U.S. Bank N.A., v. 508 Brundy Island Trust
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Defendant: 508 Brundy Island Trust
Case Number: 2:2015cv01666
Filed: August 27, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER that 44 the HOA's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Plaintiff's claims against HOA for quiet title and declaratory relief are DISMISSED without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that 53 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment is DEN IED.FURTHER ORDERED that 54 Bruny Island's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that 41 the HOA's Third Party Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice.The Clerk of Court is instructed to close the case and enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Granting 68 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Granting 65 Motion to Withdraw Patrick J. Davis as Attorney of Record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Granting 58 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond/Reply re: 53 Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 2/7/2018. Replies due by 2/21/2018. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Granting 56 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond re 53 and 54 Motions for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 2/13/2018. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Granting 39 Washburn Creek Association's Motion for Leave to File a Third Party Complaint. FURTHER ORDERED that Washburn Creek Association must file the attached Third Party Complaint on or before September 1, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/25/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Granting 37 Motion to Remove Attorney Shadd A. Wade from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/14/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting 30 Motion to Substitute Attorney Luis A. Ayon of Ayon Law, PLLC for defendant 508 Bruny Island Trust. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/10/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER that 25 Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Complaint is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall have fourteen days from the filing date of this Order to file its first amended complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/14/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER that 16 Motion for Demand for Security of Costs is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff must submit a bond pursuant to this Order in the amount of $500.00 as to Defendant. Failure to do so within thirty days of the filing date of this Order shall constitute grounds for dismissal. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/4/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting 10 Motion for Extension of Time to Serve and for Service by Publication on Defendant 508 Bruny Island Trust. Proof of service due by 6/7/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/18/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank N.A., v. 508 Brundy Island Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 508 Brundy Island Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Chelsea Crowton
Represented By: Dana Jonathon Nitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?