Middleton v. Wells Fargo, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Ann Gates Middleton
Defendant: Guranteed Rate, Inc. and Wells Fargo, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2015cv01875
Filed: September 30, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Lloyd D. George
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1640 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER. THE COURT ADOPTS 15 the Report and Recommendation; THE COURT ORDERS that this matter is DISMISSED; The Clerk of the Court is instructed to close this matter and enter judgment accordingly; THE COURT FURTHER ORDERS that 6 Plaintiff's Motion for District Court to Reconsider Order is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Lloyd D. George on 9/14/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. IT IS RECOMMENDED that 8 Plaintiff Ann Gates Middleton's Amended Complaint be DISMISSED. The Clerk of the Court be instructed to close this case and enter judgment accordingly. Objections to R&R due by 9/1/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/18/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.; Amended Complaint deadline: 2/23/2017. Clerk of Court shall not issue summons. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/23/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Middleton v. Wells Fargo, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guranteed Rate, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Gates Middleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?