Recalde v. Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Galo Recalde
Defendant: Catherine Lovera and Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2015cv01627
Filed: August 24, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Granting 50 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 09/14/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Denying 27 Stipulation to Amend the Caption of the Complaint without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 08/01/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER that 41 Motion for Exemption of Attendance at ENE is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/29/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting 5 Motion to Dismiss consistent with Order. See Order for details. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/11/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EW)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting Defendants' 37 Emergency Motion to Extend Rebuttal Expert Disclosure Deadline (Second Request). Deadline for rebuttal experts: 04/29/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 03/31/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 33 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request). Discovery due by 6/28/2016. Motions due by 7/29/2016. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/29/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 03/30/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER re Plaintiff's 31 Motion to Compel. The Court hereby orders that any response must be filed no later than 03/29/2016. Any reply must be filed no later than 04/02/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 03/22/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting 29 Stipulated Protective Order Concerning Confidential Information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 03/14/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Recalde v. Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Lovera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew L. Durham
Represented By: Chad D Olsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Galo Recalde
Represented By: James P. Kemp
Represented By: Victoria Lynn Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?