Castro et al v. Poulton et al
Plaintiff: Azucena Castro, Claudia E Castro and Jose Silvestre Castro
Defendant: Craig Stuart Poulton and USF Reddaway, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2015cv01908
Filed: October 5, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER Granting 104 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/31/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER Granting 100 Stipulation for Exemption from Attendance at Settlement Conference re 97 Order Scheduling Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/11/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 SECOND AMENDED ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 51 plaintiff's motion to strike be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 59 plaintiff's motion in limine #1 be, and the same hereby i s, GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 60 plaintiff's motion in limine #2 be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 61 plaintiff's motion in limine #3 be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 62 plaintiff's motion in limine #4 be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 63 plaintiff's motion in limine #5 be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 78 plaintiff's motion for reconsideration be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/29/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 51 defendant Castro's motion to strike be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 59 defendant Castro's motion in limine #1 be, and the same hereby is, GRA NTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, consistent with the foregoing. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 60 defendant Castro's motion in limine #2 be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 61 defendant Castro's motion in limin e #3 be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 62 defendant Castro's motion in limine #4 be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 63 defendant Castro's motion in limine #5 be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 78 defendant Castro's motion for reconsideration be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/18/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER Granting 93 Stipulation to Continue Settlement Conference. (Settlement Conference reset for 8/21/2017 09:00 AM in LV Chambers before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr.) Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/31/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER Granting 91 Stipulation to Continue Settlement Conference. ( Settlement Conference reset for 8/9/2017 09:00 AM in LV Chambers before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr.) Confidential settlement conference statements are due on 8/2/17 according to 90 Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/25/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 79 Defendants' Motion to Strike Reply isgranted. The Clerk of Court shall strike 64 Plaintiffs Reply to her Motion to Strike defenseexpert Jack Broadhurst.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 80 Defendants' Mo tion to Strike Replies isgranted. The Clerk of Court shall strike 73 , 74 , 75 , 76 , 77 Plaintiffs Replies to her Motions in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/3/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Granting 66 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Jay Joseph Schuttert terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/3/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Granting 48 Stipulation to Continue Hearings on Motions re 44 Motion to Quash Subpoena and 45 Motion to Compel. Hearing reset for 3/30/17 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 3A. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/1/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 33 Defendants' Motion to Amend Answer is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall file their First Amended Answer on or before 1/27/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/19/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Denying 29 Motion to Strike Deposition Testimony of Jose Salud Castro and Carolina Tafoya-De-Castro without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 12/9/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting 26 Stipulation re 25 MOTION in Limine #1 To Preclude Defendants From Presenting A Fraud Defense At Trial.( Responses due by 10/7/2016.) Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/22/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting 12 Stipulation Dismissing without Prejudice Plaintiff's Fourth through Seventh Causes of Action. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/15/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castro et al v. Poulton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Azucena Castro
Represented By: Robert W. Cottle
Represented By: Matthew David Minucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia E Castro
Represented By: Robert W. Cottle
Represented By: Matthew David Minucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Silvestre Castro
Represented By: Robert W. Cottle
Represented By: Matthew David Minucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Stuart Poulton
Represented By: Bruce Scott Dickinson
Represented By: Jacquelyn M. Franco
Represented By: Michael E. Hottman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USF Reddaway, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce Scott Dickinson
Represented By: Jacquelyn M. Franco
Represented By: Michael E. Hottman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?