shall issue a Rule 4(m) notice as to Defendant Rita Wiegand with res pect to the Complaint. Defendant K&P Homes shall either ask the Clerk to enter default against Rita Wiegand on the Third Party Complaint or file a notice of dismissal under Rule 41, by 2/28/2018. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER that Plaintiff must submit a proposed judgment quieting title in its favor consistent with the Court's orders by 1/23/2018. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER that Plaintiff shall submit a proposed judgment quieting title in its favor consistent with the Court's orders within (7) days. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/29/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER that K&P Homes shall have 21 days to show cause why title should not be quieted in Christiana Trust's favor. A response and reply shall be due in accordance with LR 7-2(e). Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 08/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Granting 26 Motion to Certify Question of Law to the Supreme Court of Nevada. The Clerk shall forward a copy of this Order to the Clerk of the Nevada Supreme Court under the official seal of the United States District Court for the District of Nevada. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/8/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - certified copy mailed to Nevada Supreme Court in Las Vegas and Carson City - SLD)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Denying Defendant K&P Homes' 23 Motion to Reconsider. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/3/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER that the discovery hearing set for 11:00 a.m. on 11/24/2015 is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/16/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting Counter Defendant Christiana Trust's 11 Motion to Dismiss and Denying Counter Claimant K&P Homes's 14 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/09/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER. Discovery Hearing set for 11/24/2015 11:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/2/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christiana Trust v. K&P Homes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Christiana Trust
Represented By: Natalie C. Lehman
Represented By: Dana Jonathon Nitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christiana Trust
Represented By: Natalie C. Lehman
Represented By: Dana Jonathon Nitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty plaintiff: K&P Homes
Represented By: John Henry Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: K&P Homes
Represented By: John Henry Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K&P Homes
Represented By: John Henry Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rita Wiegand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Rita Wiegand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?