February 9, 2022 |
Filing
259
ORDER granting ECF No. 258 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Based on the stipulation of the parties and good cause having been shown, this action is hereby dismissed with prejudice in its entirety, pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1). Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/9/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HKL)
|
December 16, 2021 |
Filing
257
ORDER granting 256 Stipulation to Vacate 12/17/2021 Hearing. The following motions are DENIED: 219 Motion for Sanctions, 220 Motion to Amend/Correct, 221 Motion to Extend Time, 222 Motion for Protective Order, 231 Motion to Compel, 232 Motion to Compel, and 233 Motion to Compel. Settlement documents are due by 2/16/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/16/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ABG)
|
October 19, 2021 |
Filing
249
ORDER RESCHEDULING MOTION HEARING : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the video conference hearing scheduled for December 8, 2021, is VACATED, and RESCHEDULED to 10:00 AM, December 17, 2021, on the motions specified herein. (See pdf order for specifics.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/19/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) Modified on 10/19/2021 for spelling (DRM).
|
October 8, 2021 |
Filing
248
ORDER granting ECF No. 247 Stipulation. Defendant's shall file their response to ECF No. 240 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by 10/26/2021. Replies are due by 11/16/2021. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/8/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SC)
|
October 7, 2021 |
Filing
246
ORDER - The hearing on the Pending Motions is hereby rescheduled from October 14, 2021, to December 8, 2021 at 1:00pm before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. The parties must submit a separate stipulation to Chief Judge Du on the briefing for the Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/7/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SC)
|
June 10, 2021 |
Filing
212
ORDER granting 207 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Local Counsel; Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/10/2021. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
|
April 13, 2021 |
Filing
202
PROTECTIVE ORDER granting ECF No. 200 Stipulation regarding HIPAA/confidential documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/13/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SC)
|
April 12, 2021 |
Filing
201
ORDER Re: ECF No. 192 Motion to Compel : Video Conference Motion Hearing set for 5/3/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (See pdf order for additional specifics.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/12/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
March 22, 2021 |
Filing
196
ORDER - Defendant's Partial Motions for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 151 , 152 ) are denied. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/22/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
|
January 14, 2021 |
Filing
184
ORDER - A video conference hearing is scheduled for February 4, 2021 at 2:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3D by videoconference before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach as to the ECF Nos. 166 , 169 , 170 , and 171 Motions. The counsel/parties must em ail Courtroom Administrator, Tawnee Renfro at Tawnee_Renfro@nvd.uscourts.gov, with an email address to be used for the videoconference hearing by noon, February 3, 2021. The Video Conference Instructions must be adhered to as specified herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/14/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
|
November 13, 2020 |
Filing
173
ORDER granting ECF No. 172 Joint Motion to Extend Motion for Leave to Amend Briefing Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/13/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
|
June 25, 2020 |
Filing
155
ORDER granting ECF No. 154 Stipulation. Plaintiffs' oppositions to the Motions (ECF Nos. 151 , 152 ) are due by September 18, 2020. Defendant's replies are due by October 2, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/25/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
|
June 11, 2020 |
Filing
150
ORDER - A Telephonic Hearing on the Joint Motion to Extend Discovery (ECF No. 149 ) is scheduled for June 25, 2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. The call-in telephone number is (888) 273-3658, access code: 3912597. The call must be made five minutes prior to the hearing time. The Court will join the call and convene the proceedings. To improve sound quality, the parties should use a land line, at all possible. The use of a speaker phone during the proceedings is prohibited. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/11/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
|
December 13, 2019 |
Filing
139
ORDER granting ECF No. 135 Motion to Continue Hearing. The December 18th hearing to determine if discovery should be reopened (ECF No. 130 ) is continued to 2/10/2020 at 11:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
|
December 6, 2019 |
Filing
131
ORDERED that a hearing is scheduled for 1:00 PM, December 18, 2019, in Courtroom 3D, to determine if discovery should be reopened. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/6/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
|
October 3, 2019 |
Filing
128
ORDER granting ECF No. 127 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mark E. Hellenkamp for Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, et al., and approving designation of local counsel. Signed by Chief Judge Mirand a M. Du on 10/3/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
September 23, 2019 |
Filing
126
ORDER granting ECF No. 125 Unopposed Motion to Remove Attorney Nicholas Gregory from CM/ECF Service List on behalf of Plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/23/2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
|
April 23, 2019 |
Filing
120
ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's ECF No. 105 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot Plaintiff's ECF No. 118 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/23/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
November 16, 2018 |
Filing
115
ORDERED that a hearing on Plaintiffs' Request for Immediate Sanctions Against Defendant for Violation of Court Order (ECF No. 108 ) is scheduled for 2:00 PM, December 6, 2018, in Courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
November 5, 2018 |
Filing
113
PROTECTIVE ORDER pursuant to ECF No. 112 Stipulation. See order for specifics. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
|
August 15, 2018 |
Filing
97
ORDERED that a hearing on Motions (ECF Nos. 83 , 91 , 94 ) is scheduled for 1:00 PM, August 23, 2018, in Courtroom 3D. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline to file a joint pretrial order currently set for August 16, 2018 (see ECF No. 8 1) is hereby vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
June 5, 2018 |
Filing
78
ORDER vacating the part of the Court's 9/19/2016 Order granting in part summary judgment in favor of Defendant-Appellee (ECF No. 52 at 9) and the ECF No. 61 Judgment entered in favor of Defendant-Appellee; giving the parties seven days to file a status report addressing whether the parties will request a settlement conference before this case is set for trial. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
May 31, 2018 |
Filing
75
ORDER approving ECF No. 73 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to Shawn Hanson on behalf of Plaintiffs My Left Foot Children's Therapy, et al and approving Designation of Local Counsel Craig R. Anderson. Si gned by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/31/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
|
September 19, 2016 |
Filing
52
ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's ECF No. 26 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying Plaintiffs' ECF No. 29 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying without prejudice Plaintiffs' ECF No. 45 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/19/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
February 19, 2016 |
Filing
31
ORDER that the Clerk of the Court is directed to transfer case 2:15-cv-01746 JAD-NJK to District Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge George W. Foley, and all future pleadings must bear the case number 2:15-cv-01746-MMD-GWF. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/18/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
December 11, 2015 |
Filing
24
ORDER Setting a Hearing re 23 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order for 12/29/2015 01:30 PM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/10/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|