Nevada West Petroleum, LLC v. BP West Coast Products, LLC, et al.,
Plaintiff: Nevada West Petroleum, LLC, Qaraman Mesquite, LLC, Qaraman Sunset / Decatur, LLC and Wasef Qaraman, LLC
Defendant: BP West Coast Products, LLC, Jeff Carey, Michael Glassman, Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company, LLC, Derek Tomita and Treasure Franchise Company, LLC
Case Number: 2:2015cv01684
Filed: September 1, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:2801 Petroleum Marketing Practices Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER that the clerk of court shall enter judgment in favor of defendants BP West Coast Products, LLC; Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company, LLC; and Treasure Franchise Company, LLC and against plaintiffs Nevada West Petroleum, LLC; Qaraman Mesquite, LLC; Qaraman Sunset/Decatur, LLC; and Wasef Qaraman, LLC. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/5/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER Granting 97 Second Stipulation to Extend Deadline re Attorney Fees. Motions due by 12/18/2017. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER Granting 92 Motion to Extend Time to File Application for Attorneys' Fees and Related Nontaxable Expenses. Deadline: 11/17/2017. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/18/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER Granting Defendants BP West Coast Products, LLC, Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company, LLC and Treasure Franchise Company, LLC's 72 Motion for Summary Judgment on Liability. Defendants BP West Coast Products, LLC, Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company, LLC and Treasure Franchise Company, LLC's 73 Motion for Summary Judgment on Damages is Denied as moot.Plaintiffs Nevada West Petroleum, LLC's 76 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is Denied. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER Granting 63 Motion for Attorneys' Fees. Attorneys' fees and costs of $19,341.76 are awarded in favor of defendants against plaintiffs as discovery sanctions. Plaintiffs' request to delay payment of the sanctions to the end of the case is Denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/5/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Granting 78 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) to Respond to 72 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 73 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Damages, and 76 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Responses due by 2/8/2017. Replies due by 2/22/2017. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/7/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER Granting 74 Motion to File Under Seal. The clerk of court shall maintain under seal Exhibits 8, 9, 10, 11, 13, and 14 to the Defendants' 75 Motion for Summary Judgment on Damages. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/6/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting 67 Stipulation re 63 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs. Replies due by 11/28/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/17/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Denying without prejudice the parties' 38 , 46 , and 48 Motions to Seal. The Clerk of the Court shall unseal Plaintiffs' Motions to Seal but not the exhibits. The parties' exhibits shall remain under seal until 9/30/2016. The designating (or parties) shall have until 9/30/2016 to review the documents and file either: (i) a memorandum of points and authorities showing why the documents should remain under seal or (ii) a notice indicating that the documents do not require sealing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/16/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) Modified on 9/19/2016 to include ruling on 38 Motion (SLD).
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Granting 41 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Defendants Jeff Cary, Derek Tomita and Michael Glassman with prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/12/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 PROTECTIVE ORDER re ECF No. 33 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/31/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Establishing Electronic Document Production Protocol. This Stipulation and Order shall continue in full force and effect until further order of the Court or until this litigation is terminated by a final judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/10/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nevada West Petroleum, LLC v. BP West Coast Products, LLC, et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP West Coast Products, LLC
Represented By: Karl L. Nielson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Carey
Represented By: Karl L. Nielson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Glassman
Represented By: Karl L. Nielson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company, LLC
Represented By: Karl L. Nielson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derek Tomita
Represented By: Karl L. Nielson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Treasure Franchise Company, LLC
Represented By: Karl L. Nielson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nevada West Petroleum, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey I Pitegoff
Represented By: Christopher A Turtzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Qaraman Mesquite, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey I Pitegoff
Represented By: Christopher A Turtzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Qaraman Sunset / Decatur, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey I Pitegoff
Represented By: Christopher A Turtzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wasef Qaraman, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey I Pitegoff
Represented By: Christopher A Turtzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?