Nationstar Mortgage, LLC v. Sahara Sunrise Homeowners Association et al
Plaintiff: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Defendant: River Glider Avenue Trust and Sahara Sunrise Homeowners Association
ThirdParty Defendant: Alessi & Koenig LLC
Counter Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Counter Claimant: River Glider Avenue Trust
ThirdParty Plaintiff: Sahara Sunrise Homeowners Association
Case Number: 2:2015cv01597
Filed: August 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDERED that Plaintiff Nationstar's motion for partial summary judgment (ECF No. 90 ) is denied. Defendant River Glider's motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 92 ) is granted. The HOA Sale extinguished Nationstar's DOT on the Property. Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/16/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting ECF No. 114 Motion to Remove Attorneys Thera A. Cooper, Esq., Jared M. Sechrist, Esq., and Jason J. Zummo, Esq. from the Electronic Service List in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/13/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER that Nationstar's motion for partial summary judgment (ECF No. 90 ) is granted; River Glider's motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 92 ) is denied; Clerk directed to enter judgment and close this case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting ECF No. 99 Stipulation : Replies to ECF Nos 97 , 98 Responses re ECF Nos. 90 , 92 Motions for summary judgment due by 12/27/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting ECF No. 95 Stipulation to Extend Deadlines to file opposition to ECF Nos. 90 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and 92 Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 11/30/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting ECF No. 87 Stipulation : Dispositive Motions due by 10/19/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting ECF No. 79 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Joint Status Report Pursuant to Court's December 19, 2017 Order (ECF No. 73 ). (First Request). Joint Status Report due by 8/21/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting ECF No. 68 Motion to Stay Case; parties to file a status report within (5) days from resolution of certified question; all pending motions are denied without prejudice and may be refiled within (30) days from the NV Supreme Court decision. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/19/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting ECF No. 55 Joint Motion to Lift Stay. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/2/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER that the Court takes counsel at their word that the issuance of the previous order will serve as a sufficient deterrent to similar issues arising in the future. In addition, however, the Court notes that the most recent filing ECF No. 52 Sta tement makes no mention of why the misstatement went uncorrected until a further court order requiring another status report weeks later. The Court further alerts the attorneys involved that they have a duty in the future to correct the record once t hey realize a misstatement is made. See Nev. Rule of Prof. Conduct 3.3(a)(1) (attorneys must not fail to correct a false statement of material fact). Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 06/02/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER directing Thera Cooper, Adam Trippiedi, and Kelley Blatnik to file by 6/8/2017 a further statement explaining why they signed the initial status report when it misrepresented the one fact being relayed to the Court. Motions to extend the stay on other grounds due by 6/8/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/1/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER lifting temporary stay. Pending motions that were denied without prejudice when the stay was imposed may be refiled within 30 days. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/19/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Granting 40 Motion to Remove Attorney Donna M. Wittig from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 09/14/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Staying Case Pending Issuance of Mandate in Bourne Valley Court Trust v. Wells Fargo Bank and Denying Pending Motions without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/19/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC v. Sahara Sunrise Homeowners Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Alessi & Koenig LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Represented By: Donna M. Wittig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Represented By: Donna M. Wittig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: River Glider Avenue Trust
Represented By: Michael F. Bohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: River Glider Avenue Trust
Represented By: Michael F. Bohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sahara Sunrise Homeowners Association
Represented By: Edward D Boyack
Represented By: Patrick A Orme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty plaintiff: Sahara Sunrise Homeowners Association
Represented By: Edward D Boyack
Represented By: Patrick A Orme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?