Azure Manor/Rancho de Paz Homeowners Association v. D.R. Horton, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Azure Manor/Rancho de Paz Homeowners Association
Defendant: American Asphalt & Grading Company, Bebout Concrete, Inc., Bravo Underground, Inc., D.R. Horton, Inc., Lennar Corporation, Lennar Sales Corp., Nevada Landscape Corp., New Creation Masonry, Inc., Southern Nevada Paving, Inc. and U.S. Home Corporation
ThirdParty Defendant: American Asphalt & Grading Company, Bebout Concrete, Inc., Bravo Underground, Inc., C&H Concrete, LLC, M&M Construction, Inc., MS Concrete Co., Inc., MSI Landscaping, Inc., Nevada Landscape Corp., New Creation Masonry, Inc., Southern Nevada Paving, Inc., Terra Contracting, Inc. and The Sylvanie Companies, Inc.
ThirdParty Plaintiff: D.R. Horton, Inc., Lennar Corporation, Lennar Sales Corp. and U.S. Home Corporation
Case Number: 2:2015cv01623
Filed: August 24, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER REGARDING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS Accepting and Adopting 199 Report and Recommendation, 109 Report and Recommendation, 204 Report and Recommendation, 200 Report and Recommendation, 83 Report and Recommendation, 110 Report and Recommendation, 201 Report and Recommendation, 198 Report and Recommendation and dismissing case with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER that 206 American Asphalt & Grading Company's Motion to Deem Settlement Agreement and Release Executed is GRANTED.RECOMMENDED that all claims against all parties be dismissed with prejudice, each side bearing its costs and attorney fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/19/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER Granting 205 Stipulation of Dismissal of D.R. Horton, Inc.'s Third-Party Complaint Against Third-Party Defendant Nevada Landscape Corp. with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/18/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER re American Asphalt & Grading Company's 206 Motion to Enforce Settlement. Any response due before noon on 6/15/2017. No reply necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 203 Third-Party Defendant Nevada Landscape Corp.'s Motion to Deem Settlement Agreement with Defendant/Third-Party Plaintiff D.R. Horton, Inc. Executed is GRANTED. IT IS RECOM MENDED that all claims against all parties be dismissed with prejudice, each side bearing its costs and attorney fees. ( Objections to R&R due by 6/9/2017.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/26/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 194 MINUTE ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that any opposition to 190 , 192 , 193 Motions due by 4/11/2017. Motion Hearing set for 4/14/2017 01:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/30/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER Granting 187 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Third-Party Defendant U.S. Home Corp. with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/2/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER Granting 179 Motion to request an exception to the settlement conference attendance requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/23/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that any opposition to 179 Third Party Defendant M&M Construction, Inc.'s Motion to Request An Exception to the Settlement Conference Attendance Requirements must be filed on or before 12/22/16. No reply necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/15/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER Granting 174 Stipulation to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint Against Third-Party Defendant M&M Construction, Inc. with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/15/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER Granting 172 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Defendants U.S. Home Corporation, Lennar Corporation and Lennar Sales Corp. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/14/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER Granting 157 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Third-Party Defendant, MSI Landscaping, Inc. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/17/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 137 Third Party Defendant M&M Construction, Inc.'s Motion to Deem Settlement Agreement and Release of Claims Fully Executed is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/29/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER Granting 142 Stipulation to Extend Deadlines re 135 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment.( Responses due by 9/30/2016.) Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/27/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 129 Third Party Defendant's Motion to Place Settlement on the Record and for Determination of Good Faith Settlement, 129 Motion to Deem Settlement Agreement and Release of Claims Fully Executed by M S Concrete, Co., Inc. are GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/20/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER Granting 137 Third-Party Defendant's Motion To Deem Settlement Agreement Executed on an order Shortening Time. Settlement Conference set for 9/29/2016 03:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. IT IS FURTHER O RDERED that any opposition to Third Party Defendant's Motion to Deem Settlement Agreement Executed on an Order Shortening Time 137 must be filed on or before 9/26/16. No reply necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/20/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MINUTE ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that any opposition 129 to Third-Party Defendant MS Concrete Co., Inc.'s Motion to Place Settlement on the Record and For Determination of Good Faith Settlement on an Order Shortening Time and 133 Thi rd-Party Defendant MS Concrete Co., Inc.'s Motion to Deem Settlement Agreement and Release of Claims Fully Executed by MS Concrete, Co., Inc.'s on an Order Shortening Time must be filed on or before 9/6/16. Motion Hearing set for 9/8/2016 03:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/25/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 114 M&M Construction's Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 