Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC v. BFP Investment 5, LLC
Plaintiff: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Defendant: BFP Investments 5, LLC
Case Number: 2:2015cv01841
Filed: September 24, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of BFP Investments 5, LLC against Sherreth Jones. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 8/31/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER Granting 80 Motion for Return of Security Bond. IT IS ORDERED that the $500 deposit, plus interest, be refunded in accordance with the 14 certificate of cash deposit, to: WRIGHT, FINLAY & ZAK, LLP 7785 W. Sahara Ave., Suite 200 Las Vegas, NV 89117 unless a party objects to this order by no later than 10 days. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/20/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting 78 Amended Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to BFP Investments 5, LLC ; Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/1/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) (Main Document 79 replaced on 7/1/2020) (JM).
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER Granting 73 Stipulation of Dismissal without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED that HOA hereby withdraws its pending 68 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/2/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Granting 70 Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 68 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 6/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 5/27/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Granting 64 Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 62 Amended Complaint. BFP Investments 5, LLC answer due 5/29/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 4/22/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 47 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff is granted leave to amend its Complaint to add the Prescott Park HOA as a defendant and its Unjust Enrichment, Wrongful/Statutorily Defective Foreclosure, Breach of Statutory Duty, Negligent Misrepresentation, Breach of Contract, and Breachof Covenant of Good Faith and Fair Dealing causes of action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff is denied leave to amend and add its injunctive relief claims and its Declaratory Relief and Quiet Title causes of action under the Fifth and Fourteenth Amendments of the United States Constitution. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall revise its proposed amended complaint to comply with this Order and file the same with seven calendar days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 4/14/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Granting 43 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Christopher A.J. Swift; Chelsea Crowton and Edgar C Smith withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 11/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) Modified on 11/14/2019 - Corrected Judge (JQC).
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the stay in this case is lifted for all purposes. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting 35 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER that 30 Motion to Lift Stay is DENIED. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Defendant BFP Investments 5, LLC's 26 Motion to Lift Stay is Denied without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is administratively Stayed. Once the proceedings in the United States Supreme Co urt in Bourne Valley Court Trust v. Wells Fargo Bank and Saticoy Bay LLC Series 350 Durango 104 v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage have concluded, any party may move to lift the stay. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 04/03/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER that 15 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED this case is administratively STAYED until the Ninth Circuit issues the mandate in Bourne Valley Court Trust v. Wells Fargo Bank, case number 15-15233 (2:13-cv-649-PMP-NJK). Once the mandate issues, any party may move to lift the stay. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/18/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER that the party challenging Chapter 116's constitutionality in each of these cases must serve the Nevada Attorney General with the complaint, motion, or other filing that calls into question Chapter 116's constitutionality, and shall file proof of compliance within 10 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/18/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER CERTIFYING CASE TO NEVADA ATTORNEY GENERAL. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/11/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC v. BFP Investment 5, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BFP Investments 5, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Chelsea Crowton
Represented By: Dana Jonathon Nitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?