Nationstar Mortgage, LLC v. Maplewood Springs Homeowners Association, et al
Plaintiff: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Defendant: Maplewood Springs Homeowners Association and SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Case Number: 2:2015cv01683
Filed: August 31, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition to Quiet Title
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER TO RELEASE BOND. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/8/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant SFR shall submit a proposed judgment to the court within thirty (30) days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER Granting 104 Stipulation of Dismissal of Counter-Claimant SFR Investment Pool 1, LLC's Slander of Title Claim Against Plaintiff Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/10/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that 94 SFR's motion to certify be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/20/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER Denying 92 Stipulation to Stay as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/12/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 75 the HOA's motion to dismiss be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, consistent with the foregoing.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 70 the Banks' motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is DENIED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 71 SFR's motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, consistent with the foregoing. IT IS FURTHER ORD ERED that 73 the HOA's motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, consistent with the foregoing. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that SFR's response to the HOA's motion to dismiss 78 , an d the HOA's reply to SFR's response 82 be, and the same hereby is, STRICKEN.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the HOA's supplemental authority to its motion for summary judgment 96 be, and the same hereby is, STRICKEN. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/1/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER Granting 88 Stipulation to Extend Time re 71 MOTION for Summary Judgment.( Replies due by 10/13/2016.) Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/4/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER Granting 80 Stipulation to Extend Time re 70 MOTION for Summary Judgment Renewed.( Responses due by 10/3/2016.) Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/16/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 10 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 38 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 39 Motion for Summary Judgment is DE NIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 41 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 46 Stipulation is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of court shall send a copy of this order by certified mail to the Nevada attorney general. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/21/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting 14 Stipulation for Cost Bond. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC shall deposit with the Clerk of the Court a cost bond in the amount of $500. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/21/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC v. Maplewood Springs Homeowners Association, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maplewood Springs Homeowners Association
Represented By: Sean L. Anderson
Represented By: Timothy C. Pittsenbarger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Represented By: Diana S. Cline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Represented By: Allison R. Schmidt
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?