Racing Optics, Inc. v. Aevoe Corp.
Plaintiff: Racing Optics, Inc.
Defendant: Aevoe Corp.
Counter Claimant: Aevoe Corp.
Counter Defendant: Racing Optics, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2015cv01774
Filed: September 15, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE on ECF No. 201 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/5/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER GRANTING ECF No. 167 Motion for Leave to File : Second Amended Complaint must be filed on or before October 7, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/4/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER denying ECF No. 150 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/16/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER Denying 95 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/9/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 140 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach, on 8/3/2016, granting ECF Nos. 117 , 125 , and 130 Motions to Seal. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDERED that Aevoe's motion for protective order (ECF No. 87 ) is GRANTED. Non-party Buchanan Ingersoll and Rooney P.C. does not have to respond to document requests 1-14. On or before July 29, 2016 Aevoe will serve Buchanan Ingersoll and Rooney a copy of this order. FURTHER ORDERED that Racing Optics's motion to compel (ECF No. 93 ) is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that Aevoe's request for reasonable costs and fees is GRANTED. On or before July 29, 2016 Aevoe mus t submit to the court an affidavit that details the reasonable costs and fees associated with bringing its motion for protective order (ECF No. 87 ) only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/27/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER directing that the Oral Argument currently set for 7/28/2016 at 10:00 AM is vacated and rescheduled to 7/29/2016 at 9:00 AM in LV Courtroom 4B before Judge Robert C. Jones. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/18/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER granting in part and denying in part ECF No. 85 Motion to Compel (see order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/19/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER : Response to ECF No. 105 Motion to file under seal due by 7/18/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/14/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 45 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/19/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER that a hearing on Plaintiff's 45 Motion to Compel is set for 4/13/2016 11:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/17/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Racing Optics, Inc. v. Aevoe Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Aevoe Corp.
Represented By: Josephine Binetti McPeak
Represented By: Jeffrey A Silvestri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aevoe Corp.
Represented By: Josephine Binetti McPeak
Represented By: Jeffrey A Silvestri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Racing Optics, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory A Brower
Represented By: Kelly H Dove
Represented By: Kenneth Jay Gumbiner
Represented By: Steven Moore
Represented By: Joshua B. Pond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Racing Optics, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory A Brower
Represented By: Kelly H Dove
Represented By: Kenneth Jay Gumbiner
Represented By: Steven Moore
Represented By: Joshua B. Pond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?