Buckles v. Green Tree Servicing LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sanford Buckles
Defendant: Green Tree Servicing LLC and Walter Investment Management Corporation
Case Number: 2:2015cv01581
Filed: August 18, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Granting 49 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by Elizabeth A Hamrick. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/29/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Granting 19 Motion to Stay. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties stipulated discovery plan 35 is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 5/26/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER that 14 Defendant Ditech's Motion to Dismiss is DENIED without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that the following questions of law are CERTIFIED to the Nevada Supreme Court pursuant to Nevada Rule of Appellate Procedure 5. FURTHER ORDE RED that the Clerk of the Court shall forward a copy of this Order to the Clerk of the Nevada Supreme Court under the official seal of the United States District Court for the District of Nevada. See NEV. R. APP. P. 5(d). Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/25/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 PROTECTIVE AND CLAWBACK ORDER re 31 Motion for Protective Order and Clawback Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/26/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER that 16 Stipulation and Order to Stay Discovery is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/2/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buckles v. Green Tree Servicing LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sanford Buckles
Represented By: Danny Horen
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Tree Servicing LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth A Hamrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Investment Management Corporation
Represented By: Elizabeth A Hamrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?