111 D.R. Horton's Motion to Amend Its Third-Party Complaint is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/22/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the hearing on 111 Defendant/Third-Party Plaintiff D.R. Horton, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Third-Party Complaint scheduled for 11:00 a.m., 8/8/16 is RESCHEDULED to 11:00 a.m., 8/12/16, in courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/2/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the hearing on 114 M&M Construction, Inc.'s Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement on an Order Shortening Time scheduled for 10:00 a.m., 8/12/16 is RESCHEDULED to 11:00 a.m., 8/12/16, in courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/1/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that an opposition to Third-Party Defendant M&M Construction, Inc.'s 114 Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement on an Order Shortening Time must be filed on or before August 3, 2016. No reply necessary . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a hearing on Third-Party Defendant M&M Construction, Inc.'s 114 Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement on an Order Shortening Time is scheduled for 10:00 a.m., August 12, 2016, in courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 07/26/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER re 111 Motion for Leave to Amend Third-Party Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 8/8/2016 11:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/21/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER that any opposition to Defendant/Third-Party Plaintiff D.R. Horton, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Third-Party Complaint on Order Shortening Time (ECF No. 111 ) must be filed on or before July 26, 2016. Any reply in support of the motion must be filed on or before August 1, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/20/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER Granting 103 Stipulation to Dismiss Third-Party Defendant C&H Concrete, LLC without prejudice. C&H Concrete, LLC terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/7/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER that a Hearing 96 Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement is set for 7/13/2016 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/13/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER that the Complaint against third-party defendant New Creation Masonry, Inc. is Dismissed with Prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/13/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER Granting 95 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to Third-Party Defendant Bravo Underground, Inc. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/10/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER re ECF No. 93 Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement : Motion Hearing set for 7/13/2016 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/8/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a hearing on Third-Party Defendant Bravo Underground, Inc.'s Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement on Order Shortening Time 67 is scheduled for 3:00 p.m., 5/3/16, in courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/11/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
March 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Granting 69 Stipulation of Dismissal. IT IS ORDERED that any claims against AA&G by U.S. Home, be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/22/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Azure Manor/Rancho de Paz Homeowners Association v. D.R. Horton, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: American Asphalt & Grading Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Bebout Concrete, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Bravo Underground, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: C&H Concrete, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: M&M Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: MS Concrete Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: MSI Landscaping, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Nevada Landscape Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: New Creation Masonry, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Southern Nevada Paving, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Terra Contracting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: The Sylvanie Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Asphalt & Grading Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bebout Concrete, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bravo Underground, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.R. Horton, Inc.
Represented By: Christina Mae Mamer
Represented By: Joel D. Odou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lennar Corporation
Represented By: Gregory H. King
Represented By: Sarah J. Odia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lennar Sales Corp.
Represented By: Gregory H. King
Represented By: Sarah J. Odia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Landscape Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Creation Masonry, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Nevada Paving, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Home Corporation
Represented By: Gregory H. King
Represented By: Sarah J. Odia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Azure Manor/Rancho de Paz Homeowners Association
Represented By: David Bray
Represented By: Scott P Kelsey
Represented By: Paul P. Terry, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty plaintiff: D.R. Horton, Inc.
Represented By: Christina Mae Mamer
Represented By: Joel D. Odou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty plaintiff: Lennar Corporation
Represented By: Gregory H. King
Represented By: Sarah J. Odia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty plaintiff: Lennar Sales Corp.
Represented By: Gregory H. King
Represented By: Sarah J. Odia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty plaintiff: U.S. Home Corporation
Represented By: Gregory H. King
Represented By: Sarah J. Odia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?