Vigil v. HUD Washingon D.C. et al
Plaintiff: Michael Vigil
Defendant: HUD Washington D.C., Steve McCoy, Latrice J. Posey, Senta Robinson, Southern Nevada Regional Housing Authority and Latrece C. Stone
Case Number: 2:2015cv01738
Filed: September 10, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting 26 Motion to Strike. Pages two through seven of Plaintiff's demand for jury trial 25 shall be disregarded for all purposes in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/8/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant Southern Nevada Regional Housing Authority's 12 Motion to Dismiss is Denied as moot. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 09/27/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Judge Hoffmans report and recommendation 6 is accepted and plaintiff Michael Vigils objection 7 is overruled.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff Michael Vigils application to proceed informa pauperis 3 is D ENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that because plaintiff Michael Vigil has paid the filing fee, the clerk of court shall detach and file the complaint. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/26/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Denying without prejudice, 1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have until 10/9/15, in which to submit a completed application that includes the information discussed in this O rder, or to pay the $400.00 filing fee. Failure to comply with this Order will result in a recommendation that this case be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 9/24/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - Blank IFP application mailed to Plaintiff 9/25/15 - PS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vigil v. HUD Washingon D.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUD Washington D.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Latrice J. Posey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Senta Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Nevada Regional Housing Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Latrece C. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Vigil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?