United States of America ex rel v. Clark County et al
Plaintiff: United States of America ex rel
Defendant: Clark County, Clark County Department of Aviation and McCarran International Airport
In Re: Cheryl Nolte
Case Number: 2:2015cv01621
Filed: December 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729 False Claims Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Judgment is entered in favor of Defendants Clark County, The Clark County Department of Aviation, and McCarran International Airport and against Plaintiff Cheryl Nolte in the amount of $283,251.46. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/22/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 93 defendants Clark County,The Clark County Department of Aviation, and McCarran International Airport's motion for attorney's fees be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED, consistent with the foregoing. IT IS FURTH ER ORDERED that defendants Clark County, The Clark County Departmentof Aviation, and McCarran International Airport shall file a proposed judgment consistent withthis order within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/23/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in the amount of $133,896.22 in favor of Clark County, Clark County Department of Aviation, McCarran International Airport against Cheryl Nolte. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDERED that 52 Motion for Attorney's Fees is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that 55 Motion to Exclude Prohibited Character Attacks is DENIED as moot. FURTHER ORDERED that defendants Clark County, The Clark County Department of Aviation, and McCarran International Airport shall file proposed judgments consistent with this order within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER that the status hearing scheduled for 10:00 A.M., December 27, 2017, is VACATED and RESCHEDULED to 10:00 A.M., January 3, 2018, in Courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/16/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER that a Hearing re 41 Motion for Removal of Gerard Dondero, Esq. from Future References as Counsel is scheduled for 6/29/2017 at 09:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/26/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER that a Hearing re 35 Motion to Stay Discovery is scheduled for 6/29/2017 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/23/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER that 23 Motion to Extend Time to Respond re 21 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Responses due by 4/19/2017. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/17/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that should the relator or any defendant propose that the present action be dismissed or otherwise discontinued, that party shall concurrently provide notice of that proposition to the United States. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/5/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America ex rel v. Clark County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County Department of Aviation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCarran International Airport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Cheryl Nolte
Represented By: Gerard Dondero
Represented By: Paul C Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America ex rel
Represented By: Troy K. Flake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?