Odell, Jr. et al v. Burwell et al
Plaintiff: Robert H. Odell, Jr. and Robert Odell, M.D., Ph.D. Medical Enterprises
Defendant: Sylvia Matthew-Burwell, Noridian Healthcare Solutions, L.L.C. and United States Department of Health and Human Services
Case Number: 2:2015cv01793
Filed: September 18, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395 HHS: Adverse Reimbursement Review
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 126 Plaintiff's Motion for Re-Hearing is DENIED and that 135 Defendants' Motion to File Corrected Opposition is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/6/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER re Claims from Plaintiff only. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 103 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 104 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction is GRANTED. The parties are ordered to submit proposed orders regarding injunctive r elief no later than 10/10/18. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a hearing regarding the proposed orders as to injunctive relief is set for 10/26/18 at 11:00 AM in LV Courtroom 7C. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER Granting 98 Motion to Extend Time for Extension of Scheduling Deadlines. Motions due by 2/16/2018. Responses due by 3/9/2018. Replies due by 3/30/2018. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 SCHEDULING ORDER Granting 90 Motion to Extend Time. Discovery due by 12/15/2017. Motions due by 1/26/2018. Responses due by 2/16/2018. Replies due by 3/9/2018. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER Granting 82 Motion to Extend Time re 79 Motion to Dismiss. ( Responses due by 11/30/2016., Replies due by 12/22/2016.) Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/7/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER Granting 77 Motion to Extend Time to Respond. Sylvia Matthew-Burwell answer due 10/21/2016; United States Department of Health and Human Services answer due 10/21/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/23/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Granting 56 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 9/13/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Granting 54 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time. Amended Complaint deadline: 9/10/2016. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/1/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Granting 51 Motion to Admit Government Attorney, Brett Bierer, to Practice in the District of Nevada. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 08/04/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting 35 Uncontested Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion and Proposed Briefing Schedule (First Request). Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/29/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting 31 Stipulation to Extend the Deadline re 1 Complaint. Noridian Healthcare Solutions, L.L.C. answer due 1/25/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/11/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting 18 Stipulation to Extend the Deadline for Noridian Healthcare Solutions, LLC to Answer or otherwise appear re 1 Complaint. Noridian Healthcare Solutions, L.L.C.'s answer due 1/11/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/9/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Odell, Jr. et al v. Burwell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sylvia Matthew-Burwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noridian Healthcare Solutions, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert H. Odell, Jr.
Represented By: Robert D. Rourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Odell, M.D., Ph.D. Medical Enterprises
Represented By: Robert D. Rourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?