Reese v. Clark County Detention Center et al
Plaintiff: James M. Reese
Defendant: John Billage, Connie Bisbee, Miss Caulderwood, Chief Officer, Clark County Detention Center, James Gregory Cox, Mr. Elmer, Darla Foley, Doug Gillespie, Ed Gray, Jr., Dr. Jim Holmes, T. Kaylor, Michael Keeler, R. Kircnberg, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, LVMPD Sheriff Joseph Lombardo, Awo Jennifer Nash, Nevada Department of Corrections, Nevada Department of Public Safety, Nevada Parole Commissioners, Warden Dwight Neven, David Salmon, Maurice Silva, M. Sliva, State of Nevada ex rel, Officer Strong, C. Webb and Officer Zamorra
Case Number: 2:2015cv01633
Filed: August 24, 2015
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 75 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER Granting 82 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 75 Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 3/14/2018. Replies due by 4/6/2018. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER Granting 81 Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendants to Provide Their Settlement Conference Brief. Brief due by 3/16/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER denying 55 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/19/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 32 Reese's motion for electronic service is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 33 Reese's motion for issuance of summons is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court issue sum mons to Maurice Silva at 4000 S. Eastern Ave., Las Vegas, Nevada, deliver the same to the U.S. Marshal for service, and send blank copies of the USM-285 forms to the Plaintiff. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court issue summons to the Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department at 300 Casino Center Blvd., Las Vegas, NV 89101, deliver the same to the U.S. Marshal for service, and send blank copies of the USM-285 forms to the Plaintiff. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court issue summons to the Daniel Salmon at 7495 West Azure #224, Las Vegas, NV 89130, deliver the same to the U.S. Marshal for service, and send blank copies of the USM-285 forms to the Plaintiff. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 34 Reese's motion to increase his copy work limit is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/7/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: USM - ADR)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCREENING ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that this case is hereby REOPENED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Judgment entered on 5/12/16 14 is VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis 1 is REINSTATED. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/23/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER that this action is Dismissed without prejudice based on Plaintiff's failure to file an Amended Complaint. The 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is Denied as moot and the Clerk of Court shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/11/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting 9 Motion to Extend Time. Plaintiff shall file his amended complaint no later than 4/25/16. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff fails to file an Amended Complaint curing deficiencies outline in the screening order 7 , this action shall be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/11/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reese v. Clark County Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Billage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Bisbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miss Caulderwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Gregory Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Elmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darla Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Gillespie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Gray, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Jim Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Kaylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Keeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Kircnberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LVMPD Sheriff Joseph Lombardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Awo Jennifer Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Department of Public Safety
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Parole Commissioners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Dwight Neven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Salmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maurice Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Sliva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada ex rel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Zamorra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James M. Reese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?