Bank of America, N.A. v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Defendant: Davyn Ridge Homeowners Association, SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC and Thomas Jessup, LLC
Case Number: 2:2015cv01768
Filed: September 14, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 187 DEFAULT JUDGMENT granting 185 Motion for Default Judgment in favor of SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC against Donald Gould. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/24/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that 163 BANA's motion for reconsideration be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 172 BANA's motion to file supplemental authorities be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 174 BANA's second motion to file supplemental authorities be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 160 the court order filed on 5/16/17 be, and the same hereby is, VACATED. The clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER Granting 169 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 163 Motion to Amend/Correct Judgment. Replies due by 7/18/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER granting 164 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond/Reply re: 163 Motion to Amend Judgment. Responses due by 7/3/2010. Replies due by 7/10/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 156 SFR's motion for reconsideration be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. The clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/16/2018.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER Granting 124 Motion to Remove Attorneys from Service List. Attorneys Scott A Marquis and Patrick C. McDonnell terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER. The parties shall file, on or before Friday, 8/4/17, a proposed joint pretrial order that complies with LR 16-3 and LR 16-4. Failure to timely comply may result in appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER Granting 111 Stipulation re 108 Order on Stipulation of Dismissal. Third-Party Defendant Daunshari Wong-Culotta terminated. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/17/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER that 105 Proposed Pretrial Order and 106 Pretrial Order are STRICKEN. The parties shall file on or before Friday, July 21, 2017 a proposed joint pretrial order, which includes all of the parties and claims and complies with the applicable local and federal rules, including LR 16-3 and LR 16-4. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/11/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER Granting 100 Stipulation of Dismissal without prejudice as to Defendant Thomas Jessup, LLC. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/6/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER Granting 98 Motion to Extend Time. (Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/30/2017.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/5/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER Granting 96 Stipulation to Continue Deadline. (Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/2/2017.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/3/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER Denying 90 Motion for reconsideration. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/17/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 47 Jessup's motion to dismiss be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 50 Wong's motion to dismiss be, and the same hereby is, DENIED.IT IS FURT HER ORDERED that 59 BANA's motion for summary judgment be and the same hereby is, DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 60 the HOA's motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that [87 ] the HOA's supplement to its motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, STRICKEN. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 61 SFR's motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 83 SFR's motion to certify a question of law to the Nevada Supreme Court be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/14/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Granting 74 Motion to Remove Attorney Donna M. Wittig from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 09/08/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Granting 69 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 59 , 60 , 61 MOTIONS for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 8/8/2016. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/28/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting 45 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Peter B. Mortenson added. Attorney Richard L Tobler terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/12/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EW)
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting 36 Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Defendant to File and Serve its Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint. (First Request) Thomas Jessup, LLC answer due 1/19/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/13/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting 24 Stipulation to Extend Time re 1 Complaint. Thomas Jessup, LLC answer due 12/23/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/8/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting (First Request) 17 Stipulation for an Extension of Time for Defendant Davyn Ridge Homeowners Association to file a Reply to 13 MOTION to Dismiss. Replies due by 11/13/2015. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/13/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Represented By: Donna M. Wittig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davyn Ridge Homeowners Association
Represented By: Sean L. Anderson
Represented By: Ryan D Hastings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Represented By: Diana S. Cline Ebron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Jessup, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?