Kraja v. Bellagio, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Andi Kraja
Defendant: Bellagio, LLC and Vincent Rotolo
Case Number: 2:2015cv01983
Filed: October 14, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 214 the Bellagio's motion for judgment or new trial is GRANTED IN PART. The motion for judgment as a matter of law is denied without prejudice as moot. I grant the alternative relief of a new trial. The verdict ente red after the April 1-3, 2019 trial (ECF Nos. 199 , 202 ) is vacated.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the parties to file a proposed Pretrial Order by 2/5/20. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the parties to confer about the fees and costs Kraja incurred in connection w ith the first trial. If the parties cannot reach an agreement on an amount for Bellagio to reimburse, Kraja will submit an application for fees and costs, with supporting documentation, by 2/5/20. Bellagio will have 21 days to file an opposition, and Kraja may file a reply 14 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/6/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER Granting 235 Stipulation to Extend Time for Plaintiff to Obtain an Expert and Submit an Expert Report. Due by 12/3/2019. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/21/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER Granting 233 Stipulation to Extend Time for Plaintiff to Obtain an Expert and Submit an Expert Report. Due by 11/21/2019. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/6/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER Granting 231 Stipulation re 227 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS. Evidentiary Hearing set for 1/3/2020 at 01:00 PM in LV Courtroom 6C before Judge Andrew P. Gordon. See Order for further deadlines. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 206 JURY MEAL ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that all meals and lodging, if required, for said jury and attendants shall be paid by the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/3/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Court hereby VACATES the evidentiary hearing set on those motions 136 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/5/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER re 112 , 113 Motions. Defendants shall file a notice indicating whether they are withdrawing their motions. That notice shall be filed by 5/4/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/27/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER Granting 123 Motion to Extend Time re 112 , 113 Motions. (Responses due by 6/19/2017., Replies due by 6/26/2017.) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Evidentiary hearing is CONTINUED from 5/12/17 to 8:30 a.m. on 7/11/17 in Courtroom 3B. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/3/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER Granting 75 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/31/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER Granting 116 Motion to Extend Time for briefing deadlines. Responses for 115 and 116 Motions due by 3/3/2017, Replies due by 3/7/2017; Responses for 112 and 113 Motions due by 3/17/2017, Replies due by 3/24/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/24/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER Denying without prejudice 108 plaintiff's motion for relief and 110 second motion for relief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER re 83 Motion for Leave to File. The motion to supplement the request for attorneys' fees is DENIED. The Court finds the motion properly resolved without a hearing, see Local Rule 78-1, and therefore VACATES the hearing set on this motion for 10/4/16. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/21/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER. Motion Hearing set for 10/4/2016 03:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/12/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER re 66 Motion to Extend Time/Shorten Time regarding Dispositive matter. Responses due by 8/4/2016. Replies due by 8/8/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/1/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 17 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Kraja elects to file an amended complaint, he must file it within 21 days of this order. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/25/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Granting 56 Proposed Stipulation and Order To Take Deposition of Third Party Witnesses Outside Close of Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/6/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting 29 Motion to Strike Experts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/22/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that counsel shall comply with the requirements of Local Rule 10-5(b), the Ninth Circuits decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, and the procedures outlined above, with respect to any documents filed under seal. To the extent an y aspect of the stipulated protective order may conflict with this order or Local Rule 10-5(b), that aspect of the stipulated protective order is hereby superseded with this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/3/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER re 29 Motion to Strike and 30 Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines. In its discretion, the Court finds that Defendants' motion to strike, Docket No. 29, does not warrant expedited review. In light of the upcoming discovery deadline s, however, the Court orders that a response to Defendant's motion to extend discovery deadline (Docket No. 30) must be filed no later than March 4, 2016, and any reply must be filed no later than March 7, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/2/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting 24 Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendants to File Reply in Support of Motion for Partially Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Reply is due by 1/14/16. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/30/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting 20 Stipulation to Extend Time for Plaintiff to Respond to 17 Defendants' Motion to Partially Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Responses due by 12/17/2015. Replies due by 1/4/2016. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/11/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kraja v. Bellagio, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bellagio, LLC
Represented By: Amy L Baker
Represented By: Patrick H. Hicks
Represented By: Montgomery Y Paek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Rotolo
Represented By: Amy L Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andi Kraja
Represented By: James P. Kemp
Represented By: Victoria Lynn Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?