Does v. Laxalt et al
Plaintiff: 1-16 Does
Defendant: Patrick J. Conmay, Adam Paul Laxalt, LVMPD Officer Joseph Lombardo, Chief Patrick Moers, Alexander Perez, Chris Perry, Steven Wolfson and Natalie Wood
Case Number: 2:2015cv01638
Filed: August 25, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER granting 112 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court declares that the application of movement and residency restrictions not specifically set forth in NRS 213.1243 to any plaintiff whose last criminal offense predated October 1, 2007 violat es the Ex Post Facto Clause and is therefore unconstitutional.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants are permanently enjoined from retroactively enforcing any condition of lifetime supervision not specifically set forth in NRS 213.1243 before Octob er 1, 2007 to any plaintiffs who meet the following conditions: See Order for details. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Supplemental Briefing 134 is GRANTED. Defendants shall file a motion for summary judgment on qualified immunity by October 30, 2020. Plaintiffs may file a response by November 13, 2020. Defendantsmay reply by November 20, 2020. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/29/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER granting 122 STIPULATION (First Request) TO CONTINUE Calendar Call and Trial Dates. Calendar Call is reset for 3/3/2020 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 7C before Judge Richard F. Boulware II. Jury Trial is reset for 3/10/2020 at 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 7C before Judge Richard F. Boulware II. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/17/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER Granting 114 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 112 Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 10/21/2019. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER. IT IS SO ORDERED that Defendant Joseph Lombardo, Defendant Patrick E. Moers, and Defendant Alexander Perez are hereby dismissed from United States District Court, District of Nevada, case 15-CV-1638, without prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/25/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
January 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting 25 Stipulation Granting an Extension of Time for filing a Responsive Pleading by Patrick J. Conmay, Adam Paul Laxalt, Chris Perry, Natalie Wood answer due 1/19/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/6/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting 20 Stipulation to Extend Time re 17 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 12/16/2015. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/24/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting 18 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 1 Complaint. Patrick J. Conmay, Adam Paul Laxalt, Chris Perry. and Natalie Wood answer due 1/5/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 11/16/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Does v. Laxalt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick J. Conmay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Paul Laxalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LVMPD Officer Joseph Lombardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Patrick Moers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natalie Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1-16 Does
Represented By: Robert M Draskovich, Jr.
Represented By: Allen Lichtenstein
Represented By: Gary Modafferi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?