KMI Zeolite, Inc. v. United States Department of the Interior, et al.
Plaintiff: Robert Ford and KMI Zeolite, Inc.
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management of the U.S. Department of the Interior, Sally Jewell, Neil Kornze, Deborah MacNeill, John Ruhs, Timothy Smith and United States Department of the Interrior
Case Number: 2:2015cv02038
Filed: October 22, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER granting 181 Motion to Extend Stay of Case. This case shall remain administratively stayed until 6/30/2021, pending performance of the settlement agreement. Further Ordered, the parties shall file a motion to lift the stay and a notice of dismissal within 14 days of performance of the settlement agreement. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/11/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER granting 179 Motion to Stay Case. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that this action shall remain administratively stayed until 5:00 p.m. on Friday, January 8, 2021, pending the parties' performance of the settlement agreeme nt. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, if the settlement is not fully performed, the parties shall file a motion requesting a continuance of the administrative stay and explaining the status of the sale before 5:00 p.m. on Friday, January 8, 2021. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a motion to lift the stay and a notice of dismissal within 14 days of performance of the settlement agreement. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/10/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that this action shall remain administratively stayed until 5:00 p.m. on Friday, 8/28/20, pending the parties' performance of the settlement agreement. Motions due by 8/28/2020. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/27/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that the parties shall file a dispositive motion, stipulation to dismiss, or other appropriate motion within seven (7) days of this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shallif they do not file a dispositive motion, stipulation to dismiss or other appropriate motionfile a status report and show cause why this matter should not be dismissed in its entirety within seven (7) days of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/21/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 162 Magistrate Judge Koppe's report and recommendation be, and the same hereby is, ADOPTED in its entirety. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 153 Nye County's motion to enforce settlement be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Nye County be, and the same hereby is, DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/26/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER that the Plaintiff/Counterclaim Defendant KMI Zeolite's Motion to Excuse Local Counsel's Attendance, at Settlement Conference (ECF No. 165 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/16/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER Re: 163 Motion for Exception from Attendance Requirement for Settlement Conference. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that any opposition to 163 the Federal Defendants' Motion for Exception from Attendance Requirement for Settlement Conference must be filed on or before 4/15/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/8/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER Re: 153 Motion to Enforce. Responses due by 3/7/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/28/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER Granting 151 Motion to Lift Stay of Case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/5/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the settlement conference scheduled for 10:00 AM, 1/28/19, is VACATED and will be rescheduled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/17/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that in light of the setting of that settlement conference, the Court VACATES the requirement to file dismissal papers or a status report by 1/24/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER granting 140 Motion. Settlement Conference set for 1/28/2019 at 10:00 AM in LV Chambers before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. The settlement conference statements shall be received in my chambers - not later than 4:00 p.m., 1/22/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER. The Court VACATES the status conference that had been previously set for 1/24/19 (see Docket No. 132 ). The parties are ORDERED to file dismissal papers or a joint status report by 1/24/19.Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER Denying 94 MOTION for Summary Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall submit a joint status report to the court within thirty (30) days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a hearing on 112 the Joint Motion to Set Hearing Date to Approve Settlement is scheduled for 10:00 AM, 4/13/18, in Courtroom 3D. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the 4/9/18 deadline for Plaintiffs KMI and Ford's to file motions for summary judgment and supporting briefs is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER Granting 104 Motion to Extend Time Re: 90 Report and Recommendation. Objections to R&R due by 4/13/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER re 106 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER re 94 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Brief due by 4/9/2018. Briefs in response due by 5/9/2018. Reply brief due by 6/8/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a hearing on 97 the Substitution of Attorneys is scheduled for 2:00 PM, 3/2/18, in Courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a hearing on 93 Joint Motion to Amend Briefing Schedule is scheduled for 2:00 PM, 3/2/18, in Courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 81 the Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record Representing ABC and Ford is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 82 the Motion for Hearing is DENIED as MOOT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that ABC Recycling Industri es, Inc. must retain counsel by 10/2/17. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Dan M. Winder, Esq. must mail this Order to ABC and Robert Ford. The certificate of mailing must be filed with this Court on or before 9/6/17. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Mr. Winder must file with the Court the last known address(es) and contact information of ABC and Ford, on or before 9/6/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/31/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Granting 79 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Gregory A. Miles terminated for KMI Zeolite, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/25/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Granting 71 Unopposed Motion to Appear Telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/11/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Granting 49 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff Ford shall file an amended complaint identical to that attached to his notice of corrected document 53 within seven (7) days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/29/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Granting 47 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Dismissing with prejudice Galtar, LLC. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/16/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting 34 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Motions due by 7/11/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/6/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER re 34 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Discovery Hearing set for 5/6/2016 02:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 04/06/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting 23 Motion to Admit Government Attorney to Practice in the District of Nevada for Duration of Attorney's Government Employment. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/10/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants United States Department of the Interior; Sally Jewel; Bureau of Land Management; Neil Kornze; John Ruhs; Tim Smith; and Deborah MacNeill (the Federal Defendants) shall have to and including 1/29/16, to file their answer in this matter. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/21/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KMI Zeolite, Inc. v. United States Department of the Interior, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management of the U.S. Department of the Interior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sally Jewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil Kornze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah MacNeill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Ruhs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Interrior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Ford
Represented By: Karen Budd-Falen
Represented By: Gregory A. Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KMI Zeolite, Inc.
Represented By: Karen Budd-Falen
Represented By: Gregory A. Miles
Represented By: Andrew Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?