Agwara v. Agwara et al
Appellee: Kelechi Agwara and Victoria L. Nelson
Appellant: Liborius Ihechere Agwara
In Re: Liborius Ihechere Agwara
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Case Number: 2:2015cv01544
Filed: August 12, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER approving ECF No. 28 Stipulation of Dismissal, dismissing with prejudice the instant case this date. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/7/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 OPINION AND ORDER. Bankruptcy Court is affirmed. Motion to expunge lis pendens 19 is denied. Motion to strike 21 is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/30/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
January 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting Appellant's 13 Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Reply Brief. Deadline: 12/18/2015. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/21/2015 Nunc Pro Tunc. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Agwara v. Agwara et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Kelechi Agwara
Represented By: Brandy L Brown
Represented By: Annie J Kung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Victoria L. Nelson
Represented By: Jacob Lee Houmand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Liborius Ihechere Agwara
Represented By: Liborius I. Agwara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Liborius Ihechere Agwara
Represented By: George R. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: U.S. Trustee
Represented By: U.S. Trustee, Las Vegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?