Espiritu v. Capital One, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: |
Martha S. Espiritu |
Defendant: |
Capital One, N.A., Pacific Coast Title Company, Pintar Investment Company Residential, L.P. and Quality Loan Service Corporation |
Case Number: |
2:2015cv01933 |
Filed: |
October 8, 2015 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Jennifer A. Dorsey |
Presiding Judge: |
Peggy A. Leen |
Nature of Suit: |
Real Property: Foreclosure |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 7, 2019 |
Filing
141
AMENDED ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 136 Pintar's Motion to Release Supersedeas Bond is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to release and pay the $38,000, plus any accrued interest, in cash posted in this action [126 ] to The Law Offices of P. Sterling Kerr IOLTA Account for the benefit of its client, Pintar Investment Company Residential, LP. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/7/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF: CC: Finance - DC)
|
January 2, 2019 |
Filing
140
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 136 Pintar's Motion to Release Supersedeas Bond is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to release and pay the $38,000 in cash posted in this action [ECF No. 126 ] to The Law Offices of P. Sterling Kerr IOLTA Account for the benefit of its client, Pintar Investment Company Residential, LP. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Finance - ADR)
|
June 28, 2017 |
Filing
123
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that 113 the plaintiff's motion for a stay is GRANTED. Plaintiff is ordered to deposit $38,000 by close of business on 7/10/17 for this stay to be effective. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 114 plaintiff's motion to shorten time is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/27/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
May 17, 2017 |
Filing
111
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that 72 , 82 the defendants' motions for summary judgment are GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 102 Espiritu's objections to Magistrate Judge Leen's decision are OVERRULED as moot. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/17/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
January 9, 2017 |
Filing
98
ORDER Granting 95 Stipulation to Continue Reply Brief Deadline. THE FOREGOING is approved and Defendant Capital One, NA shall file any Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Jury Demand on or before 1/4/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/9/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
November 18, 2016 |
Filing
81
ORDER granting ECF No. 78 Stipulation to Continue Hearing on ECF No. 73 Motion to Extend Time to File a Motion for Summary Judgment. Hearing rescheduled for 11/22/2016 at 2:00 P.M. in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/17/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
|
November 17, 2016 |
Filing
79
ORDER DENYING 40 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 47 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/17/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
|
December 9, 2015 |
Filing
25
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate for All Purposes 7 is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/9/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?