Middleton v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Ervin Middleton
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A. and Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC.
Case Number: 2:2015cv01867
Filed: September 29, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1640 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying 8 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/1/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that the 5 Report and Recommendation is Accepted, and this case is Dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk of the Court shall enter Judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 02/24/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's 1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall file the 1 -2 Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Complaint is DISMISSED, with leave to amend. Plaintiff will have until November 30, 2015, to file an Amended Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs 2 Motion to Expedite Ruling is DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/28/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Middleton v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ervin Middleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?